Sheridan Jacobson v. Swisher International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheridan Jacobson
Defendant: Wade Holder, Micah Rich, Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Swisher International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01504
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 29 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson.. (King, Tessa)
April 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson, (King, Tessa)
April 7, 2020 Filing 27 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson.. (King, Tessa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Seventh, Tenth and Fourteenth causes of action and dismissal of individual defendants Micah Rich and Wade Holder #13 filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. (Yankelevits, Lori)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING TO MAY4, 2020 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing on all three pending motions to May 4, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (iv)
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Seventh, Tenth and Fourteenth causes of action and dismissal of individual defendants Micah Rich and Wade Holder #13 filed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Consent Motion to File Out of Time Opposition)(King, Tessa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims #19 filed by Counter Defendant Sheridan Jacobson. (King, Tessa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson. (King, Tessa)
March 16, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims #19 filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. (Yankelevits, Lori)
March 16, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. (Yankelevits, Lori)
March 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (King, Tessa)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING FROM MARCH 30, 2020 TO APRIL 6, 2020 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. In the interest of judicial economy, the Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing set for March 30, 2020 on the former motion to April 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (iv)
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (King, Tessa)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on April 16, 2020. (gga)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Stanford G. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Swisher International, Inc, Micah Rich and Wade Holder, designating Lori M. Yankelevits as local counsel #9 . (iv)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Brent D. Wasser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Swisher International, Inc, Micah Rich and Wade Holder, designating Lori M. Yankelevits as local counsel #8 . (iv)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Seventh, Tenth and Fourteenth causes of action and dismissal of individual defendants Micah Rich and Wade Holder filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yankelevits, Lori)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc..(Yankelevits, Lori)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brent D. Wasser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Swisher International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409034) #8 ; APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stanford G. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Swisher International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409311) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lom)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 2/18/2020. (Yankelevits, Lori)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stanford G. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Swisher International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409311) filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yankelevits, Lori)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brent D. Wasser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Swisher International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409034) filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yankelevits, Lori)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brent D Wasser. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stanford G Wilson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
February 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson, upon Defendant Swisher International, Inc. served on 1/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 1/16/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
February 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Wade Holder, Micah Rich, Swisher International, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Sheridan Jacobson. (filed in state court 12/27/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc., identifying Swisher International, Inc.. (Yankelevits, Lori)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. (Yankelevits, Lori)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV46602 Receipt No: 0973-25330721 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Swisher International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, etc., #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Dec of Non Service re Holder, #5 Exhibit Dec of Non Service re Rich, #6 Declaration Dec of Creasman) (Attorney Lori M Yankelevits added to party Swisher International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yankelevits, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheridan Jacobson v. Swisher International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swisher International, Inc.
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Represented By: Millicent N Sanchez
Represented By: Stanford G. Wilson
Represented By: Lori M Yankelevits
Represented By: Brent D Wasser
Represented By: Stanford G Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheridan Jacobson
Represented By: Adam J Reisner
Represented By: Tessa King
Represented By: Niran Grimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?