Jacqueline May Meyer v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Jacqueline May Meyer
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01666
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-1666 GJS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacqueline May Meyer, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 3/2/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, (efc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (efc)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #5 Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (efc)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Jacqueline May Meyer. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline May Meyer. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jacqueline May Meyer, (Ruzin, Irene)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline May Meyer. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline May Meyer. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline May Meyer. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party Jacqueline May Meyer(pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacqueline May Meyer v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline May Meyer
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?