Unicolors, Inc. v. Into Apparel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Into Apparel, Inc. and Gabriel Brothers, Inc. a West Virginia Corporation, individually and doing business as Rugged Wearhouse
Case Number: 2:2020cv00268
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gabriel Brothers, Inc. answer now due 3/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc..(Burroughs, Scott)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Gabriel Brothers, Inc. served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System c/o Gabriela Sanchez - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Into Apparel, Inc. (esa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25094279 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. Into Apparel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Into Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc. a West Virginia Corporation, individually and doing business as Rugged Wearhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?