Weigang Xie et al v. America Shengjia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: QUIAN XU, DONG MEI XU, PEI CAI, WEIGANG XIE, YOUXIN SONG, SHOUQI SHEN, LIANGXIU WANG, ZUFANG HE, ZUMIAN WANG, XIN GAO, GUOSHEN GAO, JIANGUANG CHU and WANXIA JIN
Defendant: DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC., AMERICA SHENGJIA, INC., Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01303
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Because of the current coronavirus pandemic and the Orders of the Chief Judge Nos. 20-042 and 043, the Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 26(f) scheduling conference now set for April 9, 2020, is taken off-calendar. Counsel are to file a joint Rule 26(f) report by no later than April 10, 2020. A schedule will be issued thereafter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING DAIMLERTRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC #16 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs action against Daimler Trucks North America LLC is dismissed in its entirety, without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees. [ Daimler Trucks North America, LLC (an Oregon business entity of unknown form) terminated.] (et)
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC filed by defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DISMISSING DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC)(Cosgrove, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND FILING DEADLINES #14 by Judge George H. Wu:1. That the Plaintiffs' opposition filing deadline to Defendant's Motion be extended from March 5, 2020 to March 12, 2020. 2. That the Specially Appearing Defendant's reply filing deadline be extended from March 12, 2020 to March 19, 2020. 3. That the Motion hearing date remain on March 26, 2020.Plaintiffs are to give notice (lc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #11 filed by plaintiff Weigang Xie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lira, David)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Order Continuing Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff Weigang Xie. (Lira, David)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The current Scheduling Conference date is vacated and continued to April 9, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. All Rule 26(f) dates and deadlines to follow the new Scheduling Conference date. re #10 (sbou)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER RIEFLIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION) (Cosgrove, Ryan)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 First STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Joint 26(f) Report Deadlines from March 19, 2020 to May 10, 2020 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #8 filed by plaintiff Weigang Xie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lira, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Order Setting Scheduling Conference before District Judge George H. Wu filed by plaintiff Weigang Xie. (Lira, David)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS-ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for March 19, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than March 5, 2020. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-01296 GW(PVCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Fernando M. Olguin to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-CV-01303-GW(PVCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu. (jgu)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 2 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Defendant DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC. identifying Daimler Trucks & Buses US Holding, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Cosgrove, Ryan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court of California, case number 20STCV04194 Receipt No: 0973-25290959 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Ryan E Cosgrove added to party DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC.(pty:dft))(Cosgrove, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weigang Xie et al v. America Shengjia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUIAN XU
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONG MEI XU
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEI CAI
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEIGANG XIE
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOUXIN SONG
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHOUQI SHEN
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIANGXIU WANG
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUFANG HE
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUMIAN WANG
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIN GAO
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUOSHEN GAO
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIANGUANG CHU
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANXIA JIN
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Represented By: Ryan E Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICA SHENGJIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Philip Russell Cosgrove
Represented By: Ryan E Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?