Cardinal Investments One, LLC et al v. Detail Garage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cardinal Investments One, LLC, Lynn Gangamella, Wendy J. Jones and Cardinal Investments Two, LLC
Defendant: Detail Garage, LLC, Chad Zani, David knotek, CG Group Holdings, LLC, Smart, LLC, D. Paul Bower Schneider, Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC, Advanced Auto Detailing LLC, Smart, LLC a California limited liability company formerly doing business as Smart, Inc. a California corporation, Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC a California limited liability company formerly doing business as Auto Detailing Supplies, Inc. a California corporation and Advanced Auto Detailing LLC a California limited liability company formerly doing business as Advanced Auto Detailing Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00579
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFFS Cardinal Investments One, LLC, Cardinal Investments Two, LLC. Dismissal is WITH PREJUDICE. (Akins, Leslie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 55 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Plaintiff' Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply re Motion to Compel Arbitration #54 and Stay this Action filed by Defendants Advanced Auto Detailing LLC, Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC, CG Group Holdings, LLC, Detail Garage, LLC, David Knotek, D. Paul Bower Schneider, Smart, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Powers, #2 Exhibit K to Powers Decl, #3 Exhibit L to Powers Decl, #4 Declaration of Kelly, #5 Exhibit M to Kelly Decl, #6 Exhibit N to Kelly Decl, #7 Exhibit O to Kelly Decl, #8 Exhibit P to Kelly Decl, #9 Exhibit Q to Kelly Decl, #10 Exhibit R to Kelly Decl, #11 Exhibit S to Kelly Decl, #12 Exhibit T to Kelly Decl, #13 Exhibit U to Kelly Decl, #14 Exhibit V to Kelly Decl, #15 Exhibit W to Kelly Decl)(Kelly, Patrick)
May 16, 2020 Filing 54 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Plaintiff' Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply re Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC, Cardinal Investments Two, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Akins Ex Part Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit A_ A-1 PROPOSED SUR-REPLY, #3 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit A: A-2 SUPPLEMENTAL JONES DEC, #4 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit A: A-3 AKINS SUR-REPLY DECL, #5 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit Ex Parte Exhibit, #13 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER) (Akins, Leslie)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #42 MOTION to Compel Arbitration/MOTION to Stay Case pending outcome of arbitration filed by Defendant Chad Zani - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 12, 2020 Filing 52 C. Zani's Request to Appear Telephonically (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re C. Zani's Request to Appear Telephonically)(Salisian, Neal)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Plaintiffs and Defendants Requests to Appear by Telephone #49 #50 - The requests are granted. Those attorneys appearing by phone are order to email the court's clerk at paul_cruz@cacd.uscourts.gov with the numbers they will use for the hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 11, 2020 Filing 50 Request to Appear by Telephone for Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Cardinal Investments One, LLC, Cardinal Investments Two, LLC, Lynn Gangamella, Wendy J. Jones re: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #47 , Errata #46 , REQUEST for Leave of Patrick W. Kelly and Elizabeth M. Weldon to Appear for Telephonically for Hearing on #42 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration or Stay This Action #49 , Joinder (Motion Related), #43 , Reply (Motion related), #48 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #45 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending outcome of arbitration #42 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request)(Akins, Leslie)
May 11, 2020 Filing 49 REQUEST for Leave of Patrick W. Kelly and Elizabeth M. Weldon to Appear for Telephonically for Hearing on #42 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration or Stay This Action filed by defendants Advanced Auto Detailing LLC, Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC, CG Group Holdings, LLC, Detail Garage, LLC, David Knotek, D. Paul Bower Schneider, Smart, LLC. Request set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending outcome of arbitration #42 filed by Defendants Advanced Auto Detailing LLC, Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC, CG Group Holdings, LLC, Detail Garage, LLC, David Knotek, D. Paul Bower Schneider, Smart, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of John Mansfield, #2 Exhibit J to Mansfield Supp Decl)(Kelly, Patrick)
May 5, 2020 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC, Cardinal Investments Two, LLC, re Response in Opposition to Motion, #45 served on May 4, 2020. (Akins, Leslie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Cardinal Investments One, LLC, Cardinal Investments Two, LLC. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion, #45 (Akins, Leslie)
May 4, 2020 Filing 45 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending outcome of arbitration #42 filed by Plaintiffs Cardinal Investments One, LLC, Cardinal Investments Two, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Wendy Jones, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lynn Gangamella)(Akins, Leslie)
April 10, 2020 Filing 44 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Chad Zani, (Salisian, Neal)
April 10, 2020 Filing 43 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending outcome of arbitration #42 C. Zani's Joinder to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Chad Zani. (Attorney Neal S Salisian added to party Chad Zani(pty:dft))(Salisian, Neal)
April 10, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending outcome of arbitration filed by defendants Advanced Auto Detailing LLC, Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC, CG Group Holdings, LLC, Detail Garage, LLC, David Knotek, D. Paul Bower Schneider, Smart, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Knotek, #2 Exhibit A ISO Knotek Decl, #3 Exhibit B ISO Knotek Decl, #4 Exhibit C ISO Knotek Decl, #5 Exhibit D ISO Knotek Decl, #6 Exhibit E ISO Knotek Decl, #7 Declaration of John Mansfield, #8 Exhibit F ISO Mansfield Decl, #9 Exhibit G ISO Mansfield Decl, #10 Exhibit H ISO Mansfield Decl, #11 Declaration of Patrick Kelly, #12 Exhibit I ISO Kelly Decl, #13 Declaration of Chad Zani, #14 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Patrick)
March 25, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Advanced Auto Detailing LLC, Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC, CG Group Holdings, LLC, Detail Garage, LLC, David Knotek, D. Paul Bower Schneider, Smart, LLC, identifying Cardinal Investments One, LLC; Cardinal Investments Two, LLC; Wendy J. Jones; Lynn Gangamella; CG Group Holdings, LLC; Detail Garage, LLC; Smart, LLC; Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC; Advanced Auto Detailing, LLC; David Knotek; D. Paul Bower Schneider; Chad Zani; CG Group Management, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick)
March 25, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Detail Garage, LLC answer now due 4/10/2020; David Knotek answer now due 4/10/2020; Advanced Auto Detailing LLC answer now due 4/10/2020; CG Group Holdings, LLC answer now due 4/10/2020; D. Paul Bower Schneider answer now due 4/10/2020; Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC answer now due 4/10/2020; Smart, LLC answer now due 4/10/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by defendants Detail Garage, LLC; David Knotek; Advanced Auto Detailing LLC; CG Group Holdings, LLC; D. Paul Bower Schneider; Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC; Smart, LLC.(Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Advanced Auto Detailing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party CG Group Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Detail Garage, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party David Knotek(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party D. Paul Bower Schneider(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Smart, LLC(pty:dft))(Kelly, Patrick)
February 21, 2020 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. upon D. Paul Bower Schneider waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. upon David Knotek waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. upon CG Group Holdings, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. upon Advanced Auto Detailing LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. upon Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. upon Smart, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. upon Detail Garage, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick W. Kelly. (Akins, Leslie)
January 29, 2020 Filing 31 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 as to defendant D. Paul Bower Schneider. (mrgo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 28, 2020 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 as to defendant Advanced Auto Detailing LLC. (mrgo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 as to defendant Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC. (mrgo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 as to defendant CG Group Holdings, LLC. (mrgo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 as to defendant Chad Zani. (mrgo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 as to defendant David Knotek. (mrgo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 as to defendant Smart, LLC. (mrgo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #20 . The following error(s) was found: At the "To: (defendant's name and address)" section, the defendant's name does not match the complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo)
January 27, 2020 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Detail Garage, LLC. (mrgo)
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #12 . The following error(s) was found: Each summons must include the "Attachment" referred to in the caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Akins, Leslie)
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by PLAINTIFF Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS, #5 SUMMONS, #6 SUMMONS, #7 SUMMONS)(Akins, Leslie)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 01/21/2020, receipt number 26MVTJAV), filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC.(Akins, Leslie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Cardinal Investments One, LLC, (Akins, Leslie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 [AMENDED] COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 01/21/2020, receipt number 26MVTJAV), filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC.(Akins, Leslie) Modified on 1/28/2020 (mrgo).
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 01/21/2020, receipt number 26MVTJAV), filed by PLAINTIFF Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS, #5 SUMMONS, #6 SUMMONS, #7 SUMMONS)(Akins, Leslie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was/were found: The complaint contains metadata. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Summons and No. 3 Notice of Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25157067 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Cardinal Investments One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil case cover sheet, #2 summons, #3 notice of interest parties) (Attorney Leslie Schwaebe Akins added to party Cardinal Investments One, LLC(pty:pla))(Akins, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinal Investments One, LLC et al v. Detail Garage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardinal Investments One, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Schwaebe Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Gangamella
Represented By: Leslie Schwaebe Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy J. Jones
Represented By: Leslie Schwaebe Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardinal Investments Two, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Schwaebe Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detail Garage, LLC
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Zani
Represented By: Hua-Han Pai
Represented By: Neal S Salisian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David knotek
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CG Group Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart, LLC
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Paul Bower Schneider
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Auto Detailing LLC
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart, LLC a California limited liability company formerly doing business as Smart, Inc. a California corporation
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Detailing Supplies, LLC a California limited liability company formerly doing business as Auto Detailing Supplies, Inc. a California corporation
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Auto Detailing LLC a California limited liability company formerly doing business as Advanced Auto Detailing Inc
Represented By: Jing Hua
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth M Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?