Dr. Lisa Edwards et al v. Dr. Scott Price et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Stephany Glover, Dr. Lisa Edwards and Century Academy for Excellence
Defendant: Lennox Unified School District, Dr. Scott Price, Becki Blanco and Omar Lopez-Luna
Case Number: 2:2020cv01838
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Century Academy for Excellence, Lisa Edwards, Stephany Glover. (Felahy, Allen)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #9 (yl)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Century Academy for Excellence (Felahy, Allen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Lisa Edwards (Felahy, Allen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Stephany Glover (Felahy, Allen)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #10 (yl)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #8 (yl)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Dr. Lisa Edwards, Dr. Stephany Glover, upon Defendant Lennox School District served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenia Guerra (capacity not indicated) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. (gk)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons filed by Plaintiffs Dr. Lisa Edwards, Dr. Stephany Glover as to Kenia Guerra, Lennox Unified School District. (Proof of service is unsigned, see separately filed Proof of Service) (gk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Lennox Unified School District. (esa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Becki Blanco, Lennox Unified School District, Omar Lopez-Luna, Scott Price.Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiffs Lisa Edwards, Century Academy for Excellence, Stephany Glover. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Lisa Edwards et al v. Dr. Scott Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Stephany Glover
Represented By: Allen B Felahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Lisa Edwards
Represented By: Allen B Felahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century Academy for Excellence
Represented By: Allen B Felahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennox Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scott Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becki Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Lopez-Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?