United Aeronautical Corporation et al v. United States Air Force et al
Plaintiff: United Aeronautical Corporation and Blue Aerospace, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive, The United States Air National Guard and United States Air Force
Case Number: 2:2020cv01985
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Aeronautical Corporation, Blue Aerospace, LLC, upon Defendant The United States Air National Guard served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; United States Air Force served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. Ortega. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Almaraz, David)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants The United States Air National Guard, United States Air Force. (ghap)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Blue Aerospace, LLC, United Aeronautical Corporation, a California Corporation, (Almaraz, David)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Blue Aerospace, LLC, United Aeronautical Corporation, a California Corporation. (Almaraz, David)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Blue Aerospace, LLC, United Aeronautical Corporation, a California Corporation. (Almaraz, David)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25554778 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff United Aeronautical Corporation, a California Corporation, Blue Aerospace, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Data Right Agreement) (Attorney David M Almaraz added to party Blue Aerospace, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David M Almaraz added to party United Aeronautical Corporation, a California Corporation(pty:pla))(Almaraz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Aeronautical Corporation et al v. United States Air Force et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Aeronautical Corporation
Represented By: Adam D H Grant
Represented By: David M Almaraz
Represented By: Jonathan R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Aerospace, LLC
Represented By: Adam D H Grant
Represented By: David M Almaraz
Represented By: Jonathan R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Air National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?