Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC v. Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC
Defendant: Maersk Line AS, Kuehne and Nagel, Inc. and Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd
Case Number: 2:2020cv00248
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Crossclaim, #20 , for the following reasons: Other: Crossclaim caption lists party Maersk Line A/S as both crossclaimant and crossdefendant Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. (bm)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (wm)
March 4, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Crossclaim, #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Crossclaim caption lists party Maersk Line A/S as both cross-claimant and cross-defendant. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 3, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS, identifying Maersk Line A/S; KUEHNE & NAGEL, INC.; KUEHNE + NAGEL (IRELAND) LTD.; ROYAL AND SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC a/s/o ALLERGAN. (Moghaddam, B)
March 3, 2020 Filing 20 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 3/6/20. CROSSCLAIM against cross-defendants Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd, Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S, #2 Exhibit B to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S)(Moghaddam, B) Modified on 3/6/2020 (bm).
March 3, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS.(Moghaddam, B)
March 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., identifying Kuehne + Nagel International AG; AXA Insurance Company. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
March 3, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , CROSSCLAIM against Maersk Line AS filed by defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc..(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kuehne and Nagel, Inc. answer now due 3/3/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc..(Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Kuehne and Nagel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maersk Line AS answer now due 3/3/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Maersk Line AS.(Moghaddam, B)
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Maersk Line AS.(Attorney B Alexander Moghaddam added to party Maersk Line AS(pty:dft))(Moghaddam, B)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00248 PSG(KSx). (rn)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, upon Defendant Maersk Line AS served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Process Specialist CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, upon Defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc. served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Process Specialist CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, upon Defendant Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Process Specialist CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd, Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., Maersk Line AS. (esa)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC (Southwick, Joshua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, (Southwick, Joshua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25091279 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC v. Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line AS
Represented By: B Alexander Moghaddam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne and Nagel, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC
Represented By: Joshua A Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?