Reflex Media, Inc. et al v. Luxy Limited
Defendant: Luxy Limited
Petitioner: Reflex Media, Inc. and Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD
Case Number: 2:2020cv00423
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 252 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation) (lom)
December 20, 2021 Filing 251 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation) (lom)
December 13, 2021 Filing 250 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation).(Smith, Mark)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER #248 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court clarifies that it reviewed both the Filing Party and Designating Party's respective declarations and found that neither party offered sufficiently compelling reasons to seal any portion of the documents. The parties still have until Tuesday, December 14, 2021 at 12:00 PM to file unredacted versions of their documents in order to have the Court consider them. (iv)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Parties' Applications to Seal [DE 170, 198, 209] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES the parties' applications to seal. The parties have until Tuesday, December 14, 2021 at 12:00 PM to file unredacted versions of their documents in order to have the Court consider them. See L.R. 72-5.5.2(b)(ii). (see document for further details) (bm)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER re LUXY LIMITED'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS WITH ITS MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge R. Gary Klausner denying #229 APPLICATION to Seal: DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (bm)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER re PLAINTIFFS'/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF ITS MOTIONS IN LIMINE UNDER SEAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner denying #216 APPLICATION to Seal Document: DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (bm)
November 30, 2021 Filing 245 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of Luxy's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-4 under seal #229 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Protective Order)(Smith, Mark)
November 30, 2021 Filing 244 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Reflex's Motions in Limine 1-9) under seal #216 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 243 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. : Mediation held on 11/16/2021. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Luxy Limited's Motion for Summary Judgment #169 ; and Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE LTD and Reflex Media, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions #174 , calendared for hearing on December 6, 2021, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The court will review the matter without hearing any further arguments in person or on paper. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. On April 26, 2021, the Court ordered the parties to participate in settlement option 3 #54 . Pursuant to the Local Rules, the parties were to complete the mediation by November 19, 2021. Counsel shall file a joint status report, not later than December 1, 2021 providing the Court with the date of the mediation, the name of the mediator, names of all in attendance, and the outcome of the mediation. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 26, 2021 Filing 240 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude Evidence and Testimony regarding internal operations and policies of third parties filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Zimmermann, #3 Exhibit A to Zimmermann Dec., #4 Exhibit B to Zimmermann Dec., #5 Exhibit C to Zimmermann Dec., #6 Exhibit D to Zimmermann Dec., #7 Exhibit E to Zimmermann Dec., #8 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 239 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Evidence of Foreign Trademark Conduct and Revenue filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Zimmermann, #3 Exhibit 1 to Zimmermann Dec., #4 Exhibit 2 to Zimmermann Dec., #5 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 238 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Hearsay Evidence filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Knutson, #3 Exhibit 1 to Knutson Dec., #4 Exhibit 2 to Knutson Dec., #5 Exhibit 3 to Knutson Dec., #6 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 237 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Evidence and Testimony regarding alleged use of third-party marks filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 236 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Evidence and Testimony regarding discovery disputes filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 235 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence and Testimony regarding other lawsuits filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 234 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence and Testimony regarding belatedly produced assignment and license agreements filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 4, #2 Declaration of Knutson, #3 Exhibit 1 to Knutson Dec., #4 Exhibit 2 to Knutson Dec., #5 Exhibit 3 to Knutson Dec., #6 Exhibit 4 to Knutson Dec., #7 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 233 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Expert Kent filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 3, #2 Declaration of Zimmermann, #3 Exhibit A to Zimmermann Dec., #4 Redacted Document Ex. B to Zimmermann Dec., #5 Exhibit C to Zimmermann Dec., #6 Exhibit D to Zimmermann Dec., #7 Exhibit E to Zimmermann Dec., #8 Redacted Document Ex. F to Zimmermann Dec., #9 Exhibit G to Zimmermann Dec., #10 Exhibit H to Zimmermann Dec., #11 Exhibit I to Zimmermann Dec., #12 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 232 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Expert Torres filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 2, #2 Declaration of Zimmermann, #3 Exhibit A to Zimmermann Dec., #4 Redacted Document Ex. B to Zimmermann Dec., #5 Redacted Document Ex. C to Zimmermann Dec., #6 Exhibit D to Zimmermann Dec., #7 Exhibit E to Zimmermann Dec., #8 Redacted Document Ex. F to Zimmermann Dec., #9 Exhibit G to Zimmermann Dec., #10 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 231 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Expert Sowers filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 1, #2 Declaration of Poret, #3 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 230 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of Luxy's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-4 under seal #229 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited, Counter Claimants Luxy Limited, Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum iso MIL 1, #2 Memorandum iso MIL 2, #3 Memorandum iso MIL 3, #4 Memorandum iso MIL 4, #5 Exhibit B to MIL 2, #6 Exhibit C to MIL 2, #7 Exhibit F to MIL 2, #8 Exhibit B to MIL 3, #9 Exhibit F to MIL 3)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 229 APPLICATION to file document Portions of Luxy's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-4 under seal filed by Defendant Luxy Limited, Counter Claimants Luxy Limited, Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 1, #2 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 2, #3 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 3, #4 Redacted Document Memo iso MIL 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 228 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions) under seal #204 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited, Counter Claimants Luxy Limited, Luxy Limited.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 227 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Luxy's Reply under seal #209 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Protective Order)(Smith, Mark)
November 26, 2021 Filing 226 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Exclude Defendant Luxy Limited from Calling Any Fact Witnesses Except Tim Tang filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Motion in Limine #9, #2 Exhibit 27- Tang Depo. Vol. 1 Redacted, #3 Exhibit 28- Tang Depo. Vol. 2 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 29- October 4, 2021 Email from Luxys Counsel, #5 Exhibit 30- October 6, 2021, Email from Reflexs Counsel, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine #9)(Smith, Mark)
November 26, 2021 Filing 225 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Exclude Defendant Luxy Limited from Shifting Liability or Responsibility to Supposed Third-Party Contractors filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Motion in Limine #8, #2 Exhibit 24- Tang Depo. Vol. 1 Redacted, #3 Exhibit 25- July 15, Rog Responses (Excerpts), #4 Exhibit 26- Luxys September 30 Rog Responses, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine #8)(Smith, Mark)
November 26, 2021 Filing 224 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Evidence and Testimony Related to Dismissed Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Eddington Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 23 - October 4,2021 Email Among Counsel, #3 Proposed Order)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 26, 2021 Filing 223 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude the Generic Survey Evidence and Related Expert Testimony of Mr. Hal Poret filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Poret Survey, #2 Exhibit Sowers Survey, #3 Proposed Order)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 26, 2021 Filing 222 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude Defendant Luxy Limited from Presenting Supposed Evidence Showing that Luxys Use of Reflexs Trademarks was Unprofitable filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Motion in Limine #5, #2 Exhibit 17- Luxys July 15, 2021 RFA Select Responses, #3 Exhibit 18- Luxys October 21, 2021 Third Supplemental RFAs Select Responses, #4 Exhibit 19- Tang Depo. Vol. 2 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 20- Luxy 012200-012292 Redacted, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine #5)(Smith, Mark)
November 26, 2021 Filing 221 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Pre-2014 References to Reflexs Websites filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Schaeffer Declaration, #2 Exhibit Buell Depo, #3 Exhibit Wayback SA Privacy Policy, #4 Exhibit Wayback Luxy Privacy Policy, #5 Exhibit Redline of SA vs. Luxy Privacy Policy, #6 Exhibit Wayback Luxy Terms or Use, #7 Exhibit Wayback Luxy Terms of Use, #8 Exhibit Redline of SA vs. Luxy Terms of Use, #9 Proposed Order)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 26, 2021 Filing 220 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence that is not Probative of Genericide or Genericness filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 26, 2021 Filing 219 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Third Party Characterizations of Reflexs Websites and Related Materials filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Schaeffer in Support of Motion in Limine #2, #2 Exhibit 4- NCOSE Article, #3 Exhibit 5- Gaetz Article, #4 Exhibit 6- Wey Deposition Transcripts Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 7- Tang Deposition Transcript Excerpts Redacted, #6 Exhibit 8- App Store Screenshot, #7 Exhibit 9- Trello App Store ASO, #8 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine #2)(Smith, Mark)
November 26, 2021 Filing 218 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Luxys Sole Employee Tim Tang from Testifying at Trial via Remote Means filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Schaeffer in Support of Motion in Limine #1, #2 Exhibit Tang Depo Vol. 1 Redacted, #3 Exhibit 2- Tang Depo Vol. 2 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 3- Wayback Machine Screenshot, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine #1)(Smith, Mark)
November 26, 2021 Filing 217 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Reflex's Motions in Limine 1-9) under seal #216 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 2-Email to Luxy's Counsel, #3 Unredacted Document Motion in Limine #1 to Compel Luxys Sole Employee Tim Tang to Appear in Person at Trial, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 1 - Tang Vol 1, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 2 - Tang Vol 2, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 7 - Tang Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #7 Unredacted Document Motion to Limine #5 to exclude Third Party Characterizations of Reflexs Websites and Related Materials, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 19- Tang Depo. Vol. 2, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 20- Luxy 012200-012292, #10 Unredacted Document Motion in Limine #8 to exclude Defendant Luxy Limited from Shifting Liability or Responsibility to Supposed Third-Party Contractors, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. 24- Tang Depo. Vol. 1, #12 Unredacted Document Motion in Limine #9 Defendant Luxy Limited from Calling Any Fact Witnesses Except Tim Tang, #13 Unredacted Document Ex. 27- Tang Depo. Vol. 1, #14 Unredacted Document Ex. 28- Tang Depo. Vol. 2)(Smith, Mark)
November 26, 2021 Filing 216 APPLICATION to file document (Reflex's Motions in Limine 1-9) under seal filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Motion in Limine #1 to exclude Luxys Sole Employee Tim Tang to Appear in Person at Trial, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 1 - Tang Vol 1, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 2 - Tang Vol 2, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 7 - Tang Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #5 Redacted Document Motion to Limine #5 to exclude Third Party Characterizations of Reflexs Websites and Related Materials, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 19- Tang Depo. Vol. 2, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 20- Luxy 012200-012292, #8 Redacted Document Motion to Limine #8 to exclude, #9 Redacted Document Ex. 24- Tang Depo. Vol. 1, #10 Redacted Document Motion to Limine #9 to exclude, #11 Redacted Document Ex. 27- Tang Depo. Vol. 1, #12 Redacted Document Ex. 28- Tang Depo. Vol. 2, #13 Proposed Order Granting Application for Leave to File Under Seal)(Smith, Mark)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration [DE 145] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration #145 . (See Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Strike [DE 200] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the Court warns Defendant that it will impose sanctions for any further misuse of ex parte applications. The Court accordingly DENIES Defendant's ex parte application. denying #200 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Expert Designation, Report, and Declaration of Brian Sowers MEMORANDUM in Opposition #200 . (See Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner denying #188 MOTION for Relief. (jp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 212 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #195 [195-89] Declaration of J. Schaeffer in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Schaeffer in Support of Notice of Errata)(Smith, Mark)
November 22, 2021 Filing 211 REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's claims #169 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Declarations and Exhibits, #2 Objections to Evidence, #3 Consolidated Statement of Facts, #4 Declaration of K. Zimmermann, #5 Exhibit BBB, #6 Exhibit CCC, #7 Exhibit DDD)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 210 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Luxy's Reply under seal #209 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply Brief, #2 Unredacted Document Objections to Declarations and Exhibits, #3 Unredacted Document Consolidated Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit BBB, #5 Exhibit CCC, #6 Exhibit DDD)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 209 APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Luxy's Reply under seal filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Reply Brief, #2 Redacted Document Objections to Declarations and Exhibits, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts RE MSJ, #4 Exhibit BBB, #5 Exhibit CCC, #6 Exhibit DDD, #7 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 208 OBJECTIONS to Request for Judicial Notice, #197 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 207 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions) under seal #204 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply ISO of Motion for Sanctions {Final-Highlighted})(Smith, Mark)
November 22, 2021 Filing 206 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Misconduct #174 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Reply ISO Motion for Sanctions, #2 Declaration of J. Schaeffer ISO Reply ISO Motion for Sanctions, #3 Exhibit 38- Tang Depo Day 1 Excerpts [Highly Confidential] - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 39- Tang Depo Day 2 Excerpts [Highly Confidential] - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 40- Ma LinkedIn Printout, #6 Exhibit 41- Ma Facebook Printout, #7 Exhibit 42- NY Post Article dated March 24, 2016, #8 Exhibit 43- Holbrow Email dated September 29, 2021, #9 Exhibit 44- Luxys September 13, 2021, RFA Responses, #10 Exhibit 45- LuxyPro KeyWord Data [Highly Confidential] - Redacted, #11 Exhibit 46- Luxys Response First Set of Rogs, #12 Exhibit 47- Luxys October 12, 2021, RFA Responses, #13 Exhibit 48- Atlassian Subpoena Notice dated October 1, 2021, #14 Exhibit 49- October 7, 2021, Email re: Apples Subpoena Production, #15 Exhibit 50- Luxys Emails Re: Subpoenas #1, #16 Exhibit 51- Luxys Emails Re: Subpoenas #2, #17 Exhibit 52- Luxys Emails Re: Subpoenas #3, #18 Exhibit 53- Krause LinkedIn Printout, #19 Exhibit 54- Narda LinkedIn Printout, #20 Exhibit 55- Hamarova LinkedIn Printout, #21 Exhibit 56- Luxy Press Release dated June 9, 2020, #22 Exhibit 57- Luxy PlayStore App Screenshots, #23 Exhibit 58- Apple App Screenshots, #24 Exhibit 59- Luxy FAQ 2018 Metadata, #25 Exhibit 60- Wayback SA Privacy Policy, #26 Exhibit 61- Wayback Luxy Privacy Policy, #27 Exhibit 62- Redline of SA vs. Luxy Privacy Policy, #28 Exhibit 63- Wayback SA Terms of Use, #29 Exhibit 64- Wayback Luxy Terms of Use, #30 Exhibit 65- Redline of SA vs. Luxy Terms of Use, #31 Exhibit 66- Reflexs RFAs to Luxy, Set One)(Smith, Mark)
November 22, 2021 Filing 205 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions) under seal #204 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - [D.E. 61] Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - November 19, 2021 Meet and Confer Email, #3 Unredacted Document Reply ISO of Motion for Sanctions, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 38 - Tang Depo Day 1 Excerpts [Highly Confidential] - SEALED, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 39 - Tang Depo Day 2 Excerpts [Highly Confidential] - SEALED, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 45 - LuxyPro KeyWord Data [Highly Confidential] - SEALED)(Smith, Mark)
November 22, 2021 Filing 204 APPLICATION to file document (Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions) under seal filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Reply ISO of Motion for Sanctions {Redacted}, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 38 - Tang Depo Day 1 Excerpts [Highly Confidential] - REDACTED, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 39 - Tang Depo Day 2 Excerpts [Highly Confidential] - REDACTED, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 45 - LuxyPro KeyWord Data [Highly Confidential] - REDACTED, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Leave to File Under Seal)(Smith, Mark)
November 22, 2021 Filing 203 REPLY In support of Request for Judicial Notice (ECF No. 175) filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer, #2 Exhibit LUXY006745LUXY006755)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 19, 2021 Filing 202 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Opposition to Luxy Limited's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively Summary Adjudication) under seal #198 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45, #2 Exhibit 46, #3 Exhibit 47, #4 Exhibit 48, #5 Exhibit 82)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 201 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Expert Designation, Report, and Declaration of Brian Sowers MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #195 #200 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email re Rebuttal Expert, #2 Declaration of Isaac Eddington in Support of Opposition, #3 Proposed Order Denying Ex Parte Application)(Smith, Mark)
November 18, 2021 Filing 200 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Expert Designation, Report, and Declaration of Brian Sowers MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #195 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Zimmermann, #2 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 199 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Opposition to Luxy Limited's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively Summary Adjudication) under seal #198 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 2-November 12, 2021 Email, #3 Unredacted Document Opposition to Luxy Limited's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Document 2-201921 SA & WYP Revenue [Highly ConfidentialAEO], #5 Unredacted Document 4-Apple Production [Highly Confidential], #6 Unredacted Document 7-Coco Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #7 Unredacted Document 10-EG Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #8 Unredacted Document 17-Luxys RFA Responses, Set One [Confidential], #9 Unredacted Document 22-RL Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #10 Unredacted Document 43-C&D Email [Confidential], #11 Unredacted Document 44-C&D Email Thread [Confidential], #12 Unredacted Document 45-Luxy Complaint 1 [Confidential], #13 Unredacted Document 46-Luxy Complaint 2 [Confidential], #14 Unredacted Document 47-Luxy Complaint 3 [Confidential, #15 Unredacted Document 48-Luxy Complaint 4 [Confidential], #16 Unredacted Document 49-TOU Assignment [Confidential], #17 Unredacted Document 51-Trademark License [Confidential], #18 Unredacted Document 52-Works Assignment [Highly Confidential], #19 Unredacted Document 53-Works License [Highly Confidential], #20 Unredacted Document 54-Privacy Policy Assignment [Highly Confidential], #21 Unredacted Document 76-Kent Report [Confidential], #22 Unredacted Document 78-Vendor Solicitation [Highly Confidential], #23 Unredacted Document 79-Luxy Emails with Apple [Confidential], #24 Unredacted Document 80-Bruno Depo. [Highly Confidential], #25 Unredacted Document 81-Buell Depo. [Highly Confidential], #26 Unredacted Document 82-Tang Depo. Vol. 1 [Highly Confidential], #27 Unredacted Document 83-Tang Depo. Vol. 2 [Highly Confidential], #28 Unredacted Document 84-Wey Depo. [Highly Confidential], #29 Unredacted Document Declaration of Brandon Wey, #30 Unredacted Document Declaration of Leigh Davis-Schmidt, #31 Unredacted Document Declaration of Mark Smith, #32 Unredacted Document Declaration of Ruben Buell, #33 Unredacted Document Declaration of Ruben Buell)(Smith, Mark)
November 15, 2021 Filing 198 APPLICATION to file document (Opposition to Luxy Limited's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively Summary Adjudication) under seal filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition to Luxy Limited's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Redacted Document 2-201921 SA & WYP Revenue [Highly ConfidentialAEO], #3 Redacted Document 4-Apple Production [Highly Confidential], #4 Redacted Document 7-Coco Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #5 Redacted Document 10-EG Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #6 Redacted Document 17-Luxys RFA Responses, Set One [Confidential], #7 Redacted Document 22-RL Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #8 Redacted Document 43-C&D Email [Confidential], #9 Redacted Document 44-C&D Email Thread [Confidential], #10 Redacted Document 45-Luxy Complaint 1 [Confidential], #11 Redacted Document 46-Luxy Complaint 2 [Confidential], #12 Redacted Document 47-Luxy Complaint 3 [Confidential], #13 Redacted Document 48-Luxy Complaint 4 [Confidential], #14 Redacted Document 49-TOU Assignment [Confidential], #15 Redacted Document 51-Trademark License [Confidential], #16 Redacted Document 52-Works Assignment [Highly Confidential], #17 Redacted Document 53-Works License [Highly Confidential], #18 Redacted Document 54-Privacy Policy Assignment [Highly Confidential], #19 Redacted Document 76-Kent Report [Confidential], #20 Redacted Document 78-Vendor Solicitation [Highly Confidential], #21 Redacted Document 79-Luxy Emails with Apple [Confidential], #22 Redacted Document 80-Bruno Depo. [Highly 79-Luxy Emails with Apple [Confidential], #23 Redacted Document 81-Buell Depo. [Highly Confidential], #24 Redacted Document 82-Tang Depo. Vol. 1 [Highly Confidential], #25 Redacted Document 83-Tang Depo. Vol. 2 [Highly Confidential], #26 Redacted Document 84-Wey Depo. [Highly Confidential], #27 Redacted Document Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes, #28 Declaration Declaration of Brandon Wey, #29 Redacted Document Declaration of Kim Long Wey, #30 Redacted Document Declaration of Leigh Davis-Schmidt, #31 Redacted Document Declaration of Mark Smith, #32 Redacted Document Declaration of Ruben Buell, #33 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Seal)(Smith, Mark)
November 15, 2021 Filing 197 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 195) filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Duncan Hall)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 15, 2021 Filing 196 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Misconduct #174 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Zimmermann, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's claims #169 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-AskMen Article, #2 Exhibit 2-201921 SA & WYP Revenue [Highly ConfidentialAEO], #3 Exhibit 3-A Typology of Interpersonal Sugar Relationship Scripts, #4 Exhibit 4-Apple Production [Highly Confidential], #5 Exhibit 5-AppStore Luxy App, #6 Exhibit 6-AppStore Optimize, #7 Exhibit 7-Coco Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #8 Exhibit 8-Daily Dot Article, #9 Exhibit 9-DailyBeast Article, #10 Exhibit 10-EG Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #11 Exhibit 11-Examples of Luxys Ads on Internet, #12 Exhibit 12-Feminist Anthropology Presentation, #13 Exhibit 13-Insider 50 Shades Article, #14 Exhibit 14-Insider Article, #15 Exhibit 15-LA Weekly 10 Best Article, #16 Exhibit 16- LA Weekly Best Rich Dating Article, #17 Exhibit 17-Luxys RFA Responses, Set One, #18 Exhibit 18-Newswire Press Release, #19 Exhibit 19-NY Post Article, #20 Exhibit 20-PlayStore Luxy App, #21 Exhibit 21-Redline of PP SA v. Luxy, #22 Exhibit 22-RL Customer Confusion Reflex Support [Confidential], #23 Exhibit 23-SA 5,177,902, #24 Exhibit 24-Seeking 4,836,358, #25 Exhibit 25-Seeking 5,580,039, #26 Exhibit 26-Seeking Arrangement 3,377,772, #27 Exhibit 27-Seeking Arrangement 4,537,157, #28 Exhibit 28-Seeking Millionaire 3,767,229, #29 Exhibit 29-SEEKING-COM 5,580,788, #30 Exhibit 30-SEEKINGARRANGEMENT.COM 5,357,872, #31 Exhibit 31-Trademarks Assignments, #32 Exhibit 32-Trello AppStore ASO, #33 Exhibit 33-Trello AppStore LuxyPro, #34 Exhibit 34-Trello Google Play Luxy, #35 Exhibit 35-Us Weekly Article, #36 Exhibit 36-Wayback Luxy PP, #37 Exhibit 37-Wayback SA PP, #38 Exhibit 38-Whats Your Price 4,155,033, #39 Exhibit 39-Yahoo News Article, #40 Exhibit 40-Wayback SA TOU, #41 Exhibit 41-Wayback Luxy TOU, #42 Exhibit 42-Redline of TOU SA v Luxy, #43 Exhibit 43-C&D Email [Confidential], #44 Exhibit 44-C&D Email Thread [Confidential], #45 Exhibit 45-Luxy Complaint 1 [Confidential], #46 Exhibit 46-Luxy Complaint 2 [Confidential], #47 Exhibit 47-Luxy Complaint 3 [Confidential], #48 Exhibit 48-Luxy Complaint 4 [Confidential], #49 Exhibit 49-TOU Assignment [Confidential], #50 Exhibit 50-Sowers Survey of Seeking, #51 Exhibit 51-Trademark License [Confidential], #52 Exhibit 52-Works Assignment [Highly Confidential], #53 Exhibit 53-Works License [Highly Confidential], #54 Exhibit 54-Privacy Policy Assignment [Highly Confidential], #55 Exhibit 56-Trademarks Search Volumes, #56 Exhibit 57-Seeking Arrangement Apple App Store, #57 Exhibit 58-Seeking Agreement Infringer Removed from PlayStore, #58 Exhibit 59-Seeking App Reviews, #59 Exhibit 60-Google Play Searches, #60 Exhibit 61-Good Housekeeping Article, #61 Exhibit 62-Seeking Socials, #62 Exhibit 63-CNN Op-ed, #63 Exhibit 64-Best Sugar Sites Blog, #64 Exhibit 65-Uchitel Article, #65 Exhibit 66-Yahoo Finance Seeking, #66 Exhibit 67-Yahoo News Students, #67 Exhibit 68-Yahoo News Teachers, #68 Exhibit 69-Seeking-com AI, #69 Exhibit 70-SugarDatingReviews-com, #70 Exhibit 71-Trademark Google Searches, #71 Exhibit 72-RFAs to Luxy, Set One, #72 Exhibit 73-2.11.20 Wayback of Luxy Website, #73 Exhibit 74-SA App on Play Store, #74 Exhibit 75-DatingScout Luxy Review, #75 Exhibit 76-Kent Report [Confidential], #76 Exhibit 77-TOU and PP Copyright Registrations, #77 Exhibit 78-Vendor Solicitation [Highly Confidential], #78 Exhibit 79-Luxy Emails with Apple [Confidential], #79 Exhibit 80-Bruno Depo. [Highly Confidential], #80 Exhibit 81-Buell Depo. [Highly Confidential], #81 Exhibit 82-Tang Depo. Vol. 1 [Highly Confidential], #82 Exhibit 83-Tang Depo. Vol. 2 [Highly Confidential], #83 Exhibit 84-Wey Depo. [Highly Confidential], #84 Declaration Declaration of Brandon Wey, #85 Declaration Declaration of Kim Long Wey, #86 Declaration Declaration of Leigh Davis-Schmidt, #87 Declaration Declaration of Mark L. Smith, #88 Declaration Declaration of Ruben Buell, #89 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer, #90 Declaration Declaration of Brian Sowers, #91 Plaintiffs' Statements of Genuine Dispute, #92 Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections, #93 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
November 15, 2021 Filing 194 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Luxy's Opposition to Reflex's Motion for Sanctions under seal #193 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Opposition, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 193 APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Luxy's Opposition to Reflex's Motion for Sanctions under seal filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Opposition, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 192 APPLICATION for Leave to file Under Seal Certain Documents In Support of Luxy's Opposition to Reflex's Motion for Sanctions filed by defendant Luxy Limited. Application set for hearing on 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Opposition, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 191 OBJECTIONS to Request for Judicial Notice #175 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 190 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Court's Order Striking Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as Untimely re Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106),, #182 #188 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendant's Motion Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss #145 and the Motion for Relief from Court's Order Striking Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as Untimely #188 , calendared for hearing on November 15, 2021, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 9, 2021 Filing 188 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Court's Order Striking Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as Untimely re Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106),, #182 filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark L. Smith in Support of Motion for Relief, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark)
November 8, 2021 Filing 187 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #170 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Buell in response to Luxy Limited's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1-Protective Order)(Smith, Mark)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS/ COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME #183 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: 1. That Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants' Motion for Relief from the Court's Order Striking Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (the "Motion for Relief") shall be filed no later than November 9, 2021 at 12:00 PM; and 2. That any opposition to the Motion for Relief be filed no later than November 15, 2021 at 12:00 PM. The Motion for Relief will thereafter be taken under submission unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (jre)
November 8, 2021 Filing 185 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion and Memorandum for Sanctions under seal #172 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 8, 2021 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to November 9, 2021 Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from the Court's Order Striking Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as Untimely #183 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited, Counter Claimants Luxy Limited, Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 5, 2021 Filing 183 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to November 9, 2021 Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from the Court's Order Striking Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as Untimely filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark L. Smith in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit 1-Motion for Relief, #3 Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #178 , Sealed Declaration in Support Declaration #179 ; NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All claims #180 , Request for Judicial Notice #181 , for the following reasons: Motion cut-off was November 3, 2021. (jp)
November 4, 2021 Filing 181 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 11/5/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #182 ] - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All claims #180 filed by Plaintiff Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD. (Smith, Mark) Modified on 11/5/2021 (jp).
November 4, 2021 Filing 180 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 11/5/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #182 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All claims filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer, #3 Declaration Declaration of Ruben Buell, #4 Exhibit SA App on AppStore, #5 Exhibit Trademarks Search Volumes, #6 Exhibit 2019-21 SA & WYP Revenue, #7 Exhibit Copyright License, #8 Exhibit EG Customer Confusion, #9 Exhibit Coco Customer Confusion, #10 Exhibit RL Customer Confusion, #11 Exhibit PlayStore Luxy, #12 Exhibit AppStore Luxy, #13 Exhibit SA App on PlayStore, #14 Exhibit 2.11.20 Wayback of Luxy Website, #15 Exhibit AskMen Article, #16 Exhibit DatingScout Luxy Review, #17 Exhibit Tang Depo Vol. 2, #18 Exhibit Bruno Depo, #19 Exhibit Trademark Google Searches, #20 Exhibit Kent Report, #21 Exhibit LA Weekly 10 Best Article, #22 Exhibit LA Weekly Best Rich Dating Article, #23 Exhibit Buell Depo, #24 Exhibit Seeking Arrangement, #25 Exhibit Trademarks Assignment, #26 Exhibit LV Customer Confusion, #27 Exhibit Seeking Millionaire, #28 Exhibit Whats Your Price, #29 Exhibit Seeking 3,835,358, #30 Exhibit Seeking 5,580,039, #31 Exhibit SA, #32 Exhibit SeekingArrangement.com, #33 Exhibit Seeking.com, #34 Exhibit TOU Copyright Registrations, #35 Exhibit PP Copyright Registrations, #36 Exhibit Tang Depo Vol. 1, #37 Exhibit Shuster Depo, #38 Exhibit C&D Email, #39 Exhibit C&D Email Thread, #40 Exhibit Trello - AppStore ASO, #41 Exhibit AppStore Optimize, #42 Exhibit Luxy Emails with Apple, #43 Exhibit AppStore Guidelines Metadata, #44 Exhibit Luxy Homepage 2016 Metadata, #45 Exhibit Luxy FAQ 2018 Metadata, #46 Exhibit Luxy TOU 2019 Metadata, #47 Exhibit Luxy PP 2019 Metadata, #48 Exhibit Luxy Contact Support 2017, #49 Exhibit Trello - Google Play, #50 Exhibit Trello - AppStore, #51 Exhibit Wayback SA PP, #52 Exhibit Wayback SA TOU, #53 Exhibit Wayback Luxy TOU, #54 Exhibit Wayback Luxy PP, #55 Exhibit Redline of TOU SA, #56 Exhibit Redline of PP SA, #57 Exhibit Apple Production, #58 Exhibit Google Production, #59 Exhibit Financial Times Article, #60 Exhibit Luxy Financial Statements, #61 Exhibit Luxy US Financial Statements, #62 Exhibit November 3 Trademark Searches, #63 Exhibit EG Customer Confusion, #64 Exhibit Luxy's RFA Responses, #65 Exhibit RFAs to Luxy, Set One, #66 Exhibit Examples of Luxy's Ads on Internet, #67 Exhibit Declaration of Duncan Hall, #68 Exhibit Reflex v. Chan Order, #69 Exhibit Seeking Arrangement 4,537,157, #70 Proposed Order) (Fonnesbeck, Jacob) Modified on 11/5/2021 (jp).
November 4, 2021 Filing 179 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 11/5/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #182 ] - SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #178 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Meet and Confer Email, #3 Unredacted Document Motion for Summary Judgment {Unredacted}, #4 Unredacted Document Ex. 3 - 201921 SA & WYP Revenue [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL-AEO] -SEALED, #5 Unredacted Document Ex. 4 - Copyright License Agreement [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #6 Unredacted Document Ex. 5 - EG Customer Confusion - Reflex Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #7 Unredacted Document Ex. 6 - Coco Customer Confusion - Reflex Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #8 Unredacted Document Ex. 7 - RL Customer Confusion - Reflex Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #9 Unredacted Document Ex. 14 Tang Depo. Vol. 2 [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #10 Unredacted Document Ex. 15 - Bruno Depo [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #11 Unredacted Document Ex. 17 - Kent Report [Confidential] -SEALED, #12 Unredacted Document Ex. 20 - Buell Depo [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #13 Unredacted Document Ex. 23 - LY Customer Confusion - Luxy Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #14 Unredacted Document Ex. 33 - Tang Depo. Vol. 1 [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #15 Unredacted Document Ex. 34 - Shuster Depo - PR Email [Highly Confidential] -SEALED, #16 Unredacted Document Ex. 35 - C&D Email [Confidential] -SEALED, #17 Unredacted Document Ex. 36 - C&D Email Thread [Confidential] -SEALED, #18 Unredacted Document Ex. 39 - Luxy Emails with Apple [Confidential] -SEALED, #19 Unredacted Document Ex. 54 - Apple Production [Highly Confidential] -SEALED, #20 Unredacted Document Ex. 55 - Google Production [Confidential] -SEALED, #21 Unredacted Document Ex. 57 - Luxy Financial Statements [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #22 Unredacted Document Ex. 58 - Luxy US Financial Statements [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #23 Unredacted Document Ex. 60 - EG Customer Confusion - Luxy Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -SEALED, #24 Unredacted Document [Proposed] Statement of Uncontroverted Facts {Unredacted})(Smith, Mark) Modified on 11/5/2021 (jp).
November 4, 2021 Filing 178 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 11/5/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #182 ] - APPLICATION to file document Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Motion for Summary Judgment {Redacted}_Redacted, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 3 - 201921 SA & WYP Revenue [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL-AEO] -Redacted, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 4 - Copyright License Agreement [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #4 Redacted Document Ex. 5 - EG Customer Confusion - Reflex Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #5 Redacted Document Ex. 6 - Coco Customer Confusion - Reflex Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #6 Redacted Document Ex. 7 - RL Customer Confusion - Reflex Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #7 Redacted Document Ex. 14 Tang Depo. Vol. 2 [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #8 Redacted Document Ex. 15 - Bruno Depo [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #9 Redacted Document Ex. 17 - Kent Report [Confidential] -Redacted, #10 Redacted Document Ex. 20 - Buell Depo [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #11 Redacted Document Ex. 23 - LY Customer Confusion - Luxy Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #12 Redacted Document Ex. 33 - Tang Depo. Vol. 1 [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #13 Redacted Document Ex. 34 - Shuster Depo - PR Email [Highly Confidential] -Redacted, #14 Redacted Document Ex. 35 - C&D Email [Confidential] -Redacted, #15 Redacted Document Ex. 36 - C&D Email Thread [Confidential] -Redacted, #16 Redacted Document Ex. 39 - Luxy Emails with Apple [Confidential] -Redacted, #17 Redacted Document Ex. 54 - Apple Production [Highly Confidential] -Redacted, #18 Redacted Document Ex. 55 - Google Production [Confidential] -Redacted, #19 Redacted Document Ex. 57 - Luxy Financial Statements [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #20 Redacted Document Ex. 58 - Luxy US Financial Statements [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #21 Redacted Document Ex. 60 - EG Customer Confusion - Luxy Support [CONFIDENTIAL] -Redacted, #22 Redacted Document [Proposed] Statement of Uncontroverted Facts Redacted, #23 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Leave to File Under Seal MSJ)(Smith, Mark) Modified on 11/5/2021 (jp).
November 4, 2021 Filing 177 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion and Memorandum for Sanctions under seal #172 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Luxy U.S. Financial Statement (AEO), #2 Unredacted Document Luxy Global Financial Statement (AEO), #3 Unredacted Document Luxy Second Supplemental RFA Responses (Confidential), #4 Unredacted Document Shuster Transcript (AEO), #5 Unredacted Document Purported Cost Chart (AEO))(Smith, Mark)
November 4, 2021 Filing 176 NOTICE of Errata filed by Plaintiffs' Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. re ECF 172 (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Luxy U.S. Financial Statement (AEO), #2 Redacted Document Luxy Global Financial Statement (AEO), #3 Redacted Document Luxy Second Supplemental RFA Responses (Confidential), #4 Redacted Document Shuster Transcript (AEO), #5 Redacted Document Purported Cost Chart (AEO))(Smith, Mark)
November 4, 2021 Filing 175 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Misconduct #174 filed by Plaintiff Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD. (Smith, Mark)
November 4, 2021 Filing 174 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Misconduct filed by Plaintiffs' Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tang Transcript (Vol.1) (AEO), #2 Exhibit GDI Article, #3 Exhibit Tang Transcript (Vol. 2) (AEO), #4 Exhibit Luxy U.S. Financial Statement (AEO), #5 Exhibit Luxy Global Financial Statement (AEO), #6 Exhibit Luxy Second Supplemental RFA Responses (Confidential), #7 Exhibit Luxy Press Release Contact Number, #8 Exhibit Luxy Blog, #9 Exhibit Shuster Transcript (AEO), #10 Exhibit Vice Article re Luxy Press Release, #11 Exhibit Luxys Responses to Reflexs First Set of ROGS, #12 Exhibit Luxy Trademark Application, #13 Exhibit Luxy PowerPoint, #14 Exhibit 2015 Cease and Desist Email (Confidential), #15 Exhibit Dmarge Article, #16 Exhibit Krause LinkedIn Pages, #17 Exhibit Luxys Responses to Reflexs First Set of RFP, #18 Exhibit Trello AppStore ASO, #19 Exhibit AppStore Developer Search Optimization, #20 Exhibit Trello AppStore Keyword Ranking, #21 Exhibit Trello Keyword Ranking, #22 Exhibit Trello Google Play Luxy, #23 Exhibit Google Play January 3, 2017, #24 Exhibit Google Play December 3, 2016, #25 Exhibit Luxys Responses to Reflexs First Set of RFA, #26 Exhibit Reflexs First Requests for Production, #27 Exhibit Apple Production (AEO), #28 Exhibit Luxys June 2020 Press Release, #29 Exhibit Krause Transcript (AEO), #30 Exhibit Prospr USPTO Registration, #31 Exhibit February 2019 Press Release, #32 Exhibit March 2019 Press Release, #33 Exhibit August 2021 Press Release, #34 Exhibit Jimmy Mi Xing Profile, #35 Exhibit Inspiration Tech LLC Ohio Registration, #36 Exhibit Jimmy Mi Facebook, #37 Exhibit Purported Cost Chart (AEO), #38 Declaration of Isaac Eddington in Support of Sanctions, #39 Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer in Support of Motion for Sanctions, #40 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Sanctions) (Smith, Mark)
November 4, 2021 Filing 173 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion and Memorandum for Sanctions under seal #172 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Meet and Confer Email, #3 Unredacted Document Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, #4 Unredacted Document Tang Transcript (Vol.1) (AEO)pt (Vol. 2) (AEO), #5 Unredacted Document Tang Transcript (Vol. 2) (AEO), #6 Unredacted Document 2015 Cease and Desist Email (Confidential), #7 Unredacted Document Apple Production (AEO), #8 Unredacted Document Krause Transcript (AEO))(Smith, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 172 APPLICATION to file document Motion and Memorandum for Sanctions under seal filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, #2 Redacted Document Tang Transcript (Vol.1) (AEO), #3 Redacted Document Tang Transcript (Vol. 2) (AEO), #4 Redacted Document 2015 Cease and Desist Email (Confidential), #5 Redacted Document Apple Production (AEO), #6 Redacted Document Krause Transcript (AEO), #7 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants' Motion for Sanctions)(Smith, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 171 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #170 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Points and Authorities, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Unredacted Document EX C, #4 Unredacted Document EX D, #5 Unredacted Document EX E, #6 Unredacted Document EX K, #7 Unredacted Document EX U, #8 Unredacted Document EX V, #9 Unredacted Document EX W, #10 Unredacted Document EX Y, #11 Unredacted Document EX Z, #12 Unredacted Document EX CC, #13 Unredacted Document EX QQ, #14 Unredacted Document EX RR, #15 Unredacted Document EX SS, #16 Unredacted Document EX VV, #17 Unredacted Document EX E to Tang Dec)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 170 APPLICATION to file document (s) in support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Points and Authorities, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #4 Redacted Document Ex. VV to Zimmermann Dec, #5 Redacted Document Ex. E to Tang Dec)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 169 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's claims filed by defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Declaration of Hal Poret, #4 Exhibit A to Poret Dec, #5 Declaration of Ashley Wong, #6 Exhibit A to Wong Dec, #7 Exhibit B to Wong Dec, #8 Exhibit C to Wong Dec, #9 Exhibit D to Wong Dec, #10 Exhibit E to Wong Dec, #11 Exhibit F to Wong Dec, #12 Exhibit G to Wong Dec, #13 Exhibit H to Wong Dec, #14 Exhibit I to Wong Dec, #15 Exhibit J to Wong Dec, #16 Exhibit K to Wong Dec, #17 Exhibit L to Wong Dec, #18 Exhibit M to Wong Dec, #19 Exhibit N to Wong Dec, #20 Exhibit O to Wong Dec, #21 Exhibit P to Wong Dec, #22 Exhibit Q to Wong Dec, #23 Exhibit R to Wong Dec, #24 Exhibit S to Wong Dec, #25 Exhibit T to Wong Dec, #26 Exhibit U to Wong Dec, #27 Exhibit V to Wong Dec, #28 Exhibit W to Wong Dec, #29 Exhibit X to Wong Dec, #30 Declaration of Tim Tang, #31 Exhibit A to Tang Dec, #32 Exhibit B to Tang Dec, #33 Exhibit C to Tang Dec, #34 Exhibit D to Tang Dec, #35 Exhibit E to Tang Dec, #36 Declaration of Zimmermann, #37 Exhibit Av, #38 Exhibit B to Zimmermann Dec, #39 Exhibit C to Zimmermann Dec, #40 Exhibit D to Zimmermann Dec, #41 Exhibit E to Zimmermann Dec, #42 Exhibit F to Zimmermann Dec, #43 Exhibit G to Zimmermann Dec, #44 Exhibit H to Zimmermann Dec, #45 Exhibit I to Zimmermann Dec, #46 Exhibit J to Zimmermann Dec, #47 Exhibit K to Zimmermann Dec, #48 Exhibit L to Zimmermann Dec, #49 Exhibit M to Zimmermann Dec, #50 Exhibit N to Zimmermann Dec, #51 Exhibit O to Zimmermann Dec, #52 Exhibit P to Zimmermann Dec, #53 Exhibit Q to Zimmermann Dec, #54 Exhibit R to Zimmermann Dec, #55 Exhibit S to Zimmermann Dec, #56 Exhibit T to Zimmermann Dec, #57 Exhibit U to Zimmermann Dec, #58 Exhibit V to Zimmermann Dec, #59 Exhibit W to Zimmermann Dec, #60 Exhibit X to Zimmermann Dec, #61 Exhibit W to Zimmermann Dec, #62 Exhibit Z to Zimmermann Dec, #63 Exhibit AA to Zimmermann Dec, #64 Exhibit BB to Zimmermann Dec, #65 Exhibit CC to Zimmermann Dec, #66 Exhibit DD to Zimmermann Dec, #67 Exhibit EE to Zimmermann Dec, #68 Exhibit FF to Zimmermann Dec, #69 Exhibit GG to Zimmermann Dec, #70 Exhibit HH to Zimmermann Dec, #71 Exhibit II to Zimmermann Dec, #72 Exhibit JJ to Zimmermann Dec, #73 Exhibit KK to Zimmermann Dec, #74 Exhibit LL to Zimmermann Dec, #75 Exhibit MM to Zimmermann Dec, #76 Exhibit NN to Zimmermann Dec, #77 Exhibit OO to Zimmermann Dec, #78 Exhibit PP to Zimmermann Dec, #79 Exhibit QQ to Zimmermann Dec, #80 Exhibit RR to Zimmermann Dec, #81 Exhibit SS to Zimmermann Dec, #82 Exhibit TT to Zimmermann Dec, #83 Exhibit UU to Zimmermann Dec, #84 Exhibit VV to Zimmermann Dec, #85 Exhibit WW to Zimmermann Dec, #86 Exhibit XX to Zimmermann Dec, #87 Exhibit YY to Zimmermann Dec, #88 Exhibit ZZ to Zimmermann Dec, #89 Exhibit AAA to Zimmermann Dec, #90 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 168 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss,, #127 #145 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Luxy Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Donna Boss at dboss@kilpatricktownsend.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 166 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10-15-21 re Transcript #165 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Prado, Araceli) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2021 Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10-15-21. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2022. (Prado, Araceli)
October 27, 2021 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Melina Casack at mcasack@sffirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Mark)
October 25, 2021 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss,, #127 #145 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - November Emails, #2 Exhibit 2 - Booking Survey, #3 Exhibit 3 - SEEKING ALPHA Mark, #4 Declaration of Mark L. Smith In Support of Opposition to Luxy Limited's Motion for Clarification and/or Motion for Reconsideration, #5 Proposed Order Denying Luxy Limited's Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsideration)(Smith, Mark)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: denying #94 Motion to Compel. The Motion is DENIED in its entirety. Each party to bear their own cost. (see document for further details) (hr)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Stipulation for Discovery #150 . (See attached Order for further specifics). (jp)
October 20, 2021 Filing 160 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: The Motion is GRANTED as to Clover8 ROG No. 3. On or before the expiration of the discovery cut-off, Plaintiffs must provide a supplemental response to Clover8 ROG No. 3 that identifies the specific elements of the protected works that Plaintiffs contend are "original" and/or "expressive" text. The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. All parties to bear their own costs. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Granting in part and denying in part #85 Motion to Compel (im)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Deadlines [DE #91 ]; Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's Scheduling Conference Order for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint [DE #97 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motions. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Hearing Date on its Motion for Reconsideration [DE #149 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Defendant's Ex Parte Application. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES [DKT. NO. 115] by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: Category No. 1: The Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' ROGs Nos. 14 and 15 and RFPs Nos. 16, 46, and 47. Within three (3) days of the date of this Order, Defendant shall serve supplemental responses to Plaintiffs' ROGs Nos. 14 and 15 and RFPs Nos. 16, 46, and 47 that include information concerning its international sales, revenues, and profits. Category No. 4: The Motion is DENIED as to RFA No. 96. Defendant's objections to RFA No. 96 are sustained and no supplemental response is required. Category No. 5: The Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' RFAs No. 12, 18, 19, 20, 145, 148, 149, and 150. Within three (3) days of the date of this Order, Defendant must provide complete, nonevasive responses compliant with Rule 36(a)(4) to Plaintiffs' RFAs Nos. 12, 18, 19, 20, 145, 148, 149, and 150. Category No. 7: The Motion is DENIED as to RFA No. 76. Defendant's objections to RFA No. 76 are sustained. Category No. 10: The Motion is DENIED as to documents concerning "tests" and/or "studies" in response to RFP No. 59. However, to the extent Defendant has not completed its production of responsive documents concerning "studies" or "surveys" that it located through its search and investigation, Defendant must produce any additional responsive documents in response to RFP No. 59 within three (3) days of the date of this Order. Category No. 11: The Motion is DENIED as to RFP No. 71. Because the Motion is granted in part and denied in part, the Court exercises its discretion and declines to apportion the reasonable expenses for the motion. FED. R. CIV. P. 37 (A)(5)(c). Each party to bear its own costs. (lom)
October 18, 2021 Filing 156 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10-12-2021 re Transcript #155 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Montes, Janelly) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 18, 2021 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10-12-2021. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2022. (Montes, Janelly)
October 18, 2021 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss,, #127 #145 to 10/19/2021 #149 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #132 Non-Resident Attorney Brittany K. Knutson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited, designating Kollin J. Zimmermann as local counsel. (shb)
October 17, 2021 Filing 152 Reflex Media, Inc., and Clover8 Investments Pte Ltd.'s ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #71 filed by Counterclaim-defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD(a Singapore Corporation), Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation).(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ISSUED TO THE SF FIRM LLP AND REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER [DKT. NO. 146] by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Having thoroughly considered the parties briefing and the arguments of counsel at the hearing, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Motion to Quash. #146 The parties are directed to promptly meet and confer to set a mutually convenient date for the SF Firm deposition pursuant to the SF Subpoena. The Court declines to award sanctions to either party. All parties to bear their own costs. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1) (gr)
October 15, 2021 Filing 150 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Holding Certain Depositions After the Discovery Cut-Off Date filed by defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 149 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss,, #127 #145 to 10/19/2021 filed by defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Zimmermann ISO Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 148 REPLY in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena for the deposition of SF Firm LLP and for a Protective Order #146 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
October 14, 2021 Filing 147 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Quash Subpoena for the deposition of SF Firm LLP and for a Protective Order #146 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 146 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Subpoena for the deposition of SF Firm LLP and for a Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaac J. Eddington in Support of Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants' and the SF Firm LLP's Motion to Quash the F.R.C.P. 45 Subpoena Issued to the SF Firm LLP and for a Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena on SF Firm, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Subpoena on SF Firm, #4 Exhibit 3 - Copyright Documents, #5 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Copyright Office Circulate 30, #6 Exhibit 5 - Clover8s Initial Rog Responses, #7 Exhibit 6 - First Supplemental Rog Responses, #8 Exhibit 7 - Second Supplemental Rog Responses, #9 Exhibit 8 - October 4 Email, #10 Exhibit 9 - Oct. 3 Order (ECF 127), #11 Exhibit 10 - Oct. 5 Email, #12 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants' and the SF Firm LLP's Motion to Quash the F.R.C.P. 45 Subpoena Issued to the SF Firm LLP and for a Protective Order)(Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
October 14, 2021 Filing 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss,, #127 filed by defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Clarification, #2 Declaration of K. Zimmermann ISO Motion for Clarification, #3 1 (part 1), #4 1 (part 2), #5 2, #6 3, #7 4, #8 5, #9 6, #10 7, #11 8, #12 9, #13 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE (IN-CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING SEPARATE FILING OF DEFENDANTS' AND SF FIRM LLP'S MOTION TO QUASH by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Defendants are ordered to immediately file Defendants' and the SF Firm LLP's Motion to Quash the F.R.C.P. 45 Subpoena Issued to the SF Firm and for a Protective Order (the "Motion to Quash"), as a separate document for the Court's review. The Motion to Quash, which was previously submitted as an attachment with the Defendants' Ex Parte Application to shorten time on the Motion to Quash (dkt. no. 134-2), will be deemed filed as of October 12, 2021, the date of its initial submission. (hr)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR THE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ISSUED TO THE SF FIRM LLP AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #134 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing. Defendant may file an Opposition to the Motion to Quash no later than 7 p.m. today, October 14, 2021. Plaintiff may file an optional reply no later than 8 a.m. on Friday, October 15, 2021. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash and for a Protective Order on Friday, October 15, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The Courtroom Deputy will provide the call-in information. (see document for further details) (hr)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint #97 , calendared for hearing on October 18, 2021 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The court will review the matter without hearing any further arguments in person or on paper. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 14, 2021 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Luxy Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Babykin Courthouse ServicesTranscript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 13, 2021 Filing 139 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 09-30-2021 re Transcript #138 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Prado, Araceli) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 13, 2021 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 09-30-2021. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2022. (Prado, Araceli)
October 13, 2021 Filing 137 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to October 14, 2021 Re: Motion to Quash FRCP 45 Subpoena and for a Protective Order #134 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR THE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ISSUED TO THE SF FIRM LLP AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing #134 . Plaintiff indicates that the Ex Parte Application will be opposed. Upon receipt of the opposition, the Ex Parte Application will be taken under submission and the hearing scheduled for Thursday, October 14, 2021, at 10 a.m., is hereby VACATED. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument. An order will issue. (hr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 135 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for October 12, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
October 12, 2021 Filing 134 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to October 14, 2021 Re: Motion to Quash FRCP 45 Subpoena and for a Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application, #2 Motion to Quash FRCP 45 Subpoena, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Quash FRCP 45 Subpoena, #4 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Ex Parte Application and Motion to Quash FRCP 45 Subpoena, #5 Exhibit 1-Subpoena on SF Firm, #6 Exhibit 2-Notice of Subpoena on SF Firm, #7 Exhibit 3-Copyright Documents, #8 Exhibit 4-U.S. Copyright Office Circulate 30, #9 Exhibit 5-Clover8s Initial Rog Responses, #10 Exhibit 6-First Supplemental Rog Responses, #11 Exhibit 7-Second Supplemental Rog Responses, #12 Exhibit 8-October 4 Email, #13 Exhibit 9-Oct. 3 Order (ECF 127), #14 Exhibit 10-Oct. 5 Email) (Smith, Mark)
October 12, 2021 Filing 133 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation) for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Pia Martinez at pmartinez@sffirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Mark)
October 8, 2021 Filing 132 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany T. Knutson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32123719) filed by defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re: Second MOTION to Compel #94 . Counsel are notified that, on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant Luxy Limited's Second Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 94), scheduled for Wednesday, October 13, 2021, at 10 a.m., is hereby VACATED. The motion is now fully briefed and the Court deems this matter suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the motion is taken under submission. An Order will issue. (hr)
October 5, 2021 Filing 130 Luxy's Opposition Letter Brief filed by Defendant Luxy Limited re: Discovery Hearing,,, Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,, #109 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 4, 2021 Filing 129 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Conference - optional html form, #52 #97 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Reply ISO Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and For Leave to File TAC, #2 Exhibit 1-Aug. 19 Email, #3 Exhibit 2-Rog Responses Set 2, #4 Exhibit 3-July 15 RFA Responses, #5 Exhibit 4-Luxys July 15 RFP Responses, #6 Exhibit 5-Press Release, #7 Exhibit 6-Contact - SuccessfulMatch, #8 Exhibit 7-Contact MillionaireMatch.com, #9 Exhibit 8-Contact SugarDaddyMeet, #10 Exhibit 9-Sept. 29 Email, #11 Exhibit 10-April 14 Email, #12 Exhibit 11-Aug. 19 Disc. M&C Email, #13 Exhibit 12-Luxy ASO, #14 Exhibit 13-Translation Excerpt)(Smith, Mark)
October 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #123 Non-Resident Attorney H Forrest Flemming, III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited, designating Kollin Zimmermann as local counsel. (jp)
October 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses [DE #77 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's counterclaims, and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses.3 Defendant's first and fourth through ninth counterclaims are dismissed, and Defendant's first, third through eighth, eleventh, and fourteenth affirmative defenses are stricken. Only Defendant's second and third counterclaims, and second and ninth affirmative defenses remain. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
October 1, 2021 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation) for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Pia Martinez at pmartinez@sffirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Mark)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner DENYING #118 , Non-Resident Attorney H Forrest Flemming, III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited, designating Kollin Zimmermann as local counsel. (jp) Modified on 10/3/2021 (sw).
September 30, 2021 Filing 124 MINUTES OF ZOOM VIDEO TELECONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE settling #117 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. After reviewing the parties' pre-conference submission and hearing the statements and arguments of counsel, the Court rules as follows: (see document for further details). The Court will hold a follow up discovery status conference on Thursday, October 7, 2021 at 4 p.m. Court Recorder: ZOOM VTC- 09/30/2021. (hr)
September 30, 2021 Filing 123 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney H. Forrest Flemming III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/29/2021, Receipt No. 32066985) filed by defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 122 SUPPLEMENT to Second MOTION to Compel to serve amended discovery responses and prodeuce responsive documents #94 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 121 SUPPLEMENT to Second MOTION to Compel to serve amended discovery responses and prodeuce responsive documents #94 Supplemental Discovery Brief in Opposition to Luxy's Second Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Isaac Eddington in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Discovery Brief in Opposition to Luxy's Second Motion to Compel)(Smith, Mark)
September 29, 2021 Filing 120 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney H. Forrest Flemming III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32066985) #118 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #109 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Having reviewed the Smith Affidavit and for good cause shown, the Court finds that the September 21, 2021 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (hr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 118 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney H. Forrest Flemming III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32066985) filed by defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 117 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for September 30, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The Zoom log-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Deadlines #91 , calendared for hearing on October 4, 2021 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The court will review the matter without hearing any further arguments in person or on paper. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 28, 2021 Filing 115 Plaintiffs' Opening Letter Brief filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc. re: Discovery Hearing,,, Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,, #109 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Plaintiffs' Opening Letter Brief, #2 Declaration of J. Schaeffer ISO Plaintiffs' Opening Letter Brief, #3 Exhibit 1 - Conf. Email, #4 Exhibit 2 - Request Confirmation, #5 Exhibit 3 - Luxy's Responses to Reflex's First Set of Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit 4 - Luxy's Responses to Reflex's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit 5 - Luxy's Responses to Reflex's First Set of Requests for Admission, #8 Exhibit 6 - Luxy's Responses to Reflex's Second Set of Requests for Production, #9 Exhibit 7 - First Set of Interrogatories to Luxy Limited, #10 Exhibit 8 - First Set of Requests for Production to Luxy Limited, #11 Exhibit 9 - First Set of Requests for Admission to Luxy Limited, #12 Exhibit 10 - Second Set of Requests for Production to Luxy Limited, #13 Exhibit 11 - Sept. 21 Hearing Transcript, #14 Exhibit 12 - Sept. 21 Order, #15 Exhibit 13 - Smith Affidavit, #16 Exhibit 14 - Krause Interview, #17 Exhibit 15 - Google Play Screenshot, #18 Exhibit 16 - Google Play Screenshot 2, #19 Exhibit 17 - Luxy PP, #20 Exhibit 18 - Ma LinkedIn Page, #21 Exhibit 19 - Ma Facebook Page, #22 Exhibit 20 - Ma Facebook Page 2, #23 Exhibit 21 - Inspiration Tech Registration, #24 Exhibit 22 - Luxy Press Release, #25 Exhibit 23 - NY Post Article, #26 Exhibit 24 - Mixy Apple App, #27 Exhibit 25 - Mixy TM Reg., #28 Exhibit 26 - Luxy PowerPoint, #29 Exhibit 27 - Vice Article, #30 Exhibit 28 - CA Sec. of State SuccessfulMatch Webpage, #31 Exhibit 29 - MillionaireMatch Service Agreement, #32 Exhibit 30 - Luxy Press Release (416 phone number), #33 Exhibit 31 - Millionaire Match Contact, #34 Exhibit 32 - SugarDaddyMeet Contact, #35 Exhibit 33 - SuccessfulMatch Contact, #36 Exhibit 34 - Luxy Bitcoin PR, #37 Exhibit 35 - Luxy FAQ, #38 Exhibit 36 - Feb.5 Order, #39 Exhibit 37 - Luxy's Answer, #40 Exhibit 38 - Du LinkedIn, #41 Exhibit 39 - Du Article, #42 Exhibit 40 - Luxy Ownership, #43 Exhibit 41 - MM 2013 Screenshot, #44 Exhibit 42 - Luxy 2014 Screenshot, #45 Exhibit 43 - Aug. 4 Hearing Transcript, #46 Exhibit 44 - Meet-and-Confer Letter Re Luxy Discovery Responses)(Smith, Mark) Modified on 10/6/2021 (hr).
September 28, 2021 Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Mark L. Smith re Discovery Hearing,,, Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,, #109 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc. (Smith, Mark)
September 27, 2021 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Conference - optional html form, #52 #97 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Zimmermann, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 27, 2021 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Luxy Limited for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Donna Boss at dboss@kilpatricktownsend.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 24, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9-21-21 re Transcript #110 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Henderson, Terri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 24, 2021 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9-21-21. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/15/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2021. (Henderson, Terri)
September 22, 2021 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation) for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Pia Martinez at pmartinez@sffirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Mark)
September 21, 2021 Filing 109 MINUTES OF VIDEO TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling #105 Motion RE Informal Discovery held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court issues an Order to Show Cause why Mr. Smith should not be prevented from reviewing Defendant's financial data based on an alleged conflict of interest. The Court has authorized expedited letter briefing of no more than ten (10) pages on the unresolved discovery issues. Plaintiff's opening letter brief is due on Tuesday, September 28, 2021. Defendant's letter brief in response is due on Tuesday, October 5, 2021. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) Court Recorder: Zoom VTC-09/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (gr)
September 20, 2021 Filing 107 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/21/2022 #91 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit 1-Aug. 19 Email, #3 Exhibit 2-Domain Report DatingBlock.biz, #4 Exhibit 3-Domain Report DatingBlock.info, #5 Exhibit 4-Domain Report millionairedatingluxy.com, #6 Exhibit 5-Domain Report Luxy.us, #7 Exhibit 6-Aug. 10 Email, #8 Exhibit 7-Meet-and-Confer Letter, #9 Exhibit 8-Luxy Limited Annual Returns, #10 Exhibit 9-SuccessfulMatcg.com Statement of Information, #11 Exhibit 10-Webpage from SugarDaddyMeet.com, #12 Exhibit 11-Webpage from MillionaireMatch.com, #13 Declaration of J. Schaeffer ISO Reply, #14 Exhibit 12-SugarDaddysMatch Video Stills)(Smith, Mark)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: denying #99 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing. (hr)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL #85 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Counsel are notified that, on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant Luxy Limited Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 85), scheduled for Wednesday, September 22, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby VACATED. The motion is now fully briefed and the Court deems this matter suitable for decision without oral argument. (hr)
September 16, 2021 Filing 105 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The parties have requested an informal discovery conference with Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The pre-motion discovery conference is scheduled for September 21, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The Zoom log-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr) Modified on 9/17/2021 (hr).
September 14, 2021 Filing 103 Opposition re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Second MOTION to Compel to serve amended discovery responses and prodeuce responsive documents #94 to 09/29/2021 #99 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Luxy Limited's Ex Parte Application)(Smith, Mark)
September 13, 2021 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/21/2022 #91 (AMENDED) filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/21/2022 #91 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann, #2 Exhibit 1-9, #3 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 99 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Second MOTION to Compel to serve amended discovery responses and prodeuce responsive documents #94 to 09/29/2021 filed by defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann, #2 Exhibit 1-27, #3 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 98 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Conference - optional html form, #52 #97 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
September 10, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Conference - optional html form, #52 filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Luxy's Responses to Reflex's Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Luxy's TM Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - December 30, 2014 Luxy Website Screenshot, #4 Exhibit 4 - WHOIS SeekingElites.com, #5 Exhibit 5 - WHOIS DatingOpinions.com, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - SugarDaddyMeet.SeekingElite Google Play Webpage, #7 Exhibit 7 - Luxy June 14, 2019 Blog Post, #8 Exhibit 8 - April 14, 2021 Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Luxy's 2021 Annual Return, #10 Declaration of Isaac Eddington in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Conference Order [ECF 52], #11 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Conference Order [ECF 52], #12 [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Third Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Third Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Third Amended Complaint, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Third Amended Complaint, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Third Amended Complaint, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Third Amended Complaint, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Third Amended Complaint, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Third Amended Complaint, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Third Amended Complaint, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Third Amended Complaint, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Third Amended Complaint, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Third Amended Complaint, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Third Amended Complaint, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Third Amended Complaint, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Third Amended Complaint, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Third Amended Complaint, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to Third Amended Complaint, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to Third Amended Complaint, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 19 to Third Amended Complaint, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 20 to Third Amended Complaint) (Smith, Mark)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Motion to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Second Amended Counterclaims (ECF No. #77 ) calendared for hearing on September 13, 2021 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)
September 9, 2021 Filing 95 TEXT ONLY IN CHAMBERS ORDER: Per the Courts Scheduling Conference Order (ECF No. #52 ), the last day to motion the Court to amend the complaint is June 1, 2021. This date has passed. As such, the Court STRIKES Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. #89 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
September 9, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION to Compel to serve amended discovery responses and prodeuce responsive documents filed by defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann, #3 1, #4 2, #5 3, #6 4, #7 5, #8 6, #9 7, #10 8, #11 9, #12 10, #13 11, #14 12, #15 13, #16 14, #17 15, #18 16, #19 17, #20 18, #21 19, #22 20, #23 21, #24 22, #25 23, #26 24, #27 25, #28 Declaration of Isaac Eddington, #29 26, #30 27, #31 28, #32 29, #33 30, #34 31, #35 32, #36 33, #37 34, #38 35, #39 36, #40 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 8, 2021 Filing 93 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). regarding MOTION to Compel To Serve Amended Discovery and Produce Documents #85 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of I. Eddington ISO Supplemental Discovery Brief, #2 Exhibit A-Suppl. Copy of Relevant Portions of Luxys Motion to Dismiss SAC)(Smith, Mark)
September 8, 2021 Filing 92 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel To Serve Amended Discovery and Produce Documents #85 (First Motion) filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
September 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Isaac J. Eddington to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Reflex Media, Inc. and Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., designating Mark L. Smith as local counsel #88 . (gk)
September 6, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/21/2022 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Luxy's Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 14, 2021, Email Thread, #3 Exhibit 3 - July 15, 2021 Reponses to Requests for Production, #4 Exhibit 4 - July 15, 2021, Interrogatory Responses, #5 Exhibit 5 - August 10, 2021, Email Thead Among Counsel, #6 Declaration of Isaac J. Eddington in Support of Plaintiffs'/Counter-Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Extension of Deadlines, #7 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Extenstion of Deadlines) (Smith, Mark)
September 6, 2021 Filing 90 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #58 #89 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
September 6, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #58 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Luxy's Responses to Reflex's Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Luxy's TM Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - December 30, 2014 Luxy Website Screenshot, #4 Exhibit 4 - WHOIS SeekingElites.com, #5 Exhibit 5 - WHOIS DatingOpinions.com, #6 Exhibit 6 - SugarDaddyMeet.SeekingElite Google Play Webpage, #7 Exhibit 7 - Luxy June 14, 2019 Blog Post, #8 Exhibit 8 - April 14, 2021 Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Luxy's 2021 Annual Return, #10 Declaration of Isaac Eddington in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, #11 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, #12 [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit 1 to Third Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit 2 to Third Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit 3 to Third Amended Complaint, #16 Exhibit 4 to Third Amended Complaint, #17 Exhibit 5 to Third Amended Complaint, #18 Exhibit 6 to Third Amended Complaint, #19 Exhibit 7 to Third Amended Complaint, #20 Exhibit 8 to Third Amended Complaint, #21 Exhibit 9 to Third Amended Complaint, #22 Exhibit 10 to Third Amended Complaint, #23 Exhibit 11 to Third Amended Complaint, #24 Exhibit 12 to Third Amended Complaint, #25 Exhibit 13 to Third Amended Complaint, #26 Exhibit 14 to Third Amended Complaint, #27 Exhibit 15 to Third Amended Complaint, #28 Exhibit 16 to Third Amended Complaint, #29 Exhibit 17 to Third Amended Complaint, #30 Exhibit 18 to Third Amended Complaint, #31 Exhibit 19 to Third Amended Complaint, #32 Exhibit 20 to Third Amended Complaint) (Smith, Mark)
September 3, 2021 Filing 88 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Isaac J. Eddington to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31929694) filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark)
August 30, 2021 Filing 87 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Second Amended Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses #77 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
August 30, 2021 Filing 86 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Second Amended Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses #77 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10-Luxy Blog Entry, #2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of J. Schaeffer in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Strike)(Smith, Mark)
August 25, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel To Serve Amended Discovery and Produce Documents filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Regarding Luxy Limited's First Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Kollin Zimmerman ISO Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4a, #7 Exhibit 4b, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Declaration Of I. Eddington ISO Joint Motion to Compel, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
August 23, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/19/21 re Transcript #83 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jlo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 23, 2021 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/19/21. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/13/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021. (jlo)
August 23, 2021 Filing 82 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Second Amended Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses #77 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited, Counter Claimants Luxy Limited, Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann ISO Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email correspondence, #3 Exhibit 2 - Reflex RFPs to Luxy, #4 Exhibit 3 - Ex. N to Luxy's SAC, #5 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 81 MINUTES OF ZOOM VIDEO TELECONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling #79 Motion Re Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Plaintiffs shall serve supplemental responses within ten (10) days of the date of this Order; the parties are directed to engage in further meet and confer discussions within ten (10) days of the date of this Order; Defendant may file a motion to compel in the Joint Stipulation format, pursuant to Local Rule 37-2, no earlier than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. The parties may submit a joint email statement outlining any further discovery disputes no later than Monday, August 23, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. A pre-motion discovery conference to discuss the additional discovery disputes is scheduled for Tuesday, August 24, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. via Zoom video conference. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: ZOOM VTC- 08/19//2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (hr)
August 19, 2021 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation) for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Pia Martinez at pmartinez@sffirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Mark)
August 12, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The discovery motion conference is scheduled for August 19, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The Zoom VTC log-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
August 10, 2021 Filing 78 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Second Amended Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses #77 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
August 10, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Second Amended Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - RE_Status in Reflex Media v. Luxy Matter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Apr. 14 Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Aug. 4-5 Emails, #4 Exhibit 4 - Luxy Press Release, #5 Exhibit 5 - Luxy TM Application, #6 Exhibit 6 - Meriam-Webster Thesaurus Entry for Dating, #7 Exhibit 7 - Meriam-Webster Definition of Seek, #8 Exhibit 8 - SW Trademark, #9 Exhibit 9 - SL Trademark, #10 Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Strike, #11 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and Strike) (Smith, Mark)
August 9, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/4/21 re Transcript #75 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2021 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/4/21. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2021. (ha)
August 5, 2021 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. (a Nevada corporation) for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Pia Martinez at pmartinez@sffirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Mark)
August 4, 2021 Filing 74 MINUTES OF VIDEO TELECONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling #72 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Having considered the statements and arguments of counsel during the conference, the Court orders the following: Supplemental Responses Required - Issues Nos. 2 and 8: Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, as to Issue No. 2, Plaintiffs shall serve supplemental responses that comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34(b)(2)'s requirement (see document for further details). Court Recorder: ZOOM VTC- 08/04//2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (hr)
August 2, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The discovery conference is scheduled for Wednesday, August 4, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The Zoom log-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
July 27, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #58 (Second), Second COUNTERCLAIM against Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) [DE #59 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (et)
June 10, 2021 Filing 69 OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other), #67 of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority filed by Defendant Luxy Limited, Counter Claimant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim #59 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Mark)
June 9, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Order Denying as Moot Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment as a Sanction for Misconduct and Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment)(Smith, Mark)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Luxy Limited's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim #59 , calendared for hearing on June 14, 2021 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The court will review the matter without hearing any further arguments in person or on paper. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2021 Filing 65 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim #59 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
May 25, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Mark L. Smith counsel for Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Changing firm name to SF Firm, LLP. Changing e-mail to msmith@sffirm.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
May 25, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jacob Lex Fonnesbeck counsel for Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Changing firm name to SF Firm, LLP. Changing e-mail to jfonnesbeck@sffirm.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Fonnesbeck, Jacob)
May 24, 2021 Filing 62 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim #59 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Smith in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1-Counterclaim Correspondence)(Smith, Mark)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson re Stipulation for Protective Order #60 . (see document for details) (hr)
May 13, 2021 Filing 60 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc..(Smith, Mark)
May 12, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Suport of Luxy Limited's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Kollin J. Zimmermann, #3 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
April 28, 2021 Filing 58 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Luxy Limited amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #17 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Reflex Media, Inc., Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Smith, Mark)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION RE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #56 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Reflex shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than one business day after this order is signed. Luxy consents to this amendment as per Federal Civil Rule 15(a)(2). 2. Luxy shall have (as per Federal Civil Rule 15(a)(3)) fourteen days from the date of Reflex's filing of a Second Amended Complaint to file an Answer and Second Amended Counterclaim or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Reflex consents to Luxy's filing of a Second Amended Counterclaim as per Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). See order for further details. (lom)
April 27, 2021 Filing 56 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Amend Complaint and Amend Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Mark)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than November 19, 2021. (sw)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 9:00 am; Jury Trial set for 1/11/2022 at 9:00 am. See Order for details. (sw)
April 26, 2021 Filing 52 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2021. Discovery cut-off 10/21/2021. Motions due by 11/3/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 9:00 am. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2022 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (sw)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENIED ON JOINT STIPULATION RE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #51 by Judge R. Gary Klausne. (lom)
April 22, 2021 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Amend Complaint and Amend Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Mark)
April 19, 2021 Filing 50 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc... (Smith, Mark)
April 12, 2021 Filing 49 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Amended Counterclaim #48 filed by Plaintiff Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Counter Defendant Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD. (Smith, Mark)
April 12, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Amended Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Trademark Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark #1 Certificate, #3 Exhibit 3 - SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark #2 Certificate, #4 Exhibit 4 - SEEKING Trademark #1 Certificate, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sec. 15 SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Sec. 15 SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #1 Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sec. 15 SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #2 Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sec. 15 SEEKING #1 Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 - SEEKING Trademark #2 Certificate, #10 Exhibit 10 - SEEKING Trademark #3 Certificate, #11 Exhibit 11 - SA Trademark Certificate, #12 Exhibit 12 - SA Specimen, #13 Exhibit 13 - SEEKINGARRANGEMENT.COM Trademark Certificate, #14 Exhibit 14 - SEEKING.COM Trademark Certificate, #15 Exhibit 15 - 955 Registration Certificate, #16 Exhibit 16 - 171 Registration Certificate, #17 Exhibit 17 - 703 Registration Certificate, #18 Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer in Support of Plaintiff/Counter-defendant's Motion to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Amended Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #19 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff/Counter-defendant's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Luxy Limited's Amended Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)) (Smith, Mark)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. According to court records, on March 29, 2021, defendant(s) filed an Amended Answer and Amended Counterclaim #46 . Therefore, plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss #45 , is denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2021 Filing 46 AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) and AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #17 (FIRST) filed by defendant and counter-claimant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
March 15, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaac Eddington in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit 1-SEEKING Trademark #1 Certificate, #4 Exhibit 2-SEEKING Trademark #2 Certificate, #5 Exhibit 3-SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Trademark Certificate, #6 Exhibit 4-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark #1 Certificate, #7 Exhibit 5-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark #2 Certificate, #8 Exhibit 6-SA Trademark Certificate, #9 Exhibit 7-SEEKINGARRANGEMENT.COM Trademark Certificate, #10 Exhibit 8-SEEKING.COM Trademark Certificate, #11 Exhibit 9-WHATS YOUR PRICE Trademark Certificate, #12 Exhibit 10-Sec. 15 SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11-SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Notice of Acceptance, #14 Exhibit 12-Sec. 15 SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #1 Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #1 Notice of Acceptance, #16 Exhibit 14-Sec. 15 SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #2 Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #2 Notice of Acceptance, #18 Exhibit 16-Sec. 15 WHATS YOUR PRICE Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17-WHATS YOUR PRICE Notice of Acceptance, #20 Exhibit 18-SA Specimen, #21 Exhibit 19-Terms of Use Registration, #22 Exhibit 20-Privacy Policy Registration, #23 Exhibit 21-Trademark Assignment, #24 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion, #25 Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b)(6) #43 , for the following reasons: Memorandum of Points and Authorities contains single-spaced text at page 8. LR 11-3.6. (jp)
March 12, 2021 Filing 43 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 3/15/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #44 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Luxy Limited's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaac Eddington in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-SEEKING Trademark #1 Certificate, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2-SEEKING Trademark #2 Certificate, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3-SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Trademark Certificate, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark #1 Certificate, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark #2 Certificate, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6-SA Trademark Certificate, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7-SEEKINGARRANGEMENT.COM Trademark Certificate, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8-SEEKING.COM Trademark Certificate, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9-WHATS YOUR PRICE Trademark Certificate, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10-Sec. 15 SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11-SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Notice of Acceptance, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12-Sec. 15 SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #1 Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #1 Notice of Acceptance, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14-Sec. 15 SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #2 Declaration, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15-SEEKING ARRANGEMENT #2 Notice of Acceptance, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16-Sec. 15 WHATS YOUR PRICE Declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17-WHATS YOUR PRICE Notice of Acceptance, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18-SA Specimen, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 19-Terms of Use Registration, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 20-Privacy Policy Registration, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 21-Trademark Assignment, #24 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion, #25 Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark) Modified on 3/15/2021 (jp).
February 19, 2021 Filing 42 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #17 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ISO Luxy's Answer to FAC and Counterclaims)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [DE #28 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Luxy Limited's Motion to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [DE #38 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Request. (jp)
January 13, 2021 Filing 39 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: REQUEST for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Luxy's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Second Supplemental Declaration of Tim Tang)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
January 12, 2021 Filing 38 REQUEST for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Luxy's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply in Opposition to Luxy Limited's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of J. Schaeffer in Support of Sur-Reply and Opposition to Luxy's Motion to DIsmiss, #3 Exhibit 17-Luxy Advertiser PowerPoint Presentation) (Smith, Mark)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Motion to Dismiss #28 , calendared for hearing on January 19, 2021 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 5, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #28 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Supplemental Declaration of Tim Tang In Support of Luxy's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
January 5, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 4, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Beatrice O'Neil Strnad on behalf of Defendant Luxy Limited (Attorney Beatrice O'Neil Strnad added to party Luxy Limited(pty:dft))(Strnad, Beatrice)
December 29, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #28 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Schaeffer, #2 Exhibit 1-New York Times Article, #3 Exhibit 2-MillionaireMatch Service Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3-SuccessfulMatch Registration, #5 Exhibit 4-KPIX Release, #6 Exhibit 5-MillionaireMatch.com Press Release, #7 Exhibit 6-Luxy Metadata, #8 Exhibit 7-Luxy Press Release, #9 Exhibit 8-Google Play Screenshot, #10 Exhibit 9-Luxy Affiliate Webpage, #11 Exhibit 10-June 21, 2019 Screenshot, #12 Exhibit 11-Luxy Website Screenshot, #13 Exhibit 12-Luxy Website Screen Print, #14 Exhibit 13-Luxy News Room Screenshot, #15 Exhibit 14-Luxy Dating Tips, #16 Exhibit 15-Luxy USPTO Application, #17 Exhibit 16-Luxy Trademark Registrations, #18 Proposed Order)(Smith, Mark)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Joint Stipulation to Extend hearing on Motion to Dismiss #31 . No good cause shown. (jp)
December 22, 2020 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #28 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Mark)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. See order for further details. (jre)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #26 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Incorrect event selected. (jre)
December 18, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/19/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Defendant Luxy Limited's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' FAC for Lack of Jurisdiction, #2 Declaration of Tim Tang In Support of Defendant Luxy Limited's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' FAC for Lack of Jurisdiction, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tim Tang, #4 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
December 18, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Luxy Limited, (Zimmermann, Kollin)
December 18, 2020 Filing 26 [STRICKEN PER #29 ] - ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #17 Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' FAC For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Luxy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Zimmermann, Kollin) Modified on 12/21/2020 (jre).
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Reflex Media, Inc., Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, upon Defendant Luxy Limited served on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Luxy Limited answer now due 12/18/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #17 filed by Defendant Luxy Limited.(Attorney Kollin J Zimmermann added to party Luxy Limited(pty:dft))(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion and Amended Motion to Permit Alternative Method of Service on Foreign Defendant Luxy Limited [DEs #20 and #21 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion. Plaintiffs may serve this Order and copies of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant by sending an email message, return receipt requested. to the following email addresses: (1) partners@onluxy.com; (2) press@onluxy.com. Any return service of the above-listed email that Plaintiffs file must include proof that Plaintiffs have attempted service. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The hearing on the MOTION and Amended Motion to Permit Alternative Method of Service on Foreign Defendant #20 #21 , calendared for hearing on October 19, 2020, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Permit Alternative Method of Service on Foreign Defendant filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of M. Smith in support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 2- Delivery Notice of Translated Documents to Chinese Central Authority, #3 Exhibit 3- Chinese Central Authority Response Letter, #4 Exhibit 4- Example Flagged by Chinese Central Authority, #5 Exhibit 5- OnLuxy.com Contact US webpage, #6 Exhibit 6- Declaration of T. Jordan in support of Motion, #7 Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Permit Alternative Method of Service on Foreign Defendant Luxy Limited filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of M. Smith in support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 2- Delivery Notice of Translated Documents to Chinese Central Authority, #3 Exhibit 3- Chinese Central Authority Response Letter, #4 Exhibit 4- Example Flagged by Chinese Central Authority, #5 Exhibit 5- OnLuxy.com Contact US webpage, #6 Exhibit 6- Declaration of T. Jordan in support of Motion, #7 Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark)
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #17 as to Defendant Luxy Limited. (jp)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Luxy Limited amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Reflex Media, Inc., Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Smith, Mark)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc. to Order to Show Cause, #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FedEx Tracking, #2 Exhibit 2- Hague Service Delays in China)(Smith, Mark)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before 7/1/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00423 RGK(KSx). (rn)
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Luxy Limited. (ghap)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Luxy Limited. (ghap)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc., identifying W8 Tech Limited. (Smith, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD, Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25130278 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Reflex Media, Inc., Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (Attorney Mark L Smith added to party Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD(pty:bkmov), Attorney Mark L Smith added to party Reflex Media, Inc. (pty:bkmov))(Smith, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reflex Media, Inc. et al v. Luxy Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reflex Media, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD
Represented By: Mark L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxy Limited
Represented By: Brittany T. Knutson
Represented By: Camden Aurora Minervino
Represented By: Beatrice O'Neil Strnad
Represented By: H. Forrest Flemming, III
Represented By: Kollin J. Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?