Ronald Weissberger et al v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. negligently failed to have proper screening protocols for COVID-19 prior to boarding passengers on the Grand Princess cruise ship and failed to warn that passengers from a prior voyage had symptoms of coronavirus.

Plaintiff: Ms. Eva Weissberger and Ronald Weissberger
Defendant: PRINCESS CRUISE LINES, LTD., d/b/a PRINCESS CRUISES
Case Number: 2:2020cv02267
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE Request Court's Clarification filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.. Request Seeking Clarification as to the Court's Aprtil 17, 2020 Text Entry Only (in Chambers) Order [ECF No. 19] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service)(Nield, Edgar)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The defendant is ordered to file an Amended Waiver of Service of Summons no later than 4/8/20 to correct the dates in docket entry 18 filed on 4/6/2020. Refer to the Waiver of Service of Summons Form (CV-108). [*Date Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons is sent.] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 Defendant's WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eva Weissberger, Ronald Weissberger. upon Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Edgar R. Nield. (Simmrin, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., identifying Carnival Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(DeSantis-Nield, Gabrielle)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft))(DeSantis-Nield, Gabrielle)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 8 Non-Resident Attorney Debi F Chalik APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Ronald Weissberger, Eva Weissberger, designating Michael A Simmrin as local counsel. (jp)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening 1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (jp)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 Text Only Entry: Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel for plaintiff shall immediately submit the proposed order in connection with Docket Entry 8 (to the Judge's generic email address) in Word or Word Perfect format. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Debi F. Chalik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Eva Weissberger, Ronald Weissberger (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/9/2020, Receipt No. 25659365) filed by Plaintiff Eva Weissberger, Ronald Weissberger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Simmrin, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Eva Weissberger, Ronald Weissberger. (Simmrin, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Debi Chalik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Eva Weissberger, Ronald Weissberger (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25659843) filed by plaintiff Eva Weissberger, Ronald Weissberger. (Simmrin, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Michael A Simmrin added to party Eva Weissberger(pty:pla))(Simmrin, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Eva Weissberger, Ronald Weissberger. (Simmrin, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25659365 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ronald Weissberger. (Attorney Michael A Simmrin added to party Ronald Weissberger(pty:pla))(Simmrin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald Weissberger et al v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCESS CRUISE LINES, LTD., d/b/a PRINCESS CRUISES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Eva Weissberger
Represented By: Michael A Simmrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Weissberger
Represented By: Michael A Simmrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?