Government Employees Insurance Co et al v. Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company and Geico General Insurance Company
Defendant: Navid Vatankhahan, Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc. and Tal Elzari
Case Number: 2:2020cv01401
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Daly, Jean)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiffs' notice of settlement, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety #23 , this action is placed in inactive status. By 7/22/2020, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 7/23/2020. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. (Daly, Jean)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #21 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended to 6/22/2020. (gk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 20, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Tal Elzari, Navid Vatankhahan, Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Umhofer, Matthew)
April 14, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Tal Elzari, Navid Vatankhahan, Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc..(Attorney Matthew Donald Umhofer added to party Tal Elzari(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Donald Umhofer added to party Navid Vatankhahan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Donald Umhofer added to party Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc.(pty:dft))(Umhofer, Matthew)
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Government Employees Insurance Co, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. upon Tal Elzari waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Umhofer. (Daly, Jean)
February 25, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Government Employees Insurance Co, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. upon Navid Vatankhahan waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Umhofer. (Daly, Jean)
February 25, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Government Employees Insurance Co, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. upon Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Umhofer. (Daly, Jean)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Steven T. Henesy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Government Employees Ins. Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO General Ins. Co., and GEICO Casualty Co., designating Jean M. Daly as local counsel #14 . (gk)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Barry I. Levy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Government Employees Ins. Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO General Ins. Co., and GEICO Casualty Co., designating Jean M. Daly as local counsel #13 . (gk)
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven T. Henesy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25410182) filed by Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order re Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Daly, Jean)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barry I. Levy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409614) filed by Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order rer Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Daly, Jean)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc., Tal Elzari, and Navid Vatankhahan. (gk)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. (Daly, Jean)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven Henesy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Barry I. Levy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) Modified on 2/14/2020 (jtil).
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. (Daly, Jean)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Daly, Jean)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. (Daly, Jean)
February 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25311501 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Co, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Attorney Jean M Daly added to party Geico Casualty Company(pty:pla), Attorney Jean M Daly added to party Geico General Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Jean M Daly added to party Geico Indemnity Company(pty:pla), Attorney Jean M Daly added to party Government Employees Insurance Co(pty:pla))(Daly, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co et al v. Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navid Vatankhahan
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Represented By: James Anthony King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winaffix Auto Glass, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Represented By: James Anthony King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tal Elzari
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Represented By: James Anthony King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co
Represented By: Jean M Daly
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Represented By: Tyler E Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jean M Daly
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Represented By: Tyler E Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Jean M Daly
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Represented By: Tyler E Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jean M Daly
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Represented By: Tyler E Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?