Bradford Lund v. David J. Cowan et al
Plaintiff: Bradford D Lund
Defendant: Judge PRO TEM David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court and David J. Cowan
Case Number: 2:2020cv01894
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 44 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55764 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #43 as to plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (mrgo)
July 28, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, #42 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27397560.) (Busch, Joseph)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #27 #31 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Dismissal of a complaint without leave to amend is appropriate where further amendment of the claims would be futile. See Chappel v. Lab. Corp. of Am., 232 F.3d 719, 72526 (9th Cir. 2000). Plaintiff has amended his complaint once, the Court has denied a second attempt to amend the FAC on the basis of futility, and as explained above, the Court does not find that Plaintiff can litigate the issues he raises before this Court under either 1983 or the ADA. Because the Court finds that further amendment of the operative complaint would be futile, the Court's dismissal of Plaintiff's lawsuit iswithout leave to amend. (See document for further details). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (mrgo)
July 16, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE Notice of Errata re Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Green, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiffs motion to file a sur-reply is DENIED. Dkt. #38 . The case citations and additional evidence included in Defendants Reply brief are not new because they were raised in response to arguments made in Plaintiffs Opposition brief. See Terrell v. Contra Costa Cty., 232 F. App'x 626, 629 n.2 (9th Cir. 2007); see also GemCap Lending I, LLC v. Mann, 2019 WL 7945597, at *5 (C.D. Cal. Oct. 30, 2019); Crossfit, Inc. v. Nat'l Strength & Conditioning Ass'n, 2017 WL 4700070, at *3 (S.D. Cal. Oct. 19, 2017); Edwards v. Toys "R" Us, 527 F. Supp. 2d 1197, 1205 (C.D. Cal. 2007). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 13, 2020 Filing 39 OPPOSITION opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Surreply #38 filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Green, Matthew)
May 12, 2020 Filing 38 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Surreply filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Addendum, #2 Declaration Declaration of Sandra Slaton, #3 Exhibit Proposed Surreply) (Busch, Joseph)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants; and #31 MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 05/11/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 4, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #27 filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice)(Green, Matthew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #31 filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Busch, Joseph)
April 20, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #27 filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Busch, Joseph)
April 20, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #31 filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Green, Matthew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Busch, Joseph)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue #28 . The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation of the Parties and finding good cause, hereby issues an Order to: 1. Continue the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from May 4, 2020 to May 11, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. 2. Plaintiff's opposing papers will be filed and served on April 20, 2020 and Defendants' reply papers will be filed and served on May 4, 2020. (mrgo)
April 8, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from May 4, 2020 to May 11, 2020 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Joseph)
April 7, 2020 Filing 32 Mail Returned addressed to Sandra Lynn Slaton re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #9 (mrgo)
April 3, 2020 Filing 29 Mail Returned addressed to Sandra Lynn Slaton re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,, #10 (mrgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Part 1 of 3, #3 Request for Judicial Notice Part 2 of 3, #4 Request for Judicial Notice Part 3 of 3, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Matthew Lawrence Green added to party David J. Cowan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Lawrence Green added to party Los Angeles County Superior Court(pty:dft)) (Green, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #22 as to defendant David J. Cowan. (mrgo)
March 18, 2020 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #22 as to defendant Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
March 17, 2020 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #22 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph)
March 17, 2020 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #22 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph)
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Busch, Joseph)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Lanny J. Davis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Bradford D. Lund, designating Joseph P. Busch as local counsel. (mrgo)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Sandra L. Slaton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Bradford D. Lund, designating Joseph P. Busch as local counsel. (mrgo)
March 11, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund, upon Defendant Los Angeles County Superior Court served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Los Angeles County Superior Court in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Busch, Joseph)
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund, upon Defendant David J. Cowan served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Hon. David J. Cowan in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Busch, Joseph)
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lanny J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/27/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531442) filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Busch, Joseph)
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sandra L. Slaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/27/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531507) filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Busch, Joseph)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles County Superior Court. (et)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant David J. Cowan. (et)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sandra L. Slaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531507) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Application is incomplete. Applicant failed to provide email address. (Thrasher, Lupe)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lanny J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/27/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531442) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (Thrasher, Lupe)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sandra L. Slaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531507) filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Busch, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lanny J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/27/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531442) filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Busch, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25531061 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Joseph P Busch, III added to party Bradford D Lund(pty:pla))(Busch, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford Lund v. David J. Cowan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford D Lund
Represented By: Joseph P Busch, III
Represented By: Sandra L Slaton
Represented By: Lanny J Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge PRO TEM David J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Superior Court
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Cowan
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?