Dennis C. Payne et al v. Abb, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Payne and Dennis C Payne
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to FRICK COMPANY), VIAD CORP (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GRISCOM RUSSELL COMPANY), AMERICAN COMPRESSOR COMPANY, TATE ANDALE, INC., f/k/a TATE TREMCO, INC. f/k/a TREMCO MACHINE WORKS, INC., General Electric Company, ABB, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BAILEY METER CO.), DOES 1 THROUGH 400 INCLUSIVE, JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to FRICK COMPANY), Carrier Corporation, VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, CRANE CO. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CHAPMAN VALVE COMPANY);, Johnson Controls, Inc., York International Corporation, ABB, Inc., Tate Andale, Inc., Viad Corp, Viacomcbs Inc., Crane Co., Tate Tremco, Inc., Viacom Inc., successor by merger with CBS, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Tremco Machine Works, Inc. and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01713
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
April 16, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Corrected Answer filed by Defendant American Compressor Company.(Iadarola, William)
April 14, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer filed by Defendant American Compressor Company.(Attorney William Mark Iadarola added to party American Compressor Company(pty:dft))(Iadarola, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE of DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 filed by Defendant Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey)
April 9, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Crane Co..(Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Jamison on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Jamison, Kevin)
April 1, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Empting, Erin)
April 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Electric Company, (Empting, Erin)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
April 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
March 30, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant ABB, Inc..(Attorney Nicolas P Martin added to party ABB, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martin, Nicolas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Tate Andale, Inc. identifying No Parent Company as Corporate Parent. (Sabnis, Rohit)
March 30, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Tate Andale, Inc..(Attorney Rohit A Sabnis added to party Tate Andale, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sabnis, Rohit)
March 27, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant General Electric Company.(Attorney Erin N Empting added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
March 27, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation, (Brosamle, Anthony)
March 27, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation.(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Carrier Corporation(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
March 27, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant York International Corporation.(Duffy, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc..(Duffy, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant York International Corporation identifying Johnson Controls, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. identifying Johnson Controls International plc as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Johnson Controls, Inc., York International Corporation. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Johnson Controls, Inc. and York International Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. and York International Corporation. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Johnson Controls, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party York International Corporation(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Johnson Controls, Inc., York International Corporation. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Johnson Controls, Inc. and York International Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. and York International Corporation. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Johnson Controls, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party York International Corporation(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 6/1/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01713 SVW(GJSx). (rn)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Viad Corp (Langbord, Peter)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter B Langbord on behalf of Defendant Viad Corp (Langbord, Peter)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Viad Corp.(Attorney Peter B Langbord added to party Viad Corp(pty:dft))(Langbord, Peter)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01713 CBM(GJSx). (rn)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-01713 DDP(GJSx). (rn)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants ABB, Inc., American Compressor Company, Carrier Corporation, Crane Co., General Electric Company, Johnson Controls, Inc., Tate Andale, Inc., Viacomcbs Inc., Viad Corp, York International Corporation. (ghap)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Dennis C Payne, Susan Payne. (Seitz, Andrew)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Dennis C Payne, Susan Payne. (Seitz, Andrew)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Plaintiffs Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dennis C Payne, Susan Payne, identifying ABB, Inc., et al.. (Seitz, Andrew)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25461178 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Susan Payne, Dennis C Payne. (Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Dennis C Payne(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Susan Payne(pty:pla))(Seitz, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis C. Payne et al v. Abb, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to FRICK COMPANY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GRISCOM RUSSELL COMPANY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN COMPRESSOR COMPANY
Represented By: William Mark Iadarola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TATE ANDALE, INC., f/k/a TATE TREMCO, INC. f/k/a TREMCO MACHINE WORKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BAILEY METER CO.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 400 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to FRICK COMPANY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Biernat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CHAPMAN VALVE COMPANY);
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Nicholas Richard Lane
Represented By: William M Hake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, Inc.
Represented By: Rohit A Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp
Represented By: Ovsanna Thomas
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Tremco, Inc.
Represented By: Rohit A Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., successor by merger with CBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremco Machine Works, Inc.
Represented By: Rohit A Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Payne
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: John M Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis C Payne
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: John M Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?