KYU HWA BACK v. DINH BANH et al
Plaintiff: KYU HWA BACK
Defendant: DINH HAI BANH, DOES 1 to 10, and DINH HAI BANH doing business as SIMPLY PHO YOU
Case Number: 2:2020cv02031
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICION OVER PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state law claims. These claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiff to assert them in state court. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiffs ADA claim. (et)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff KYU HWA BACKto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #8 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause as to why it should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over his state law claims for similar reasons. Plaintiff shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause by March 18, 2020. (iv)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant DINH HAI BANH. (jtil)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff KYU HWA BACK, (Kim, Jason)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff KYU HWA BACK. (Kim, Jason)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff KYU HWA BACK. (Kim, Jason)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25575157 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff KYU HWA BACK. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party KYU HWA BACK(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KYU HWA BACK v. DINH BANH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DINH HAI BANH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DINH HAI BANH doing business as SIMPLY PHO YOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYU HWA BACK
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?