Rachel Louise Carlsen v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Louise Carlsen
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Neil Cotty, Bank of America, N.A., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, All Persons Known, Bank of America, N.A. a Texas Limited Partnership, and as successor in interest to Countrywide Home Loans Servicing formerly doing business as BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP and Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. as servicer, currently doing business as Mr. Cooper formerly doing business as Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01463
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
2 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 91 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter. THEREFORE, GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Judgment be entered against Plaintiff RACHEL LOUISE CARLSEN and in favor of Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., NEIL COTTY, and NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. The case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., NEIL COTTY, and NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. Plaintiff RACHEL LOUISE CARLSEN is to recover nothing from Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., NEIL COTTY, and NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is dismissed with prejudice as to all DOE defendants and as to all un-served defendants.(MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
June 15, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,, #87 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Judgment)(Barasch, Adam)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S AND NEIL COTTY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [filed 4/30/20; Docket No. #42 ]; ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS [filed 5/5/20; Docket No. #44 ];ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT [filed 5/19/20; Docket No. #53 ];ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SPOUSAL GRANT DEED AND STATE COURT COMPLAINT FROM DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE [filed 5/20/20; Docket No. #57 ]; and ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SPOUSAL GRANT DEED AND STATE COURT COMPLAINT FROM DEFENDANT BANA, BAC'S, AND NEIL COTTY'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE [filed 5/20/20; Docket No. #62 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The B of A Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Nationstar's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and Plaintiff's two Motions to Strike are DENIED. Plaintiff's FAC is DISMISSED without leave to amend, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendants are ordered to meet and confer and agree on a joint proposed Judgment which is consistent with this Order. Defendants shall lodge the joint proposed Judgment with the Court on or before June 16, 2020. (iv)
June 5, 2020 Filing 86 DECLARATION of DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #72 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Bissell, Jared)
June 5, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #44 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Statement of Decision))(Bissell, Jared)
June 5, 2020 Filing 84 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, re Notice of Lodging #83 Proposed Statement of Decision served on 6-5-20. (Barasch, Adam)
June 5, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Statement of Decision)(Barasch, Adam)
June 5, 2020 Filing 82 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, re Response #81 served on June 5, 2020. (Barasch, Adam)
June 5, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cottyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #72 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Barasch, Adam)
June 2, 2020 Filing 80 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SET SEVEN) IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 79 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SET SIX) IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 78 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SET FIVE) IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 77 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SET FOUR) IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 76 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SET THREE) IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 75 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SET TWO) IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 74 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SET ONE) IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 73 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT BANA'S AND NEIL COTTY'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel for B of A and NationStar are ordered to show cause in writing by June 5, 2020 why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $1,500.00 or their respective motions denied for violating the Court's Standing Order and the Court's Scheduling and Case Management Order. (iv)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing by June 5, 2020 why she should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $1,500.00 or have B of A's Motion to Dismiss granted for violating the Court's Standing Order and the Court's Scheduling and Case Management Order. (iv)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [filed 4/30/20; Docket No. #42 ]; and ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS [filed 5/5/20; Docket No. #44 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court continues the hearing on Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Defendant NationStar Mortgage LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, currently scheduled for June 8, 2020, at 1:30 p.m., to June 15, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (iv)
May 28, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY TO DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE #57 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (lc)
May 27, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; DECLARATION BY RACHEL CARLSEN #44 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (lc)
May 27, 2020 Filing 67 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike #62 filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. (Barasch, Adam)
May 22, 2020 Filing 66 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
May 22, 2020 Filing 65 RACHEL CARLSEN'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Re: Motion for Judgment #44 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
May 22, 2020 Filing 64 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Re: Motion #44 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
May 22, 2020 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, re Reply (Motion related) #60 served on May 22, 2020. (Barasch, Adam)
May 22, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY to Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #42 filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. (Barasch, Adam)
May 22, 2020 Filing 59 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #44 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Bissell, Jared)
May 22, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike #57 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Bissell, Jared)
May 20, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION TO STRIKE SPOUSAL GRANT DEED AND STATE COURT COMPLAINT FROM DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S, REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 19, 2020 Filing 56 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO NATIONSTAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
May 19, 2020 Filing 55 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Re: Motion #44 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
May 19, 2020 Filing 54 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BANA'S, BAC'S AND NEIL COTTY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Re Motion to Dismiss #42 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (iv)
May 19, 2020 Filing 53 CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Decision) (iv)
May 18, 2020 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, re Reply (Motion related) #51 served on May 18, 2020. (Barasch, Adam)
May 18, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY Non-Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #42 filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. (Barasch, Adam)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge John F. Walter, ORDERING Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint submitted by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen received on 5/13/2020 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 6-1 Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect. (iv)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA AND NEIL COTTY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO JUNE 8, 2020 #48 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and NEIL COTTY motion to dismiss the first amended complaint is hereby continued to June 8, 2020 at 01:30 p.m. (iv)
May 11, 2020 Filing 48 JOINT STIPULATION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #42 filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barasch, Adam)
May 7, 2020 Filing 47 [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS Filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen (iv)
May 5, 2020 Filing 45 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #44 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14)(Bissell, Jared)
May 5, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bissell, Jared)
April 30, 2020 Filing 43 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #42 filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through K)(Barasch, Adam)
April 30, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Barasch, Adam)
April 30, 2020 Filing 40 Text Entry order STRIKING MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #38 . Hearing date violates Court's Standing Order. A motion should be noticed with not less than 28 days and no more than 35 without order of the Court.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 30, 2020 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through K)(Barasch, Adam)
April 30, 2020 Filing 38 *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barasch, Adam) Modified on 4/30/2020 (sr).
April 28, 2020 Filing 41 Mail Returned addressed to Rachel Louise Carlsen re Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) #30 . (lom)
April 28, 2020 Filing 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #32 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc..(Bissell, Jared)
April 27, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Withdrawal of Leave to File Document Under Seal, #34 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #35 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Bissell, Jared)
April 23, 2020 Filing 35 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (MTD, Exhibit 8 to RJN, and Exhibit 9 to RJN) under seal #34 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document)(Bissell, Jared)
April 23, 2020 Filing 34 APPLICATION to file document (MTD, Exhibit 8 to RJN, and Exhibit 9 to RJN) under seal filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document)(Bissell, Jared)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.S AND NEIL COTTYS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT [filed 3/31/20; Docket No. #23 ] by Judge John F. Walter: On April 14, 2020, Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen (Plaintiff) filed a First Amended Complaint. In light of Plaintiff filing a First Amended Complaint, Defendants Motion is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. (lom)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS No 3 by Judge John F. Walter. The hearing on April 27, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time.Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 9/21/20. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: September 25, 2020. (yl)
April 14, 2020 Filing 29 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A... (Barasch, Adam)
April 14, 2020 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Persons Known, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen(yl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (yl).
April 14, 2020 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS #23 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (yl)
April 13, 2020 Filing 26 UNILATERAL STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (yl)
April 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, identifying BAC North America Holding Company, NB Holdings Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway. (Barasch, Adam)
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
March 31, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendant Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibits to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Adam N Barasch added to party Neil Cotty(pty:dft)) (Barasch, Adam)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS DUE TO COVID-19 #21 by Judge John F. Walter (lc)
March 23, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bissell, Jared)
March 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration #18 , #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 20-01463-DDP-AGR, but should read CV 20-01463-JFW-AGR. All future filings should reference the correct Judge's Initials. See Order Reassigning Dkt. 10. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
March 17, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., re Declaration #18 served on 03/17/2020. (Bissell, Jared)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jared D. Bissell filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.. (Bissell, Jared)
March 16, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules and Standing Order Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty. (Barasch, Adam)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Barasch, Adam)
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. identifying Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., KKR Wand Investors Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Bissell, Jared)
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc..(Attorney Jared D. Bissell added to party Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bissell, Jared)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for April 27, 2020 at 1:15p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before April 13, 2020. (et)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. [SEE ATTACHMENT OF THE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (et)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (et)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01463 JFW (AGRx). (esa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Notice of Continued Hearing (Barasch, Adam)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 4/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss; Exhibits) (Attorney Adam N Barasch added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Barasch, Adam)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. (hr)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (ghap)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (ghap)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants All Persons Known, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Neil Cotty, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc..Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachel Louise Carlsen v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jared D. Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Adam N Barasch
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Cotty
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kenney
Represented By: Adam N Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Adam N Barasch
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Known
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. a Texas Limited Partnership, and as successor in interest to Countrywide Home Loans Servicing formerly doing business as BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP
Represented By: Adam N Barasch
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. as servicer, currently doing business as Mr. Cooper formerly doing business as Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Jared D Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Louise Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?