Michael Jame Addineh v. Fariba Kermanshahi et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jame Addineh and Ali Adineh
Defendant: Fariba Kermanshahi and Does 1-10, inclusive as agent/trustee/officer's and individual
Case Number: 2:2020cv01500
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
2 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
3 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Upon further review, a determination has been made that this case was incorrectly assigned by the Clerk. Pursuant to General Order 05-07, this case is appropriate for review and issuance of a report and recommendation by a Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, all filings should be directed to Magistrate Rozella A. Oliver for review. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01500 FMO(RAO). (rn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #7 is hereby continued to be heard on 4/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-01466 FMO (RAOx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01500 FMO (RAOx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (esa)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint #7 (Majd, Farbood)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Fariba Kermanshahi. Related Case(s): CV 20-01466 FMO (RAOx) (Majd, Farbood)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint #7 filed by Defendant Fariba Kermanshahi. (Majd, Farbood)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint filed by Defendant Fariba Kermanshahi. Motion set for hearing on 4/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attorney Farbood Majd added to party Fariba Kermanshahi(pty:dft)) (Majd, Farbood)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Jame Addineh, upon Defendant Fariba Kermanshahi served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (shb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Jame Addineh. (et)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Fariba Kermanshahi. (et)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Fariba Kermanshahi, Does 1-10, inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Michael Jame Addineh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Jame Addineh v. Fariba Kermanshahi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jame Addineh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Adineh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fariba Kermanshahi
Represented By: Farbood Majd
Represented By: Daniel A De Soto
Represented By: Regidor Tatel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive as agent/trustee/officer's and individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?