LA Alliance for Human Rights et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Charles Van Scoy, Karyn Pinsky, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Harry Tashdjian, Joseph Burk, Gary Whitter, George Frem, Leandro Suarez and Wenzial Jarrell
Defendant: Does 1 through 200, inclusive, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles and Does 1 through 200 inclusive
Petitioner: AIDS Healthcare Foundation and PAUL BORING
Special Master: James L Smith, Michele Martinez, Hon James L. Smith and James L. Smith
Intervenor Plaintiff: Venice Stakeholders Association, Josue Tiguila and Latino Coalition of Los Angeles
Intervenor: Cangress, Orange County Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Cangress doing business as Los Angeles Community Action Network (LA CAN) and Los Angeles Community Action Network
Interested Party: Urban Offerings, Inc. and Santee Village Homeowner's Association
Amicus Curiae: Central City Association of Los Angeles, Committee for Safe Havens, Union Rescue Mission, The Center in Hollywood, CORE-CA, NAACP - Compton Branch and Skid Row Housing Trust
Intervenor Defendant: Adrian D. Moon
Case Number: 2:2020cv02291
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 filed by Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Cangress. CCA # 22-55687. The Stipulated Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal is GRANTED. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees on appeal. This order constitutes the mandate of this Court. (mat)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 655 STATUS REPORT [QUARTERLY] RE MAINSTREAM SERVICES PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND CITY OF LOS ANGELES [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mainstream Benefits Quarterly Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 654 Mail Returned addressed to not indicated re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive #630 (twdb)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 653 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ERRATA #646 , #647 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 652 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mariani, Jessica)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 651 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO MOU filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mariani, Jessica)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Stipulation and Request for Order is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Causes of Action against the County in the Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 649 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/28/23 8:40 a.m. re Transcript #648 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 648 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/28/23 8:40 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2023. (ha)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 647 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Executed Second Addendum to Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P.41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER Joint Submission of Second Addendum to Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 645 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: RE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. (Los Angeles First Street). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 644 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER ADVANCING HEARING SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2023 FROM 9:00 AM TO 8:30 AM, #641 . ( hearing ADVANCED TO 9/28/2023 AT 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 643 PROPOSED INTERVENORS' FIRST FURTHER THOUGHGS ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Movant PAUL BORING re: Settlement Agreement,, #641 , Miscellaneous Document #642 (Yagman, Stephen)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 642 STATUS REPORT filed by Movant PAUL BORING re: Settlement Agreement,, #641 (Yagman, Stephen)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 641 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Joint Submission of Second Addendum to Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Second Addendum to Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Executed First Addendum to Settlement Agreement, #4 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 640 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/18/23 re Transcript #639 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 639 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/18/23. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/12/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2023. (ha)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 637 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER FILING DEADLINES FOR PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND HEARING. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Hearing set for 9/28/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #486 Joint MOTION for Order to Show Cause RE: Dismissal of Gary Whitter's Claims Pursuant to F.R.C.P.41(B) and L.R. 41-1, 41-5, and 41-6. 2. Mr. Whitter must show cause within 30 days of the date of this Order as to why the instant action should not be dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 635 MINUTES OF Status Conference (Los Angeles First Street) held before Judge David O. Carter: The transcript shall be prepared forthwith and filed on the docket with immediate release to the public. The transcript will also be available to download on the Courts Cases of Interest webpage, located here: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/newsworthy/cases-of-interest. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
September 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 634 RESPONSE TO STATUS REPORT filed by Movant PAUL BORING , ARGUING AGAINST CONTINUANCE OF NOV. 6, 2023 TRIAL DATE, re: Status Report #633 (Yagman, Stephen)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 633 STATUS REPORT re Settlement Negotiations filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #631 REQUEST to Continue Hearing From 9/14/23 to 9/18/23. Status Conference continued to 9/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The hearing will take place at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10C at First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (twdb)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 631 REQUEST to Continue MOTION AND STATUS CONFERENCE from SEPT. 14, 2023 to SEPT. 18, 2023 Re: Amended Minutes, #625 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #630 filed by PROPOSED INTERVENORS PAUL BORING. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yagman, Stephen)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the hearing currently scheduled for September 11, 2023, to Thursday, September 14, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will be held at the First Street Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA. The parties will be notified of the courtroom closer to the hearing date. (ts)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 629 STATUS REPORT [Joint Status Report re Depositions and Discovery] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Calendar)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 628 EVIDENCE OF FALSE FLAG ACTION filed by Movant PAUL BORING re: Stipulation for Order, #627 (Yagman, Stephen)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 627 STIPULATION for Order Stipulation for Order Limiting Discovery filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Discovery Stipulation Re Housing Plaintiffs and Members of L.A. Alliance for Human Rights)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Third Stipulation To Modify Scheduling order RE Pretrial Deadline #622 . Expert Discovery Cutoff 10/20/23; Motion Cutoff: 11/6/23; Final Pretrial Conference 10/24/23; Trial 11/6/23. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 624 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. correcting Stipulation for Order, #622 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Third Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order Re Pretrial Deadlines)(Tokoro, Jason)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 623 OPPOSITION TO STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES, AND TO CONTINUE TIAL DATE TO NOVEMBER 6, 2024, filed by Movant PAUL BORING re: Stipulation for Order, #622 (Yagman, Stephen)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Third STIPULATION for Order to Modify Scheduling Order Re Pretrial Deadlines filed by defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Third Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order Re Pretrial Deadlines)(Attorney Jason H. Tokoro added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Tokoro, Jason)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 621 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/28/2023 8:55 a.m. to 12:12 p.m. re Transcript #620 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 620 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/28/2023 8:55 a.m. to 12:12 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2023. (apr)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 619 MINUTES OF Status Conference; MOTION TO INTERVENE BY MOVANT PAUL BORING #608 (Los Angeles First Street) held before Judge David O. Carter: The Court holds Motion to Intervene #608 in abeyance. Hearing is continued to September 11, 2023 at 8:30 AM. The Court orders the transcript of the hearing held August 28, 2023, be immediately produced at the government's expense and billed at the daily rate.The transcript shall be prepared forthwith and filed on the docket with immediate release to the public. Motion hearing continued to 9/11/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 618 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene , Permissively, #608 filed by Movant PAUL BORING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yagman, Stephen)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 617 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. The parties are ordered to appear for a status conference at 8:30 a.m. on August 28, 2023 in Courtroom 10C at First Street U.S. Courthouse, Los Angeles, CA. See Dkts. 604, 605. re: #614 , #613 . ( Status Conference set for 8/28/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 616 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Status Conference set for 8/28/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The Court ORDERS the parties to appear in Courtroom 10C, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 615 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene , Permissively, #608 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 614 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION AND RESPONSE TO COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' Statement Pursuant to Discovery Stipulation RE: Motion for Protective Order #613 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, et al. (twdb)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 613 STATEMENT PURSUANT TO DISCOVERY STIPULATION RE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (twdb)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 612 STATUS REPORT Re: Court Order [Dkt. 604] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 611 OPPOSITION opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene , Permissively, #608 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendant County of Los Angeles' Opposition to Motion for Permissive Intervention, #2 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Permissive Intervention)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 610 OPPOSITION TO STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE filed by Movant PAUL BORING re: Stipulation to Continue, #609 (Yagman, Stephen)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 609 STIPULATION to Continue Trial and All Pretrial Deadlines from November 6, 2023 to February 5, 2024 filed by defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and All Pretrial Deadlines)(Miller, Louis)
August 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 608 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene , Permissively, filed by MOVANT PAUL BORING. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen Yagman added to party PAUL BORING(pty:bkmov)) (Yagman, Stephen)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Modify Pretrial Schedule #606 . ( Fact Discovery cut-off 9/8/2023 (*except to the extent any motions to compel are pending)., Motions due by 10/24/2023.) Expert Disclosure: 9/8/23; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure 9/22/23; Expert Discovery Cutoff 10/6/23; Final Pretrial Conference 10/24/23; Trial: 11/6/23. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 606 STIPULATION for Order to Modify Scheduling Order re Pretrial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE by District Judge David O. Carter: The status conference scheduled for August 28, 2023 at 8:30 A.M. (Dkt. #604 ) will be held in Courtroom 10C at First Street U.S. Courthouse, Los Angeles, CA. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION #603 by Judge David O. Carter: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel with respect to Requests for Production # 49, 11, 1415, 1721. The Court rules on these requests for production based on the current state of the record. If any party or non-party believes that any documents, or portions thereof, are protected from disclosure under Rule 26, then within 14 days of this Order, it shall submit a narrowly tailored motion for a protective order. Consistent with this order, the Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer to address how RFP Nos. 1, 2, 3, 10, 13, and 16 may, if at all, be limited or clarified. On or before 8/21/2023, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding their efforts and the status of document production. The Court further SETS a status conference on 8/28/2023, at 8:30 AM. a The parties will be notified of the courtroom closer to the hearing date. (jp)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 603 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (rolm)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES #600 by Judge David O. Carter. HAVING CONSIDERED THE PARTIES' STIPULATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Parties will meet and confer before moving to "motion" practice; 2. The moving Party will provide their position to the responding Party (limited to 5 pages); 3. The responding Party will have three (3) court days to respond (limited to 5 pages) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 601 STATUS REPORT [QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT RE MAINSTREAM SERVICES PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING (DKT. 185-1)] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Disputes filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 599 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO MOU [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hoang, Arlene)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 598 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH LA ALLIANCE filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoang, Arlene)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter: The Court STRIKES Adrian D. Moons pending motions. (Dkts. #496 , #500 ). Mr. Moon is a vexatious litigant did not obtain leave to file these motions. See Order Denying Requests to Intervene (Dkt. #476 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 7/14/2023 (kdu).
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #454 filed by Intervenors Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker.(Attorney Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser added to party Los Angeles Community Action Network(pty:intv))(Sweetser, Catherine)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #454 [ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.(Hashmall, Jennifer)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 594 STATUS REPORT [Annual Status Report re Payment Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles (Dkt. 185-1)] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 593 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Granting in part and Denying in part #552 MOTION to Dismiss. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 592 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Attorney Nadia Ann Sarkis added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Sarkis, Nadia)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 591 BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian. Plaintiffs' Request for Status Conference re Intervenor Participation (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott re Stipulation for Protective Order #589 . See document for details. (es)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 589 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs, Intervenors and Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 588 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE DENIAL OF STIPULATION TO DISMISS by Judge David O. Carter: The Court DENIED the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss (Dkt. #485 ). The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties and upon the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, re Case No. 23-70076. (See document for further information). (Attachments: #1 Ex B, #2 Ex. A) (jp) Modified on 6/15/2023 (kdu).
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 587 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #584 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #583 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason H. Tokoro counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Lauren M. Black is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Tokoro, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason H. Tokoro counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Byron J. McClain is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Tokoro, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 583 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason H. Tokoro counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Brandon D. Young is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Tokoro, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 582 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason H. Tokoro counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Amie S. Park is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Tokoro, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 581 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Reporter. (Tokoro, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason H. Tokoro counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Jason H. Tokoro as counsel of record for Defendant County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Jason H. Tokoro added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Tokoro, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 579 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings June 6, 2023 re Transcript #578 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Diaz, Amy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 578 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on June 6, 2023. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Amy Diaz, phone number amyfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2023. (Diaz, Amy)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE HEARING TRANSCRIPT. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 576 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: MOTION TO DISMISS #552 (Los Angeles First Street). The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court takes the Motion to Dismiss #552 UNDER SUBMISSION. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (twdb)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 575 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The document was NOT filed. Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION #574 . (twdb)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 574 [SEE G-11 #575] LODGED EX PARTE APPLICATION Emergency Motion Under Circuit Rule 23-7 For Leave of Court For Orders From Recused Defendant David Ormon Carter to Un-Strike Motions [Doc #570, 572, 573] Already Seen, Read, and Considered By This Court and Then to Provide Notice and Ruling on the Motions at the June 5, 2023 Hearing (Proposed) Order Thereon filed by plaintiffs (twdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2023: #1 Lodged document) (twdb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2023: #2 Lodged document) (twdb). Modified on 6/5/2023 (twdb).
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge David O. Carter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (twdb)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE FIING BY VEXATIOUS LITIGANT #570 . As Mr. Moon was not granted leave to file documents pursuant to the Courts September 29, 2022 order (Dkt. 476), the Court ORDERS the above- mentioned document (Dkt.570) STRICKEN from the record. Adrian Moons vexatious litigant status will remain intact and as such Mr. Moon is precluded from filing without written consent from this Court. (twdb)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 571 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by - Adrian D. Moon, re Joinder (non-motion), #570 served on 5/28/23. (twdb)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 570 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #572] NEW PLAINTIFF AND WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF GARY WYANE WHITTER ADRIAN D. MOON'S JOINDER to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules 19;21-25-18 U.S.C. 455(b)(5)(i-iv); 140(a) ET.SEQ. filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D. Moon, Plaintiff Gary Whitter (Motion related), #567 . (twdb) Modified on 6/1/2023 (twdb).
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 569 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 568 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 . Motion hearing is CONTINUED to 6/6/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 567 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 566 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05/09/2023, 9:07 a.m. re Transcript #565 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dpa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05/09/2023, 9:07 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker,CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/31/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2023. (dpa)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 564 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE HEARING TRANSCRIPT. The Court orders the transcript of the Scheduling Conference held May 9, 2023, be immediately produced at the government's expense and billed at the daily rate. The transcript shall be prepared forthwith and filed on the docket with immediate release to the public. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 563 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. Discovery cut-off 9/8/2023. Motions due by 10/10/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2023 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 562 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Reporter. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 561 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (Los Angeles First Street) held before Judge David O. Carter. Briefing and trial schedule is set as follows: Pretrial Motions: October 10, 2023 at 9:00 AM Final Pretrial Conference: October 24, 2023 at 9:00 AM Jury Trial: November 6, 2023 at 9:00 AM All to be held at the Los Angeles First Street Federal Courthouse. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 560 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE SETTLEMENT HEARING by Judge David O. Carter. The scheduling conference set for May 9, 2023 will be held at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5B at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (lom)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell counsel for Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian. Changing Address to Umhofer, Mitchell & King LLP, 767 S. Alameda St., Suite 270, Los Angeles, CA 90021. Filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Matthew Donald Umhofer counsel for Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian. Changing Address to Umhofer, Mitchell & King LLP, 767 S. Alameda St., Suite 270, Los Angeles, CA 90021. Filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian. (Umhofer, Matthew)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 557 STATUS REPORT (QUARTERLY) RE MAINSTREAM SERVICES PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Mainstream Benefits Quarterly Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 556 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker. (Myers, Shayla)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 555 DECLARATION of Mira Hashmall in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 - May 2, 2017 report to the Board, titled "Adopt the Department of Mental Health's Mental Health Services Act Three-Year Program and Expenditure Plan for Fiscal Years 2017-18, 2018-19 and 2019-20", #2 Exhibit 35 - Excerpts from the Los Angeles County Department of Mental Health's website, #3 Exhibit 36 - March 30, 2022 Blue Ribbon Commission on Homelessness Governance Report, #4 Exhibit 37 - May 3, 2022 Motion re Recommendations on Implementations of Blue Ribbon Commission, #5 Exhibit 38 - Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), ECF Dkt. No. 485, #6 Exhibit 39 - January 10, 2023 Proclamation of a Local Emergency for Homelessness in the County of Los Angeles, #7 Exhibit 40 - January 23, 2023 Report Back on Proclamation of a Local Emergency for Homelessness in the County of Los Angeles, #8 Exhibit 41 - January 31, 2023 Report Back on Proclamation of a Local Emergency for Homelessness in the County of Los Angeles, #9 Exhibit 42 - February 7, 2023 Revised Declaration of Local Emergency for Homelessness Implementation Actions, #10 Exhibit 43 - February 7, 2023 Fiscal Year 2023-24 Homelessness Initiative Funding Recommendations, #11 Exhibit 44 - Joint Submission of Addendum to Settlement Agreement, ECF Dkt. No. 533, #12 Exhibit 45 - April 20, 2023 Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings, #13 Exhibit 46 - April 20, 2023 Homeless Initiative Quarterly Report No. 26, #14 Exhibit 47 - May 2, 2023 Minute Order, ECF Dkt. No. 551, #15 Exhibit 48 - May 2, 2023 Board Motion to Authorize Joint Application(s) to and Participation in the Homekey Round 3 Program, #16 Exhibit 49 - April 25-27, 2023 Meet and Confer Emails)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 554 DECLARATION of Mira Hashmall in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - County's Report of Available Resources for People Experiencing Homelessness (Dkt. No. 189), #2 Exhibit 2 - County Department of Mental Health's Report to the Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, titled "Disrupting the Cycle of Chronic Homelessness-DMH Homeless Outreach and Mobile Engagement (HOME) Team Pilot (Item 12, Agenda of June 23, 2020)", #3 Exhibit 3 - July 27, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #4 Exhibit 4 - September 15, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #5 Exhibit 5 - August 10, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #6 Exhibit 6 - September 28, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #7 Exhibit 7 - October 19, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #8 Exhibit 8 - July 19, 2021 Letter from the County Department of Health Services ("DHS") to Board Transmitting HFH Quarterly Report, #9 Exhibit 9 - February 2016 report published by the Los Angeles County Homeless Initiative, titled "Approved Strategies to Combat Homelessness", #10 Exhibit 10 - May 9, 2016 Homeless Initiative Quarterly Report No. 1, submitted to the Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors by the Los Angeles County Chief Executive Office, #11 Exhibit 11 - Measures appearing on the March 7, 2017 Ballot, #12 Exhibit 12 - September 29, 2017 report submitted to the Board by the CEO, titled "Homeless Initiative Measure H Strategy Implementation Plans", #13 Exhibit 13 - December 3, 2020 Homeless Initiative Quarterly Report No. 18, #14 Exhibit 14 - February 22, 2021 Countywide Homeless Initiative's Year Four performance evaluation prepared by Public Sector Analytics, #15 Exhibit 15 - August 20, 2021 Homeless Initiative Quarterly Report No. 20, #16 Exhibit 16 - July 13, 2021 Press Release announcing the Homeless Initiative Budget for Fiscal Year 2021-2022, #17 Exhibit 17 - November 16, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #18 Exhibit 18 - June 26, 2020 Binding Term Sheet between the County and the City of Los Angeles (Dkt. No. 136), #19 Exhibit 19 - September 16, 2020 Notice to the Court of Payment from County of Los Angeles Pursuant to Binding Term Sheet (Dkt. No. 177), #20 Exhibit 20 - October 13, 2020 Joint Notice to the Court Regarding Memorandum of Understanding for 6,700 Bed Plan from City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles (Dkt. No. 185), #21 Exhibit 21 - January 7, 2021 Notice to the Court of Payment from County of Los Angeles Pursuant to Binding Term Sheet (Dkt. No. 203), #22 Exhibit 22 - March 29, 2021 Notice to the Court of Payment from County of Los Angeles Pursuant to Binding Term Sheet (Dkt. No. 254), #23 Exhibit 23 - July 13, 2021 County of Los Angeles' Notice of Payment and Report Regarding Mainstream Services at City Facilities (Dkt. No. 341), #24 Exhibit 24 - August 5, 2022 Defendant County of Los Angeles' Annual Status Report Re Payment Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles [Dkt. 185-1], filed with this Court at ECF Dkt. No. 463, #25 Exhibit 25 - August 31, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #26 Exhibit 26 - September 27, 2021 Press Release from LAHSA regarding a $15 million grant from the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, #27 Exhibit 27 - October 5, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #28 Exhibit 28 - November 2, 2021 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #29 Exhibit 29 - November 2, 2021 Motion by Supervisors Hilda L. Solis and Kathryn Barger regarding Interim Housing Services Fund For Cities And Councils Of Governments Combatting Homelessness of the Board, #30 Exhibit 30 - May 12, 2020 Motion by Los Angeles County Supervisors Sheila Kuehl and Mark Ridley-Thomas, titled "Developing a COVID-19 Recovery Plan Related to People Experiencing Homelessness", #31 Exhibit 31 - July 2, 2020 report submitted to the Board by the CEO, titled "Developing a COVID-19 Recovery Plan Related to People Experiencing Homelessness (Item No. 4, Agenda of May 12, 2020)", #32 Exhibit 32 - May 15, 2020 report submitted to the Board by the CEO, titled "Piloting a Comprehensive Crisis Response to Ensure Post-COVID-19 Housing for Homeless Older Adults in Los Angeles County (Item No. 8, Agenda of April 14, 2020)", #33 Exhibit 33 - November 3, 2020 County of Los Angeles' Response to Plaintiffs' Status Report Dated October 20, 2020 (Dkt. No. 197))(Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 553 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #552 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 552 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 551 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DENYING #544 Motion to Certify and DENYING #545 Application to Stay by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 550 DECLARATION of Shayla Myers in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Stay Case #545 filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker. (Myers, Shayla)
April 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 549 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Stay Case #545 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian. (Umhofer, Matthew)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 548 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Stay Case #545 filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Orange County Catholic Worker. (Myers, Shayla)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 547 DECLARATION of Mira Hashmall in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Stay Case #545 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A April 25, 2023 Email, #2 Ex. B Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, #3 Ex. C Submission of Addendum to Settlement Agreement, #4 Ex. D April 20, 2023 Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings, #5 Ex. E April 20, 2023 Minute Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 546 DECLARATION of Mira Hashmall in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify This Courts April 20, 2023 Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #544 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Amended Notice of Lodging of Fully Executed [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only, ECF Dkt. No. 429, #2 Exhibit B. County of Los Angeles Response to Settlement Between Plaintiffs and City of Los Angeles, ECF Dkt. No. 432, #3 Exhibit C. Intervenors Objections to Plaintiffs and Defendant City of Los Angeless Stipulated Order of Dismissal, ECF Dkt. No. 434, #4 Exhibit D. June 9, 2022 Transcript of Final Settlement Objections and Scheduling Conference, #5 Exhibit E. Order Approving Stipulated Dismissal and Proposed Settlement, ECF Dkt. No. 445, #6 Exhibit F. Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Stay Litigation, ECF Dkt. No. 467, #7 Exhibit G. Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), ECF Dkt. No. 485, #8 Exhibit H. Intervenors Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs and Defendant County of Los Angeless Settlement, ECF Dkt. No. 488, #9 Exhibit I. November 14, 2022 Transcript of Presentation of Final Settlement Agreement, #10 Exhibit J. December 5, 2022 Minute Order, #11 Exhibit K. County of Los Angeles Statement in Support of Settlement, ECF Dkt. No. 514, #12 Exhibit L. January 17, 2023 Transcript of Presentation of Final Settlement Objections and Status Conference, #13 Exhibit M. January 17, 2023 Minute Order, #14 Exhibit N. April 12, 2023 Minute Order, #15 Exhibit O. Joint Submission of Addendum to Settlement Agreement, ECF Dkt. No. 533, #16 Exhibit P. April 20, 2023 Reporters Transcript of Proceedings, #17 Exhibit Q. April 20, 2023 Minute Order, ECF Dkt. No. 534, #18 Exhibit R. Intervenors Supplemental Brief Re: Stay, #19 Exhibit S. March 14, 2023 Statement of Proceedings of the Board, #20 Exhibit T. April 25, 2023 Email)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 545 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Stay Case filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 544 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify This Courts April 20, 2023 Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Ex Parte Communications filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re Hearing Transcript by Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (dgo)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/20/2023 9:09 AM re Transcript #540 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 540 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/20/2023 9:09 AM. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, email wil.wilcox@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/12/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2023. (Wilcox, Wil)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 539 STATUS REPORT OF CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mariani, Jessica)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 538 STATUS REPORT FOR THE QUARTER PURSUANT TO THE MOU BETWEEN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hoang, Arlene)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 537 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jon Powell at jon@umklaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 536 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge David O. Carter re: Status Conference #534 . (twdb)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 535 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Smart (CS). (Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MINUTES OF Status Conference (Los Angeles First Street) held before Judge David O. Carter: The Court hears the parties terms of stipulated proposed agreement. For reasons as stated on the record, the Court DENIES the parties proposed stipulation. The Court lifts the stay and reinstates proceedings in this case. Answer to Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 454) is due May 3, 2023. Scheduling Conference is set for May 9, 2023 at L.A. First Street Courthouse. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 533 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #519 [JOINT SUBMISSION OF ADDENDUM TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) submitted on October 17, 2022 [Dkt. 485], #2 Exhibit B - Fully Executed Addendum to Settlement Agreement)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend time to File Report RE Settlement #531 . The Parties deadline to file and serve their Proposed Settlement Agreement shall hereby be extended one (1) day, from April 17, 2023 to April 18, 2023. (twdb)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Joint STIPULATION for Order Extending Time to File Report re Settlement filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE SETTLEMENT HEARING. ( Hearing set for 4/20/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) Modified on 4/13/2023 (twdb).
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #477 filed by Adrian D. Moon. CCA # 22-55933. This court has reviewed the notice of appeal filed September 30, 2022 in the above-referenced district court docket pursuant to the pre-filing review order entered in docket No. 14-80006. Because the appeal is so insubstantial as to not warrant further review, it will not be permitted to proceed. Appeal No. 22-55933 is therefore dismissed. This order, served on the district court for the Central District of California, will constitute the mandate of this court. (mat)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Louis R. Miller counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Changing address to 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2600, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Miller, Louis)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jennifer Mira Hashmall counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Changing address to 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2600, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 526 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell counsel for Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy. Changing address and firm change to Umhofer, Mitchell & King LLP, 11766 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 900, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Changing email to elizabeth@umklaw.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Matthew Donald Umhofer counsel for Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy. Changing address and firm change to Umhofer, Mitchell & King LLP, 11766 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 900, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Changing email to matthew@umklaw.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy. (Attorney Matthew Donald Umhofer added to party Wenzial Jarrell(pty:pla))(Umhofer, Matthew)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 524 STATUS REPORT [QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT RE MAINSTREAM SERVICES PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND CITY OF LOS ANGELES] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mainstream Benefits Quarterly Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 523 REVISED QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO MOU [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoang, Arlene)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 522 Fourth STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by Plaintiffs LA Alliance for Human Rights, Joseph Burk, Harry Tashdjian, Wenzial Jarrell, Karen Pinsky, Charles Malow and George Frem and Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 521 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/17/2023 re Transcript #520 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 520 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/17/2023. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2023. (aa)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SCHEDULING ORDER FOLLOWING 01/17/2023 SETTLEMENT HEARING. Accordingly, the parties shall appear before the Court on April 20, 2023. In the interim, the parties shall submit joint status reports, on the dates set forth below, to Judge Andre Birotte and Special Master Michele Martinez regarding the progress of the revised settlement. An amended settlement agreement is due to the Court on or before April 17, 2023. The schedule is as follows: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Smart (CS). (Brody, Lauren)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 516 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mariani, Jessica)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 515 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO MOU filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mariani, Jessica)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 514 STATEMENT in Support of Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles re: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #485 . (Miller, Louis)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: HEARING ON JANUARY 17, 2023 #508 . The hearing currently scheduled for Tuesday, January 17, 2023 (Dkt. 508) will be held at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5B at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Court requests the presence of Mayor Karen Bass, Los Angeles City Council President Paul Krekorian, and Los Angeles County Supervisor Janice Hahn. (twdb)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 512 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Stipulation #509 . The following error(s) was/were found: Stipulation is filed separately defendant demanded to keep all documents together, judicial determination is required. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 511 PROOF OF SERVICE by email filed by Adrian D. Moon, served on 12/28/22. (twdb)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #509 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice is filed separately defendant demanded to keep all documents together including the order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Notice to the Honorable David O. Carter, Judge of the Stipulation Agreement Between the Parties Et. Seq. (Proposed) order Thereon filed by Adrian D. Moon. (twdb)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING REGARDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Judge David O. Carter. During the November 14, 2022 hearing, the Court indicated it would continue the hearing regarding the settlement agreement. (Dkt. 502). Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the hearing to Tuesday, January 17, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The Court requests the presence of Mayor-elect Karen Bass, Los Angeles City Council President Paul Krekorian, and Los Angeles County Supervisor Holly Mitchell. (rolm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Third Stipulation to Stay Litigation #503 . All proceedings are hereby stayed and all deadlines continued until February 1, 2023. (twdb)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/14/22 re Transcript #505 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (yja) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/14/22 from 9:03 a.m. to 9:48 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC, phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2023. (yja)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 504 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Smart (CS). (Brody, Lauren)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Third STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MINUTES OF Presentation of Final Settlement Agreement held before Judge David O. Carter: Hearing held in Los Angeles First Street Federal Courthouse, courtroom 5B. Also present, counsel for intervenor, Shayla Myers and Special Master Michelle Martinez. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer re settlement progress. Date to continue to be set by the Court. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 501 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D. Moon, re EX PARTE APPLICATION #500 served on 11/14/22. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 500 AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION Emergency Motion to Damned Fool Recused Defendant David O. Carter Et. Al. to Effectuate a Private Citizens Arrest Pursuant to United States Constitution Supremacy Clause Article VI Paragraph Two; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D. Moon. (twdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2022: #1 Proposed Order) (twdb).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION #496 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 498 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D. Moon, re Supplement(Motion related), #497 , EX PARTE APPLICATION #496 served on 11/14/22. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 497 SUPPLEMENT to Damned Fools Recused Defendants Elwood Lui and Frances Rothschild Et Al. of the Stipulation Settlement Agreement Between the Parties to Pay daredeemer The Lump Sum of Seven (7) Billions Dollars Et Al (proposed) Order There on RE EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order #496 filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D. Moon. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 496 EX PARTE Emergency Motion to Damned Fool Recused Defendant David O. Carter Et. Al. to Effectuate a Private Citizens Arrest Pursuant to United States Constitution Supremacy Clause Article VI Paragraph Two; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D. Moon. (twdb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: The SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE #473 currently scheduled for 11/14/2022 will be held at 9:00 A.M. in Courtroom 5B at First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/7/2022 re Transcript #493 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 493 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/7/2022. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC.., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/25/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2023. (aa)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 492 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Staying Case,, #473 [County of Los Angeles's Response in Support of Settlement Agreement] (Hashmall, Jennifer)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 491 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail on 11/1/22 re Notice of Contempt #490 filed by Intervenor Adrian D Moon. (lom)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE OF CONTEMPT OF COURT ORDER BY DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES-BOARD OF SUPERVISOR TO SIGN STIPULATION AGREEMENT FOR SEVEN BILLION DOLLARS MADE PAYABLE TO ADRIAN DAMICO MOON, 'daredeemer' TO CURE DEFAULT JUDGEMENT IN CASE MOON V. COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CASE NO. 22STR003447 ET. AL. filed by Intervenor Adrian D Moon. (lom)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 489 STATUS REPORT [Quarterly Status Report re Mainstream Services Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 488 STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SETTLEMENT filed by Intervenor Parties Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker re: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #485 . (Myers, Shayla)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 487 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 22-55687, as to Plaintiffs Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Catherine E. Sweetser, Esq. at csweetser@sshhzlaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Sweetser, Catherine)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal of Gary Whittier's Claims Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(b) and L.R. 41-1, 41-5, and 41-6 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Mira Hashmall, #3 Proposed Order) (Hashmall, Jennifer)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiffs George Frem, Joseph Burk, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Wenzial Jarrell, Harry Tashdjian, Leandro Suarez, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Malow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Notice to the Honorable David O. Carter, Judge of Civil Subpoena for Personal Appearance at Trial or Hearing filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D Moon. (twdb)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Mariani, Jessica)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 482 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO MOU filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mariani, Jessica)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 481 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. Also present, counsel for intervenor, Brooke Weitzman. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer re settlement progress. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 480 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55933 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #477 as to Movant Adrian D Moon. (mat)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. All interested parties are also invited to appear. The Status Conference will take place at the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 W. 4th St, Santa Ana, in Courtroom 10A. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. ( Status Conference set for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carte r.) (twdb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #477 filed by Intervenor Adrian D Moon. [Notice of the filing is sent to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals.] (mat)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Intervenor Adrian D Moon. Appeal of Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #476 , Order on Motion for Recusal #472 , Staying Case, #473 Filed On: 9/26/22, 9/27/22, 9/29/22; Entered On: 9/26/22, 9/27/22, 9/29/22, 9/30/22; Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis is pending. (mat)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING REQUESTS TO INTERVENE #444 #446 #448 #461 AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER #469 , AND ORDERING PRE-FILING RESTRICTIONS by Judge David O. Carter. The Court concludes that Mr. Moon has not met the standards for either intervention as of right or permissive intervention under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24. The Court thus DENIES Mr. Moon's requests to intervene. Accordingly, all other motions filed by Mr. Moon, including the Motion for Reconsideration, are DENIED as moot. Additionally, for reasons set forth below, the Court ORDERS pre-filing review of any filing action Mr. Moon attempts to take in this action. Accordingly, for any future filings in this action, Adrian D. Moon shall first obtain leave of the Court and: a. shall not exceed three pages, b. shall attach the proposed filing, c. shall explain why the proposed filing is not frivolous, d. shall explain why the proposed filing is not an attack on any previous order entered in this case, and e. shall certify, by affidavit and under the penalty of perjury, that the proposed filing raises a new issue that has not already been rejected by the Court. Failure to comply with any of the above requirements will result in the striking of that filing without further notice. Mr. Moon is forewarned that if he abuses these restricted filing privileges, the Court will take further injunctive action. See minute order for details. (lom)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Recusal #474 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) Modified on 9/29/2022 (lom).
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 474 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF RECUSAL MOTION, STAY PRIOR TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FILING OF ANSWER DUE ON SEPTEMBER 28, 2022 AND GRANTING 'daredeemer's MOTION TO INTERVENE AS PLAINTIFF-DEFENDANT AND ORDER TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY PROBATION DEPARTMENT FOR PRODUCTION OF ADRIAN D. MOON'S (AB109) CASE FILE ET. SEQ. SEE, READ AND CONSIDER ATTACHED MOTIONS 1 THROUGH 14 INCORPORATED BY THIS REFERENCE (Proposed) ORDER THEREON #472 filed by Intervenor Adrian D Moon. (lom)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER GRANTING STAY AND SETTING DATES RESETTLEMENT AGREEMENT #471 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court further GRANTS the request to stay proceedings through November 15, 2022, and SETS the following dates regarding the settlement agreement: The Court invites any party and the public to submit comments or objections to the settlement agreement by October 27, 2022. Responses are due November 2, 2022. Hearing regarding the settlement agreement is set for November 14, 2022, at 9:00 AM. (rolm)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECUSAL #469 by Judge David O. Carter. Before the Court is Intervenor-Defendant Adrian D. Moons Motion for Recusal. (Dkt. 469). The Court DENIES the Motion. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (rolm)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 471 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Term Sheet Between Plaintiffs and County of Los Angeles)(Miller, Louis)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECUSAL OF THE HONORABLE DAVID O. CARTER, JUDGE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 441; 455 (a); (b)(1); (b)(5)(i-iv) ; 18 U.S.C. SECTIONS 241 THROUGH 250; RULE 7.19 ET. SEQ. filed by Intervenor Adrian D Moon. (lom)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO STAY #467 by Judge David O. Carter. Accordingly, the parties' Stipulation is DENIED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's second amended complaint remains on September 29, 2022. The parties may renew their request for a stay upon submitting additional briefing or documents to the Court demonstrating that their requested stay is both warranted and limited to resolving the disputed terms. (lom)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 470 REQUEST for Order for TO BE SERVED AND NOTICED OF ANSWER BY COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES; (PROPOSED) ORDER THEREON filed by Intervenor defendant Adrian D Moon. (lom)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Stay Litigation filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Miller, Louis)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS'SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #465 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court hereby grants a second extension of time for the County to file its response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint as follows: 1. The last day for the County to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint shall be September 28, 2022. 2. The Court will set a Scheduling Conference once the County files its responsive pleading. (lom)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 28, 2022 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 STATUS REPORT (Quarterly) re Mainstream Services Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles [Dkt. 185-1] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Mainstream Services Quarterly Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 STATUS REPORT (Annual) re Payment Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles [Dkt. 185-1] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 PROOF OF SERVICE - Acknowledgment of Service filed by intervenor defendant Adrian D Moon, re REQUEST #461 served on 8/2/22. (twdb)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 REQUEST to the Honorable David O. Carter for Notice and Ruling Granting Pending Motions to Allow Adrian D. Moon in this Instant Case as a Plaintiff-Defendant Intervenor and Order to Los Angeles County Probation Department to Provide the Complete (AB109) Probation Case File of Adrian D. Moon Pursuant to the Subpoena Issued in Case: Moon vs. Satan the Devil et. al. Case no. BA332095, Local Rule 7.19 ET. SEQ. filed by plaintiff Adrian D Moon. (twdb)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO MOU [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hoang, Arlene)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #450 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Gary Whitter #450 ; Declarations of Elizabeth Mitchell and Paul Bonin. (twdb)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer for Defendant County of Los Angeles to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (30 days or less), #456 . The last day for the County to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint shall be August 29, 2022. (twdb)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55687 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #451 as to Intervenors Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker. (car)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Los Angeles answer now due 8/29/2022, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #454 filed by defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant County of Los Angeles to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 STATEMENT of Clarification Regarding Gary Whitter filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdjian, Gary Whitter re: Amended Complaint/Petition, #454 . (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Second Amended and Supplemental AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants County of Los Angeles amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #361 , filed by Plaintiffs George Frem, Joseph Burk, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Wenzial Jarrell, Harry Tashdjian, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Malow(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #452 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation (to dismiss party or dismiss cause). Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Stipulation for Plaintiffs Leandro Suarez and Charles Van Scoy to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendant County Without Prejudice [Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)] filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Intervenors Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker. Appeal of Order, Add and Terminate Parties #445 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33627779.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sweetser, Catherine)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Gary Whitter filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Mitchell, #2 Declaration of Paul Bonin, #3 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: AMENDED COMPLAINT. Accordingly, if Plaintiffs intend to file an amended complaint, that filing is due by Friday, July 15, 2022. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (twdb)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO INTERVENE AS A ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR, SEE READ AND CONSIDER ATTACHED MOTION 10 (20) PAGES AND MOTION 11 (125) PAGES INCORPORATED BY THIS REFERENCE re Emergency Motion #444 filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D Moon. (twdb)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by defendant Adrian D Moon, re Motion Related Document, #446 served on 6/17/22. (twdb)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE in support of EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL ORDER TO THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY PROBATION DEPARTMENT TO PROVIDE THE COMPLETE PROBATION (AB109) CASE FILE OF ADRIAN D. MOON PURSUANT TC THE SUBPOEANA ISSUED ON APRIL 26, 2022 SEE READ AND CONSIDER ATTACHED MOTIONS 1 THROUGH 13 INCORPORATED BY THIS REFERENCE (Proposed) ORDER THEREON #444 filed by Intervenor Defendant Adrian D Moon. (twdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2022: #1 Proposed Order) (twdb).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED DISMISSAL AND PROPOSED SETTLEMENT #421 by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice of Lodging, #421 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order UNDER CIRCUIT RULE 27-3 AND SUPREMACY CLAUSE ARTICLE VI PARAGRAPH TWO OF THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION FOR ORDERS TO ALLOW LEAVE OF COURT AND GRANTING OF ADRIAN D. MOON TO BE ALLOWED AS AN ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF-DEFENDANT INTERVENOR ET. SEQ. SEE, READ, AND CONSIDER ATTACHED MOTIONS 1 THROUGH 9 INCORPORATED BY THIS REFERENCE ET. SEQ. filed by Defendant Intervenor Adrian D Moon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (twdb)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/09/2022, 9:20 a.m. re Transcript #441 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/09/2022, 9:20 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number (858)453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2022. (ls)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Also present on behalf of intervenor, Carol Sobel and Shayla Meyers. The Court tentatively approves the settlement agreement, written order to issue. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Smart (CS). (Brody, Lauren)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT HEARING #423 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court previously set a hearing on the Settlement Agreement between Defendant City of Los Angeles and Plaintiffs LA Alliance for Human Rights for June 9, 2022, at 9:00 am in Courtroom 5B at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Court requests the presence of Los Angeles Mayor Eric Garcetti, Los Angeles City Council President Nury Martinez, and other city officials who wish to attend. (rolm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 REPLY filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles to Statement #428 , Objection, #434 , Notice of Lodging, #429 , Response #432 To Its Settlement With Plaintiffs (Marcus, Scott)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter to Notice of Lodging, #429 Plaintiff LA Alliance for Human Rights, et al.'s Reply in Support of City-Plaintiff Settlement Agreement [ECF No. 429-1] (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: HEARING ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT #421 , #423 . The Court previously scheduled a hearing on the Settlement Agreement (Dkt. 421) on Thursday, June 9, 2022, at 9:00 am. The hearing will take place in Courtroom 5B at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (twdb)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order)(Myers, Shayla)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging, #426 , Notice of Lodging, #429 , Notice of Settlement, #408 , Notice of Lodging, #421 filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shayla Myers)(Myers, Shayla)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 APPENDIX filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Re: Response #432 To Settlement Between Plaintiffs And City Of Los Angeles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Homeless Initiative Approved Strategies, #2 Exhibit 02 - Homeless Initiative Quarterly Report, #3 Exhibit 03 - Consolidated Municipal and Special Elections, #4 Exhibit 04 - Measure H Strategy Implementation Plans, #5 Exhibit 05 - Report of Available Resources, #6 Exhibit 06 - Homeless Initiative Quarterly Report, #7 Exhibit 07 - Disrupting the Cycle of Chronic Homelessness, #8 Exhibit 08 - Letter from DHS to Board, #9 Exhibit 09 - July 27, 2021 Statement of Proceedings, #10 Exhibit 10 - August 10, 2021 Statement of Proceedings, #11 Exhibit 11 - Homeless Initiative Quarterly Report, #12 Exhibit 12 - August 31, 2021 Statement of Proceedings, #13 Exhibit 13 - September 15, 2021 Statement of Proceedings, #14 Exhibit 14 - November 2, 2021 Statement of Proceedings, #15 Exhibit 15 - Blue Ribbon Commission on Homelessness Governance Report, #16 Exhibit 16 - County of Los Angeles Recommended Budget Volume 1, #17 Exhibit 17 - County of Los Angeles Recommended Budget Volume 2, #18 Exhibit 18 - Motion re Recommendations on Implementations of Blue Ribbon Commission, #19 Exhibit 19 - Homeless Initiative Funding Letter)(Miller, Louis)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Notice of Settlement, #408 , Notice of Lodging, #421 , Settlement Conference,, Set/Reset Hearing, #423 (Miller, Louis)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE of Unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Non-Party AIDS Healthcare Foundation, re Statement #428 , Notice of Appearance #427 served on May 24, 2022. (Eisenberg, Jonathan)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Amended Fully Executed [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only [Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2)] re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing #416 (Attachments: #1 Amended Fully Executed [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only [Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2)] and Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 STATEMENT Opposition to Proposed Partial Settlement filed by Movant AIDS Healthcare Foundation re: Notice of Settlement, #408 , Notice of Lodging, #421 , Settlement Conference,, Set/Reset Hearing, #423 . (Eisenberg, Jonathan)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan Michael Eisenberg on behalf of Movant AIDS Healthcare Foundation (Attorney Jonathan Michael Eisenberg added to party AIDS Healthcare Foundation(pty:bkmov))(Eisenberg, Jonathan)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Fully Executed [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only [Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2)] re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing #416 (Attachments: #1 Fully Executed [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only [Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2)] and Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/20/2022, 9:41 a.m re Transcript #424 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/20/2022, 9:41 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number (858)453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2022. (ls)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: The Court sets the following dates regarding the settlement agreement: The Court invites any party and the public to submit comments or objections by May 31, 2022. Responses are due June 3, 2022. Hearing regarding settlement agreement is set for June 9, 2022 at 9:00 AM. Status Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Smart (CS). (Brody, Lauren)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only [Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2)] re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing #416 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only [Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2)] and Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND/OR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: HEARING LOCATION #399 , #416 . (twdb)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing #416 (Defendant County of Los Angeles' Response to Court Order re Scheduling Conference and Request for Rule 16 Conference) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 STATUS REPORT (Quarterly Status Report Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles [Dkt. 185-1]) filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND/OR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report re Notice of Preliminary Settlement and Stipulation to Stay Litigation as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only [ECF No. 408] filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT of CITY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO MOU [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hoang, Arlene)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 NOTICE of Filing Joint Supplemental Audit Report filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 NOTICE of Intent to Seek Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 JOINT REPORT of Audits And Procedures To Document New Beds filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/16/21 re Transcript #409 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/16/21. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/25/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2022. (ha)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Preliminary Settlement Agreement and Stipulation to Stay Litigation as to Defendant City of Los Angeles Only filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Attachments: #1 LA Alliance-City Term Sheet)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Hearing not held. Settlement Conference held off the record. Courtroom Deputy: Teresa Jackson-Terrell. (dgo)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Text Only Order by Judge David O. Carter: The Court is in receipt of Defendant County of Los Angeles' Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Ex Parte Communications (Dkt. 403), joined by Intervenors (Dkt. 404), and acknowledges the suspension of ex parte communications in this matter. The Court declines the County's request for reassignment. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 405 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitterto Notice (Other) #403 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant County of Los Angeles' Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Ex Parte Communications (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION Notice (Other) #403 filed by Intervenor Parties Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network, Orange County Catholic Worker. [and Notice of Joinder] (Myers, Shayla)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Ex Parte Communications filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Miller, Louis)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 402 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (Settlement Conference set for 3/29/2022 at 1:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter.) (dgo)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (Settlement Conference set for 3/29/2022 at 1:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter.) (dgo)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 STATUS REPORT Defendants County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles' Status Report Regarding Audit Progress filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: Defendants' Stipulation to Continue Status Conference #398 . By Monday, March 21, 2022, the City and County shall submit a Joint Status Report detailing progress made toward completing the audits. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Status Conference continued to 5/20/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference and Related Dates filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Conference will be continued at a later date to be scheduled by the Court. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (twdb)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of ongoing settlement discussions, the Court sets a Settlement Conference on Tuesday, February 22, 2022 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 5B at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MINUTES OF ORDER RE: SETLLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Judge David O. Carter: Outside the presence of the court reporter, the parties met with Judge Andr Birotte and Special Master Michele Martinez for ongoing settlement discussion. The parties are ordered to return Wednesday, February 16, 2022 at 2pm. Court Reporter: Not Present. (twdb)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter The MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE #391 scheduled for 2/15/2022 at 1:30 PM will be held at Los Angeles First Street United States Courthouse, Courtroom 5B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles [Dkt. 185-1] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mainstream Services Quarterly Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: MEDIATION SESSEION. The Court ORDERS the parties to a mandatory mediation session before Judge Andr Birotte Jr. on Tuesday, February 15, 2022 at 1:30 pm in the Los Angeles First Street United States Courthouse, or another location, depending on the COVID-19 situation. ( Mediation set for 2/15/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INORMATION. (twdb)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/24/22 re Transcript #389 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/24/22. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2022. (apr)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO DISMISS #369 ; CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO DISMISS FAC #370 . The Court orders the parties to attend a mandatory settlement conference on Tuesday,February 15, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles,CA 90012. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Settlement Conference set for 2/15/2022 AT 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
January 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Text Only Order: The Court GRANTS the Request for Remote Appearance by Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles and Plaintiffs L.A. Alliance et al. #385 . The Court GRANTS the Request for Remote Appearance by Intervenors Orange County Catholic Worker, CANGRESS, and Los Angeles Catholic Worker #386 . Zoom information for the hearing is located at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-david-o-carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 REQUEST for Leave of Intervenors Orange County Catholic Worker, CANGRESS, and Los Angeles Catholic Worker to Appear for Remote filed by Intervenors Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Los Angeles Community Action Network. (Myers, Shayla)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 REQUEST for Leave of City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, and Plaintiffs L.A. Alliance, et al. to Appear for Remote filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Salsig, Ryan)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: MOTION to Dismiss #369 , #370 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO THE MOU [DKT. 185] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to City's Quarterly Status Report, #2 Exhibit B to City's Quarterly Status Report, #3 Exhibit C to City's Quarterly Status Report)(Hoang, Arlene)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #370 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #369 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Salsig, Ryan)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #370 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant County of Los Angeles' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 379 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #369 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court will hear testimony from all parties about the audit results at the Status Conference. The Conference will take place at 9:00 am on Wednesday April 27, 2022 at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Court will inform the parties of the specific courtroom in advance of the hearing. ( Status Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MINUTES OF Status Conference (Held and Completed) before Judge David O. Carter: The Court Reporter referenced above is hereby ordered to submit the original transcript and notes to transcripts cacd@cacd.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, December 27, 2021, for immediate uploading on the Courts CM/ECF document filing System. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Submissions of Defendant City of Los Angeles at December 16, 2021 Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hoang, Arlene)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Mira Hashmall counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Emily A. Rodriguez-Sanchirico is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE. The parties are currently scheduled to meet for a Status Conference on December 16, 2021, to discuss progress toward completion of the freeway overpasses and underpasses agreement. The Status Conference will take place at 9:00 am in Courtroom 5B, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (twdb)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 STATUS REPORT Joint with Defendant County of Los Angeles filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hoang, Arlene)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court requests that the parties provide the Court with a joint status update on progress made toward completion of the agreement by noon on December 14, 2021. The Status Conference will take place on December 16, 2021 at 9:00 am at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Court will inform the parties of the specific courtroom in advance of the hearing. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 DECLARATION of Mira Hashmall in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #370 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 Defendant County's Report of Available Resources for People Experiencing Homelessness, #2 Ex. 2 Disrupting the Cycle of Chronic Homelessness, #3 Ex. 3 Statement Of Proceedings, #4 Ex. 4 Statement Of Proceedings, #5 Ex. 5 Statement Of Proceedings, #6 Ex. 6 Statement Of Proceedings, #7 Ex. 7 Statement Of Proceedings, #8 Ex. 8 Letter from DHS to Board Transmitting HFH Quarterly Report, #9 Ex. 9 February 2016 Homeless Initiative Approved Strategies to Combat Homelessness, #10 Ex. 10 QR1 Full Report, #11 Measures Appearing on Ballot, #12 Ex. 12 September 29, 2017 Measure-H-Strategy-Implementation-Plans, #13 Ex. 13 December 3, 2020 Homeless-Initiative-Quarterly-Report-No.-18, #14 Ex. 14 February 22, 2021 Report, #15 Ex. 15 Quarterly Report No. 20 Item 47 A Agenda of February 9, 2016, #16 Ex. 16 Board of Supervisors Approves LA County Homeless Initiative in FY 2021-2022, #17 Ex. 17 Statement Of Proceedings, #18 Ex. 18 #136 - Binding Term Sheet (BTS), #19 Ex. 19 #177 - Notice of First Payment on September 1, 2020 Pursuant to BTS, #20 Ex. 20 #185 - Notice to Court re MOU, #21 Ex. 21 #203 - Notice of Second Payment on December 22, 2020 Pursuant to BTS & MOU, #22 Ex. 22 #254 - Notice of Third Payment on March 24, 2021 Pursuant to BTS & MOU, #23 Ex. 23 #341 - Notice of Fourth Payment on July 9, 2021 Pursuant to BTS & MOU, #24 Ex. 24 #364 - November 2, 2021 Report on Mainstream Services Pursuant to BTS & MOU, #25 Ex. 25 Statement Of Proceedings, #26 Ex. 26 LAHSA Receives $15 Million Grant From HUD To Address Youth Homelessnes, #27 Ex. 27 Statement Of Proceedings, #28 Ex. 28 Statement Of Proceedings, #29 Ex. 29 November 2, 2021 Motion, #30 Ex. 30 May 12, 2020 Motion re Homelessness Crisis Response Strategy, #31 Ex. 31 July 2, 2020 CEO COVID Recovery Plan Report Attaching LAHSA Funding Plan, #32 Ex. 32 May 15, 2020 CEO COVID Recovery Plan Report, #33 Ex. 33 #197 - Status Report re MHSA Funds, #34 Ex. 34 May 2, 2017 Board Letter, #35 Ex. 35 MHSA Announcements, #36 Ex. 36 Letter re County's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Notice of Lodging [Proposed] Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Notice of Lodging [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Hashmall, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Hoang, Arlene)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant City of Los Angeles to Respond to First Amended and Supplemental Complaint and for a Briefing Schedule #367 . Extended to 12/3/21; SEE DOCMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #361 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoang, Arlene)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation Extending Time For Defendant County of Los Angeles to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (30 days or less) #365 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Los Angeles answer now due 12/3/2021, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #361 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 STATUS REPORT (Quarterly Status Report Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding Between County of Los Angeles and City of Los Angeles) filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mainstream Benefits Quarterly Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Salsig on behalf of Defendant City of Los Angeles (Attorney Ryan Salsig added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Salsig, Ryan)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, Wenzial Jarrell, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, identifying LA Alliance, Joseph Burk, Harry Tashdijian, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Marlow, Charles Van Scoy, George Frem, Gary Whitter, Leandro Suarez, Wenzial Jarrell, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Amended and Supplemental AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs George Frem, Joseph Burk, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Van Scoy, Harry Tashdjian, Leandro Suarez, Gary Whitter, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Malow, Wenzial Jarrell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order re Preliminary Injunction)(Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Wenzial Jarrell(pty:pla))(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #358 MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file said Amended and Supplemental Complaint forthwith. (twdb)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amended and Supplemental Complaint #358 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Mitchell and Ex. A, #2 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 357 STATUS REPORT Annual Report pursuant to the MOU [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoang, Arlene)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 STATUS REPORT Quarterly Report pursuant to the MOU [DKT. 185-1] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hoang, Arlene)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #352 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #281 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #278 , CCA # 21-55395, 21-55404, 21-55408. The judgment of this Court, entered September 23, 2021, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are awarded to Appellants. (car)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice (Other), #350 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #351 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #353 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #352 e-mailed to david@jtlegalgroup.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 filed by Cangress, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #281 filed by City of Los Angeles, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #278 filed by County of Los Angeles. CCA # 21-55395; 21-55404; 55408. (twdb)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 352 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 filed by Cangress, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #281 filed by City of Los Angeles, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #278 filed by County of Los Angeles. CCA # 21-55395; 21-55404; 55408. VACATED and REMANDED. (twdb)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 21-55395; 21-55404; 55408; In light of our concurrently filed opinion, the administrative stay issued on May 13 and extended on June 10, 2021, is hereby VACATED. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION AS TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEAL ORDER. (twdb)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to File First Amended Complaint (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court continues the status conference from September 30, 2021 to December 16, 2021 at 9:00 am at the FIRST STREET U.S. COURTHOUSE, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. ( Status Conference set for 12/16/2021 AT 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel, #347 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Association not signed by Ana Lai. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Ana Wai-Kwan Lai on behalf of Defendant County of Los Angeles. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles (Attorney Emily A Rodriguez-Sanchirico added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Rodriguez-Sanchirico, Emily)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE #345 by Judge David O. Carter. Status Conference is hereby continued form August 26, 2021 to September 30, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. (et)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from August 26, 2021 to September 30, 2021 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Vacate Hearing and Briefing Schedule for Defendant City of LA'S Motion to Dismiss #343 . The current briefing schedule and hearing date of August 19, 2021, of Defendant Citys Motion to Dismiss is vacated; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 STIPULATION to Vacate Hearing and Briefing Schedule for Defendant City of LA's Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #336 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 342 STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO THE MOU [DKT. 185] filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to City's Quarterly Status Report, #2 Exhibit B to City's Quarterly Status Report, #3 Exhibit C to City's Quarterly Status Report, #4 Exhibit D to City's Quarterly Status Report, #5 Exhibit E to City's Quarterly Status Report)(Hoang, Arlene)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE Of Payment And Report Regarding Mainstream Services At City Facilities filed by the County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - County Mainstream Benefits Quarterly Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
July 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Letter in Support of Court Intervention (Ravis, Mark)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Monitor's Interim Report & Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Monitor's Supplemental Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Sobel, Carol)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss Case #336 is continued to AUGUST 19, 2021, at 9:00 AM at the Santa Ana Courthouse, Courtreoom 9D, Ninth Floor. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Letter from Pacific Palisades Residents Association filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter (Umhofer, Matthew)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Hoang, Arlene)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 LETTER from County of Los Angeles Board of Supervisors Chair Hilda Solis. (kd)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Reporter. (Rodriguez-Sanchirico, Emily)
May 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05/27/2021 at 9:02 a.m. re Transcript #331 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05/27/2021 at 9:02 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra L. Ponce, CSR, RDR, CRR, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2021. (Ponce, Myra)
May 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Parties requests for exhibits and photographs shown at the May 27, 2021 hearing (kd) Modified on 5/30/2021 (kd). refer to #331 for Transcript
May 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court, having read and considered the joint stipulation filed on behalf of Plaintiffs LA ALLIANCE, et al. (Plaintiffs) and Defendant City of Los Angeles (the City), and finding GOOD CAUSE thereon, hereby GRANTS the stipulated two week extension of time for the City to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Citys response to Plaintiffs Complaint is to be filed on or by June 17, 2021. STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 17, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 17, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marcus, Scott)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05-26-2021, 10:01 am re Transcript #326 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Algorri, Miranda) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05-26-2021, 10:01 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miranda Algorri, phone number/email mirandaalgorri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Algorri, Miranda)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Settlement Proposal filed by Amicus Union Rescue Mission (Attachments: #1 Settlement Proposal)(Abascal, Manuel)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MINUTES OF Status Conference (Held and Completed) before Judge David O. Carter, Andre Birotte, Judge: Case called. Also present is Special Master Michele Martinez. Status Conferenceheld before Judge David O. Carter at 350 W. First Street, Los Angeles, California. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (twdb)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. On Thursday, May 27, 2021, the Court held an evidentiary hearing in Los Angeles. Per the Courts April 25, 2021 order (Dkt. 286) on Defendants Ex Parte Applications to Stay (Dkt 282, 284), the purpose of the May 27th hearing was to 1) determine what properties exist and are available for homelessness relief and 2) receive testimony from the City and County regarding the Courts findings on structural racism in its April 20, 2021 preliminary injunction. Dkt. 286 at 14. SEE MINUTE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (kd)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant County of Los Angeles #316 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Answer and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on file. (twdb)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter; Judge Andre Birotte, Judge: Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter at 350 W. First Street, Los Angeles, California. The Court orders the transcript for the hearing date above be made available on the docket forthwith free of charge to all ordering parties. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (twdb)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.(Miller, Louis)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. Application set for hearing on 6/7/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. On 05-26-2021, the Court held a status conference in Los Angeles regarding the Agreement & Binding Term Sheet between the City and County of Los Angeles #136 . The Court is concerned by the parties representations that certain provisions of the agreement are not being met. However, the Court will postpone the decision of whether or not to reinstate its May 22, 2020 preliminary injunction #123 pending the outcome of the freeway audit provided by the County in July 2021. Accordingly, the Court SCHEDULES an additional status conference for August 26, 2021, at which time the Court will receive testimony from the City and County regarding additional progress made towards housing individuals living within 500 feet of freeway overpasses and underpasses and other homeless individuals prioritized in the Agreement & Binding Term Sheet. At that time, the Court will further consider whether to reinstate its May 22, 2020 preliminary injunction. (kd)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Counsel shall disregard docket entry 312 as the attachment was not made available. Please refer to docket entry #313 .THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Parties requests for exhibits and photographs shown at the May 26, 2021 hearing. (kd)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Parties request for powerpoint shown at the May 26, 2021 hearing by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Letter from CENTRAL City Association of Los Angeles (kd) Modified on 5/26/2021 (kd).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Letter from Downtown Los Angeles Neighborhood Council. (kd)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 REQUEST TO CORRECT DOCKET filed by Intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker (Sobel, Carol)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #296 . (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Letter from SkidRow Stakeholders. (kd)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Letter from SkidRow Advisory Council. (kd)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 STATEMENT of Support filed by Amicus Skid Row Housing Trust re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, #277 . (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 filed by Cangress, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #281 filed by City of Los Angeles, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #278 filed by County of Los Angeles. CCA # 21-55395, 21-55404, and 21-55408. In this order, we consider only the request for an administrative stay. We find that a brief administrative stay is warranted to preserve the status quo until the district courts May 27, 2021 evidentiary hearing as these further proceedings may impact whether a stay pending appeal is necessary or justified. The district court's April 20, 2021 preliminary injunction is stayed until June 15, 2021. Appeal Nos. 21-55395, 21-55404 and 21-55408 are consolidated. Failure to file timely an opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the (9th CCA) Clerk for failure to prosecute. [See document for more complete details.](mat)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter. For the reasons set forth, the Court DENIES Defendant County's Motion to Dismiss #256 . Please see Minute Order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing via Zoom (Held and Completed) before Judge David O. Carter: Taking under advisement #256 MOTION to Dismiss ; Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb) Modified on 5/11/2021 (twdb).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court orders the Motion to Dismiss hearing set for 5/10/2021 at 8:30 AM to be held via Zoom. The Court's Zoom information is located at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. The Court will hold a hearing on Wednesday, May 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss with the parties the status of the Binding Term Sheet Agreement #136 (Exh. A) entered into on June 18, 2020 and the Memorandum of Understanding between the County of Los Angeles and the City of Los Angeles [185-1] (Exh. B) entered into on October 9, 2020. The Court will then consider whether to reinstate its May 22, 2020 preliminary injunction #123 to protect those individuals experiencing homelessness currently living near freeway overpasses, underpasses, and ramps. A hearing to discuss these matters will be held on Wednesday, May 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. at the FIRST STREET U.S. COURTHOUSE, 350 W 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565. (kd)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPORT of to explain why an emergency declaration has not been issued filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 filed by Cangress. CCA # 21-55408. The appeal filed April 23, 2021, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. [See document for complete details.](mat)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55408 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 as to Intervenor Cangress. (mat)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE Notice to the Court of Defendant County of Los Angeles' Emergency Declaration Dated December 6, 2016 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles #256 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #281 filed by City of Los Angeles. CCA # 21-55404. The appeal filed April 23, 2021, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. [See document for more complete details.](mat)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Los Angeles answer now due 6/3/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Marcus, Scott)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 AMENDED MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Ex Parte Applications to Stay Pending Appeal #282 , #284 by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) Modified on 4/26/2021 (dgo).
April 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Ex Parte Applications to Stay Pending Appeal #282 #284 by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
April 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Appeal Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, #277 #284 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Appeal Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, #277 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Marcus, Scott)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Intervenor Cangress. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #279 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, #277 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31175978.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction Order 4 20 21, #2 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction Order Modified 4 22 21)(Sobel, Carol)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Appeal Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, #277 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cheri Todroff, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mira Hashmall, #3 Declaration Declaration of Matt McGloin, #4 Declaration Declaration of Vanessa Moody, #5 Proposed Order) (Miller, Louis)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #279 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, #277 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31173233.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Minutes (Injunction) of 04-20-21, #2 Civil Minutes (Clarification) of 04-22-21, #3 Representation Statement)(Marcus, Scott)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55395 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #278 as to defendant County of Los Angeles. (lc)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. The Court provides the following two clarifications regarding the Preliminary Injunction issued on April 20, 2021. First, the directives under Accountability and City- and County-Wide Actions pertain to all districts in the City and County and are not limited in any way to Skid Row. Second, the provision regarding the cessation of sales and transfers by lease or covenant under Section 2(a)(ii) does not apply to projects in progress as of the date of the order, April 20, 2021. (kd)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, #277 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31160521.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 20, 2021 Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. The Court acknowledges that it may appear unusual to issue a preliminary injunction without a hearing on the motion. In the Ninth Circuit, however, there is no presumption that the issuance of a preliminary injunction requires an evidentiary hearing; instead, the decision to hold a hearing is left to the sound discretion of the district court. In practical terms, the Court has already held 12 evidentiary hearings, and this preliminary injunction is rooted in the extensive factual record developed through these hearings. After numerous hearings and careful review of the motion and opposition, the Court finds it appropriatein accordance with the emergency conditions of homelessness in Los Angelesto grant preliminary injunctive relief without an additional hearing. To do so is consistent with Ninth Circuit precedent, the text and spirit of Rule 65, and the urgent need for relief this case presents. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (kd)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 DECLARATION of DANIEL FLAMING IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #265 and Exhibits A-D filed by Intervenor Cangress. (Sobel, Carol)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #265 filed by Intervenor Cangress. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Blasi, #2 Declaration of Daniel Flaming, #3 Declaration of Sam Tsemberis, #4 Declaration Sara Shortt)(Myers, Shayla)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 DECLARATION of Cheri Todoroff, head of Los Angeles County Homeless Initiative re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #270 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Miller, Louis)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 DECLARATION of Elise Buik, President and CEO at the United Way of Greater Los Angeles re Response #272 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Louis)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Amicus Curiae Brief #264 (Miller, Louis)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Evidentiary Objections re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #265 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Miller, Louis)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #265 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Miller, Louis)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #265 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Jessica Mariani, #3 Declaration of Miguel Grajeda, #4 Declaration of Domingo Orosco)(Mariani, Jessica)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles #256 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOU QUARTERLY STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Marcus, Scott)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Mitchell and Exs. A-F, #2 Declaration Compilation of LA Alliance Members, et al., #3 Proposed Order) (Umhofer, Matthew)
April 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Amicus Committee for Safe Havens. RE: Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File #223 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Ravis, Mark)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #262 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The new page limit for Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is thirty-five (35) pages. (twdb)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Letter from Councilmember Curren D. Price, Jr. 9th District (kd)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles Request for Judicial Notice #258 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Louis)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles #256 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Louis)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 [REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO DISMISS filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Hashmall, Jennifer) Modified on 3/29/2021 (lom).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 [DECLARATION OF MIRA HASHMALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO DISMISS filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles Declaration of Mira Hashmall filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit) (Hashmall, Jennifer) Modified on 3/29/2021 (lom).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Hashmall, Jennifer)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE Notice re Stay Lifted filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 [NOTICE TO THE COURT OF PAYMENT FROM COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO BINDING TERM SHEET filed as] NOTICE Notice of Payment filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Hashmall, Jennifer) Modified on 3/29/2021 (lom).
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Letter from United Way Greater Los Angeles (kd)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Letter from Citizens Preserving Venice (kd)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Letter from Los Angeles Business Council (kd)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Amicus Union Rescue Mission. RE: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rev. Andrew J. Bales, M.A.T. in Support)(Abascal, Manuel)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Manuel A Abascal counsel for Amicus Union Rescue Mission. Adding Manuel A. Abascal as counsel of record for Union Rescue Mission for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Amicus Curiae Union Rescue Mission. (Abascal, Manuel)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 [LAHSA's Memorandum in Response to Court's 01-31-2021 Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 205)] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LAHSA Memorandum)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #232 , Notice of Appearance #234 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court having considered the Motion of Union Rescue Mission for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in response to this Courts January 31, 2021 Order to Appear and Show Cause, #205 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. #241 It is therefore ORDERED that Amicus Curiae Union Rescue Mission be granted leave to file its brief in this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker. CORRECTED EXHIBIT B as to Response #244 . (Sobel, Carol)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE filed by Intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sobel, Carol)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 REPORT of Intervenors in Response to Court's January 31, 2021 Order filed by Intervenor Cangress. (Myers, Shayla)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 BRIEF filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. re: Equitable Remedies and Responses to Requests for Information regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #206 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #213 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Marcus, Scott)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Response to This Court's January 31, 2021 Order to Appear and Show Cause filed by Amicus Curiae Union Rescue Mission. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Union Rescue Mission(pty:am)) (Abascal, Manuel)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Umhofer, Matthew)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitterto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 Plaintiff's Response to The Court's Request for Briefing (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Mitchell and Exs. A-D)(Umhofer, Matthew)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Amicus The Center in Hollywood. RE: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 . (Umhofer, Matthew)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 [Defendants' Joint Statement of Facts Pursuant to Court's January 31, 2021 Order] (Hashmall, Jennifer)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #206 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #213 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LAHSA Report)(Hashmall, Jennifer)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Locations for Temporary Housing, #2 Exhibit B - Chief Justice Roberts excerpts)(Miller, Louis)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger on behalf of Amicus Central City Association of Los Angeles (Attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger added to party Central City Association of Los Angeles(pty:am))(Hamburger, Bradley)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Amicus Central City Association of Los Angeles. RE: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #205 . (Kapur, Theano)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theano Evangelis Kapur on behalf of Amicus Central City Association of Los Angeles (Attorney Theano Evangelis Kapur added to party Central City Association of Los Angeles(pty:am))(Kapur, Theano)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Letter from Women's Recovery Center (twdb)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. Upon review of the Ex Parte Application to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus NAACP - Compton Branch, CORE-CA, Committee for Safe Havens #229 , the Court GRANTS said request. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus NAACP - Compton Branch, CORE-CA, Committee for Safe Havens. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration) (Attorney Mark S Ravis added to party NAACP - Compton Branch(pty:am), Attorney Mark S Ravis added to party CORE-CA(pty:am), Attorney Mark S Ravis added to party Committee for Safe Havens(pty:am)) (Ravis, Mark)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF THE SOCIAL JUSTICE LEGAL FOUNDATION AND HUESTON HENNIGAN, LLP. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 OBJECTIONS to Appointment filed by Intervenor Los Angeles Community Action Network. (Sobel, Carol)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 OBJECTIONS to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #224 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Miller, Louis)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE City of Los Angeles' Response and Objection to Dkt 224 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: The parties are given five (5) court days, more specifically, March 1, 2021, to lodge any objection to this order and appointment. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #222 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Briefs in Response to Court's Request. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Briefs in Response to Court's Request filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hashmall, Jennifer)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Joint Stipulation and REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File Briefs in Response to Court's Request #220 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Joint REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File Briefs and Information ordered by the Court filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/4/21 10:02 A.M. re Transcript #218 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jlo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/4/21 10:02 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Veritex Legal Solutions, phone number (866) 299-5127. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (jlo)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. The Court would appreciate a response to the following additional questions, as well as the initial nine questions set forth by the Court on February 3, 2021 #206 and at the hearing on February 4, 2021. [Please refer to the minute order for complete details.] (kd)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 AMENDED STATEMENT Susie Shannon filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (kd)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STATEMENT of Commissioner Susie Shannon regarding events on Skid Row January 29, 2021 (kd)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STATEMENT of Mark Ridley-Thomas - Council Meeting Remarks - February 3, 2021 (kd)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MINUTES OF Status Conference held on February 4, 2021 before Judge David O. Carter: The Court orders the transcripts for the hearing date listed below be made available on the docket forthwith free of charge to all ordering parties: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Recorder: Fabian Venegas/Digital Recorder. (twdb)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STATEMENT Submission to the Court re: the February 4, 2021 hearing. (kd)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Submission as to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #206 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit City of Los Angeles Actions to Address Homelessness)(Marcus, Scott)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: The Court sets the time for the hearing on Thursday, February 4, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Some of the preliminary questions that the Court will be asking are attached in this minute order. There have been numerous requests from council or board members to speak. The Court invites these presentations and suggests coordination through Councilman De Leon Offices. In addition to the invitation to have Mayor Eric Garcetti, City Attorney Mike Feuer and Chairman of the Board of Supervisors Hilda Solis address the Court, the following elected officials have already indicated that they would like to speak and will be speaking: Councilmember Kevin De Leon, Councilmember Mike Bonin, and Los Angeles County Board of Supervisor Kathryn Barger. (Please review complete minute order for details) (kd)
January 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. The Court is convening and inviting the parties to appear on Skid Row at the Downtown Womens Center, located at the corner of 5th and San Pedro, on Thursday, February 4, 2021, to present evidence of any actions already taken and completed to address the homelessness crisis from the onset of this litigation in March, 2020, to the present, and provide progress and status reports regarding the agreement of June 18, 2020. Social distancing protocol will be observe as in all prior hearings. [Please see minute order for complete details.] (kd)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 QUARTERLY MOU STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to City's Quarterly Status Report, #2 Exhibit B to City's Quarterly Status Report, #3 Exhibit C to City's Quarterly Status Report, #4 Exhibit D to City's Quarterly Status Report, #5 Exhibit E to City's Quarterly Status Report)(Mariani, Jessica)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE TO THE COURT OF PAYMENT FROM COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO BINDING TERM SHEET filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (McLain, Byron)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/5/20 9:45 A.M. re Transcript #201 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/5/20 9:45 A.M.. Court Reporter: Veritex Legal Solutions (866) 299-5127, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/5/20 9:45 A.M.. Court Reporter: Veritex Legal Solutions (866) 299-5127, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Release of Transcfor Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2021. (ha) (Main Document 201 replaced on 11/26/2020) (ha).ript Restriction set for 2/10/2021. (ha) (Main Document 201 replaced on 11/26/2020) (ha). (Main Document 201 replaced on 11/26/2020) (ha).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Parties requests for exhibits and photographs shown at the November 5 monitoring conference by Judge David O. Carter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (kd)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: The Court REQUESTS of the parties explanations and solutions for the rise in homeless deaths. Homeless deaths are now up 36% in Los Angeles County1,141 deaths in the first 10 months of this year, compared to 837 in the same period last year. Thats a rise of nearly four deaths per day. Even accounting for 47 Covid-19 related deaths through October, this means at least a 31% rise of deaths amongst our homeless citizens. The parties are hereby on notice that the Court will expect the parties to address what efforts they have made, particularly with regard to immediately providing shelter, housing and services, to address this horrific figure on November 5, 2020. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (kd)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Status Report #188 (Hashmall, Jennifer)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. Plaintiffs Request for Clarification #194 will also be heard on November 5, 2020 at the Monitoring Status Conference at Los Angeles City Hall, 200 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (kd)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Special Hearing on Plaintiffs Request for Clarification #194 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REQUEST for Special Hearing on Plaintiffs Request for Clarification filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 OBJECTIONS Intervenors' Objection to Plaintiffs' Status Report (Docket 188) filed by Intervenor Cangress. (Myers, Shayla)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REPORT of LAHSA'S LIST OF AVAILABLE RESOURCES FOR PEOPLE EXPERIENCING HOMELESSNESS filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Programs)(McLain, Byron)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Filing List of Available Resources for Persons Experiencing Homelessness filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to City's Notice)(Hoang, Arlene)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. In accordance with the Courts authority to monitor the agreement reached between the parties (see Dkt. #136 ), the Court hereby SCHEDULES a Monitoring Status Conference for Thursday, November 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. In order to comply with public health guidance, the Monitoring Status Conference shall be held at Los Angeles City Hall, 200 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. In an effort to have a productive discussion, the Court needs to be informed of progress towards the implementation of the agreement, such as newly established deadlines, contracts, or shelter opportunities. The Court accordingly REQUESTS the attendance of city council members, county supervisors, and agency heads to report their progress. (kd)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPORT of AVAILABLE RESOURCES FOR PEOPLE EXPERIENCING HOMELESSNESS filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Services)(McLain, Byron)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 REQUEST for Hearing Status Conference filed by Intervenor Cangress. (Myers, Shayla)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 QUARTERLY MOU STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to City's Quarterly Status Report, #2 Exhibit B to City's Quarterly Status Report, #3 Exhibit C to City's Quarterly Status Report, #4 Exhibit D to City's Quarterly Status Report)(Hoang, Arlene)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE TO THE COURT REGARDING MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING FOR 6,700 BED PLAN FROM CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 City-County MOU Executed with Binding Term Sheet)(McLain, Byron)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MEDIATION WITH CITY AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES IN CONTINUATION OF SETTLEMENT EFFORTS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order for City and County of Los Angeles to Meet, Confer, and File a Joint Report Re: Status of MOU Pursuant to June 2020 Agreement by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the discussion at the 9/24/2020 mediation meeting, and in accordance with the Court's authority to monitor the agreement reached between the parties #136 , the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: (1) The parties shall meet, confer, and file a confidential Joint Report by 10/5/2020 informing the Court of its progress toward developing a Memorandum of Understanding ("MOU") to govern their agreement. The Joint Report shall identify what challenges, if any, the patties face in developing the MOU, and the reasons for those challenges. (2) As represented at the 9/24/2020 mediation meeting, the City, County, and LAHSA shall file lists of all of their available resources for people experiencing homelessness by 10/23/2020. The list shall include the names of the entities/organizations as well as a brief description of the resources available. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/17/20 9:50 a.m. re Transcript #181 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/17/20 9:50 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Veritex Legal Solutions (866) 299-5127, phone number (866) 299-5127. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020. (ha)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MEETING WITH CITY AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES IN CONTINUATION OF SETTLEMENT EFFORTS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby schedules a meeting with the City and the County of Los Angeles for Thursday, September 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cb)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Filing Updated Summary of Work in advance of September 17, 2020 Status Conference filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to City's Notice)(Hoang, Arlene)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE TO THE COURT OF PAYMENT FROM COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO BINDING TERM SHEET filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (McLain, Byron)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STATUS REPORT in advance of September 17, 2020 status conference (responsive to docket numbers 172, 174 and 175) filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Hoang, Arlene)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter re: Status Report #172 , Notice of Errata #174 : On September 7, 2020, Plaintiffs filed a Status Report (Dkt. 172), followed by a Notice of Errata with Exhibits A, B, C, and D on September 8, 2020 (Dkt. 174). These filings detail the City of Los Angeles's estimate that 740 pallet shelters, over five years, will cost over $91 million. See Ex. A at 7. Plaintiffs represent that this results in an average per-bed rate of $41,932.83, a significantly higher sum than per-bed rates for similar pallet shelter initiatives in other municipalitiesfor example, per-bed rates of $8,252 in the City of Riverside and $14,875 in the County of Sonoma. Plaintiffs also raise various questions to identify potential cost-cutting options. The Court hereby INVITES the City of Los Angeles to file a response to theStatus Report and Exhibits by 12:00 noon on Tuesday, September 15, 2020. In lieu of additional briefing, the parties shall reserve further discussion of this topic for the Status Conference set for Thursday, September 17, 2020. (dgo)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. correcting Status Report #172 attaching Exhibits A-D (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter re: Status Report #172 . On September 7, 2020, Plaintiffs filed a Status Report (Dkt. 172). While the Status Report refers to Exhibits A, B, C, and D, no such exhibits are attached to the Status Report. Plaintiffs shall attach the exhibits to a notice of errata filed with the Court by 9:00 p.m. this evening, i.e., Tuesday, September 8, 2020. (dgo)
September 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: ORDER SETTING MEDIATION TO CONTINUE PRIOR EFFORTS TOWARD SETTLEMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cb)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MEDIATION TO CONTINUE PRIOR EFFORTS TOWARD SETTLEMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court hereby schedules a mediation for Thursday, September 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. In order to comply with public health guidance, the Status Conference shall be held at Los Angeles City Hall, 200 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. ( Status Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Reporter #164 . The Court refers the parties to docket entry 166 for the Transcript of the August 7,2020 hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/07/2020, 10:05 a.m. re Transcript #165 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/07/2020 10:05 a.m. Court Reporter: KATHERINE M. STRIDE, RPR, CSR, email address: katscsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2020. (ls)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant County of Los Angeles for Court Reporter. Court will contact Angelica Ransom at aransom@millerbarondess.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Miller, Louis)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/18/20 9:26 a.m. re Transcript #162 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/18/20 9:26 a.m. - Alexandria Hotel Ballroom. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Veritex Legal Solutions (866) 299-5127, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2020. (ha) Modified on 8/13/2020 (ha).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO INTERVENE #154 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTES OF Status Conference (Held at Los Angeles City Hall) before Judge David O. Carter: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (twdb)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STATUS REPORT in Advance of August 7, 2020 Status Conference filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker. (Myers, Shayla)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) re Notice of Errata Re: August 7, 2020 Status Conference #156 by Judge David O. Carter: At the upcoming Status Conference scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, August 7, 2020 (see Dkt. 156), the Court REQUESTS the attendance of LAHSA Commission Chair Wendy Greuel. The Court recently learned that Ms. Greuel is the new chairperson and welcomes her involvement in the upcoming proceedings. The parties shall forthwith provide Commission Chair Greuel with a copy of the Courts original order (Dkt. 156) and this notice. (dgo)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. In accordance with the Courts authority to monitor the agreement reached between the parties, the Court hereby SCHEDULES a Status Conference for Friday, AUGUST 7, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. In order to comply with public health guidance, the Status Conference shall be held at Los Angeles City Hall, 200 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Court will inquire about the central authority tasked with carrying out the parties agreement and such authoritys plans for implementing the agreement. The Court also intends to ask about the implementation of the agreement in each council district and supervisorial district. In addition, to better understand the effects of the ongoing pandemic, the Court asks that the parties be prepared to give an estimate of how many unsheltered individuals experiencing homelessness died during 2019 in the City and County of Los Angeles. (see minute order for complete details.) (kd)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO INTERVENE #154 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court is in receipt of Proposed Intervenor-Plaintiffs Latino Coalition of Los Angeless and Jose Tiguilas (Proposed Intervenors) Ex Parte Application to Intervene. [154. The Court extends an invitation to the Proposed Intervenors to attend the next scheduled Status Conference in this matter, which will be calendared as soon as it can be safely scheduled in accordance with prevailing public health conditions. At that time, Proposed Intervenors can present argument in person with all parties present as to why intervention is appropriate and permissible. (kd)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene filed by Proposed Intervenor-Plaintiffs Latino Coalition of Los Angeles, Josue Tiguila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice of Exhibits 101 and 102, #2 Declaration of Latino Coalition of Los Angeles, #3 Declaration of Josue Tiguila, #4 Declaration of Christian Contreras, #5 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application, #6 Supplement Proof of Electronic Service) (Attorney Christian M Contreras added to party Latino Coalition of Los Angeles(pty:intvp), Attorney Christian M Contreras added to party Josue Tiguila(pty:intvp)) (Contreras, Christian)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. correcting Errata #150 , Status Report,, #149 (Second Notice of Errata) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit B to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report)(Marcus, Scott)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Text Only Order re Status Report [149-2], Notice of Errata [150-1] by Judge David O. Carter: In response to an emergency ex parte request by the City of Los Angeles, the Court sealed Exhibit B to the City's most recent status reports [149-2], [150-1] in advance of a formal request being filed on the docket. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REQUEST to Supplement Status Report re Status Report #147 , Status Report,, #149 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Umhofer, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. correcting Status Report,, #149 Exhibit B to the status report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to City's status report)(Hoang, Arlene)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STATUS REPORT for July 15, 2020 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report, #2 Exhibit B to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report, #3 Exhibit C to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report, #4 Exhibit D to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report, #5 Exhibit E to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report, #6 Exhibit F to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report, #7 Exhibit G to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report, #8 Exhibit H to City of Los Angeles 7-15-20 Status Report)(Marcus, Scott)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS POSTPONING JULY 16,2020 STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter: In the Court's July 8, 2020 Minute Order (the Order) (Dkt. 143), the Court scheduled a Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on July 16, 2020 (the Status Conference). See Order at 1. However, on Tuesday, July 14, 2020, Los Angeles County public health officials... reported the highest single-day count of COVID-19 cases and related hospitalizations since the pandemic hit. Colleen Shalby, L.A. County Sets Record for COVID-19 Cases, Hospitalizations as Conditions Worsen, L.A. Times (July 14, 2020), https://www.latimes.com/california/story/2020-07-14/threat-level-in-los-angeles-increasing-mayor-warns. There have never been more infections or reported daily positive cases in Los Angeles than there are currently. Id. As the Coronavirus pandemic continues to worsen, the Court cannot in good conscience conduct an in-person hearing on the scale of the planned Status Conference, which numerous public officials, staff members, and community activists planned to attend. The Court recognizes that many prospective attendees have been hard at work preparing presentations for the Status Conference, and the Court regrets that they will not be able to share their knowledge with the Court on July 16, 2020 as planned. The Court, however, must prioritize everyone's health and well-being in these precarious times. As such, the Court will look forward to hearing from all of the individuals expected to attend the Status Conference as soon as it can be safely rescheduled in accordance with prevailing public health conditions. The Court hereby POSTPONES the Status Conference, and will reschedule the Status Conference as soon as public health conditions improve to an extent that the Status Conference can be safely held. The City and County of Los Angeles shall still submit the status report described in the Order by 12:00 noon on Wednesday, July 15, 2020. See Order at 2-3. Finally, the parties shall ensure that all individuals listed in the Order and Notices of Errata (Dkts. 144, 146) are notified of the postponement of the Status Conference. (dgo)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STATUS REPORT OF THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO JULY 8, 2020 ORDER [DKT 143] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McLain, Byron)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. At the upcoming Status Conference scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, July 16, 2020 (see Dkt. 143), the Court REQUESTS the attendance of Los Angeles City Attorney Mike Feuer, LAHSA Commission Chair Sarah Dusseault, Los Angeles Fire Department Chief Ralph M. Terrazas, and Los Angeles County Fire Department Chief Daryl L. Osby. The Court apologizes for their omission from the original order.The parties shall forthwith provide the above individuals with a copy of the Courts original order (Dkt. 143), the first notice of errata (Dkt. 144), and this notice.The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (kd)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Byron J McLain counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Amie Park as counsel of record for Defendant County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (McLain, Byron)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE #143 by Judge David O. Carter. In its Order for Status Report and Scheduling Status Conference (Order) (Dkt. 143), filed July 8, 2020, the Court erroneously instructed the parties to provide the individuals listed in the Order with a copy thereof by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, June 10, 2020. See Order at 3. The Court intended to set a deadline of 5:00 p.m. on Friday, July 10, 2020. In accordance with this correction, the parties shall ensure that all individuals listed in the Order are provided with a copy of the Order by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, July 10, 2020. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (kd)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court SCHEDULES a Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, July 16, 2020, to be held in the Ceremonial Courtroom at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Court will inquire about the central authority tasked with carrying out the parties agreement and such authoritys plans for implementing the agreement. The Court also intends to ask about the implementation of the agreement in each council district and supervisorial district. PLEASE READ COMPLETE ORDER FOR ALL DETAILS. (kd)
June 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Order re: Global Settlement Discussions. The Court hereby ORDERS a Mediation Conference between all parties on Thursday, June 25, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., regarding global settlement discussions for this matter. The Mediation Conference will occur before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. at the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7B, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The Court commends the City and County of Los Angeles for the settlement they have reached regarding individuals experiencing homelessness on or near highway underpasses and overpasses. The Court now urges the parties to continue these efforts to reach a global settlement of all the remaining disputes in this matter. The Court requests that the following principals be present at the Mediation Conference on Thursday, June 25, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.: Los Angeles Mayor Eric Garcetti; Los Angeles County Supervisor Kathryn Barger, Chair of the Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors; Los Angeles County Supervisor Mark Ridley-Thomas; Los Angeles City Council President Nury Martinez; and Los Angeles City Councilman Joe Buscaino. The presence of the principals was instrumental in reaching the initial settlement in this matter, and the Court is confident that further agreements can be reached with their continued direct participation in mediation. (ts)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (McLain, Byron)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING THE COURT APPROVE THE BINDING TERM SHEET AND VACATE THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #137 by Judge David O. Carter. The Preliminary Injunction Order dated May 22, 2020 [Dkt. #123 ] is hereby vacated without prejudice subject to the Court's later consideration of reinstatement of the Preliminary Injunction should the parties fail to comply with the Binding Term Sheet. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Joint STIPULATION for Order REQUESTING THE COURT APPROVE THE BINDING TERM SHEET AND VACATE THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLain, Byron)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SETTLEMENT TERM SHEET from Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (kd)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER RE BINDING TERM SHEET APPROVAL HEARING by Judge David O. Carter.On June 17, 2020, the City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles filed a Joint Request for Hearing to Approve Binding Term Sheet (Request) #134 . In this Request, the Defendants indicate that they have reached an agreement as a result of mediation, and have memorialized the terms in a Binding Term Sheet, subject to the Courts approval. The Court, having read and considered the Request, ORDERS the following: A hearing shall be held on Thursday, June 18, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. In order to comply with the Central District of Californias Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the hearing shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. The Court invites the attendance of the principals involved in the mediation, including Eric Garcetti, Mayor of the City of Los Angeles; Kathryn Barger, Chair of the County Board of Supervisors; Nury Martinez, President of the Los Angeles City Council; Joe Buscaino, Member of the Los Angeles City Council; Mark Ridley-Thomas, Member of the County Board of Supervisors and any other member of the Board of Supervisors or City Council who wishes to attend. (kd)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Joint STIPULATION for Order REQUESTING HEARING TO APPROVE BINDING TERM SHEET filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLain, Byron)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MEDIATION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby ORDERS Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles to continue the mediation today, Friday, June 12, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cb)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation of City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles to Extend Deadline to File Status Report #131 . Status Report due by 6/18/2020 at noon.) (twdb)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Joint STIPULATION for Order TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLain, Byron)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO CHANGE DATE AND LOCATION FOR MEDIATION (Dkt. No. #129 ) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The mediation currently scheduled for Thursday, June 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. will now take place on Thursday, June 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. See Order for details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cb)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Joint STIPULATION for Order TO CHANGE DATE AND LOCATION FOR MEDIATION filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLain, Byron)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Text Only Order by Judge David O. Carter: On the Court's own motion, docket entry #126 SEALED DOCUMENT is ORDERED unsealed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MEDIATION FOR DEFENDANTS CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO JUDGE CARTER'S ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles shall submit confidential briefs of no more than 20 pages by Tuesday, June 2, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles shall mediate this issue on Thursday, June 4, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. See Order for details. (cb)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Letter from Nury Martinez, Counsel President, re City's Intention to Enter Into Settlement Negotiations (kd) Modified on 5/29/2020 (dgo). Modified on 6/2/2020 (dgo).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR. The Court hereby GRANTS the Request and APPOINTS the Honorable Andr Birotte Jr. to serve as the mediator in this matter. Re: (Dkt. #124 ). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION (twdb)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Joint REQUEST for Order for TO MEDIATE filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLain, Byron)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: To facilitate the Courts monitoring of compliance with the terms of this preliminary injunction, the Court will require periodic status reports from the parties as to their progress. The first such report shall be filed with the Court no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, June 12, 2020. At minimum, this report shall detail a plan for establishing shelter and clearing overpasses, underpasses, and ramps in each council district or supervisorial district no later than September 1, 2020. The Court reserves the authority to advance the deadline of September 1, 2020 in the event that the interim status reports do not demonstrate satisfactory progress towards compliance with the preliminary injunction. Furthermore, the Court shall conduct additional hearings to monitor compliance as the Court finds necessary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (kd)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 OBJECTIONS tto Proposed Injunction filed by Intervenor Los Angeles Catholic Worker. (Sobel, Carol)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles TO COURTS PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION TO BE ISSUED MAY 22, 2020 [DOCKET NO. 108] (Marcus, Scott)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE filed by Defendant County of Los Angelesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, #108 (Young, Brandon)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction Dated May 15, 2020 regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, #108 . (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff LA Alliance for Human Rightsto Report #114 , Status Report #115 RE IMPLEMENTING COURT ORDER DATED MAY 15, 2020 (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STATUS REPORT re PEH Plan filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (McLain, Byron)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPORT of Alternative Plan filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTES OF Status Conference held on May 15, 2020 before Judge David O. Carter: Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter at the Los AngelesHomeless Services Authority, 811 Wilshire Blvd., 5th Floor Conference Room, LosAngeles, CA. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Austin Che. (twdb)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: The Court invites the parties input before this preliminary injunction takes effect. Therefore, the following timeline shall apply: (1) This preliminary injunction shall enter into force at 12:00 noon on Friday, May 22, 2020 (2) Before then, if the parties reach an agreement on an alternative plan, they may submit their plan to the Court by 3:00 p.m. on Tuesday, May 19, 2020. (3) If the parties submit an alternative plan, a hearing will be held to discuss the alternative plan on Wednesday, May 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. In order to comply with the Central District of Californias Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, if such a hearing occurs, it shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013, or another location designated and agreed upon by the parties. (4) To ensure all parties have an adequate opportunity to be heard, the parties may submit briefingnot to exceed 25 pages on this preliminary injunction by 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, May 21, 2020. The briefing deadlines the Court set from the bench are vacated and superseded by this order. (5) Before or after this preliminary injunction takes effect at 12:00 noon on Friday, May 22, 2020, the Court may modify this preliminary injunction, either on its own motion or upon consideration of the parties input. If modified, the Court will docket a superseding order. (kd)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court hereby SCHEDULES a Status Conference for Friday, May 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. In order to comply with the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the status conference shall be held at the Los Angeles Homeless Services Authority, 811 Wilshire Blvd., 5th Floor Conference Room, Los Angeles, CA. Status Conference set for 5/15/2020 @ 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER FOR BRIEFING by Judge David O. Carter. The health risks described above constitute an emergency and demand a swift response, the Court invites the parties input before ordering injunctive relief. To that end, the Court hereby ORDERS that the parties file briefing on the above proposal by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, May 20, 2020. Each brief should be no longer than twenty-five pages, and should, at a minimum, discuss the partys position on the legal justification for injunctive relief and the proposed remedy outlined above. The Court further ORDERS the City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles to submit an estimate of how many individuals experiencing homelessness would be affected by the proposed relief no later than 10:00 a.m. on Friday, May 15, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kd)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STATUS REPORT for May 13, 2020 Status Conference filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Young, Brandon)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: The Court hereby SCHEDULES a Status Conference for Wednesday, May 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. In order to comply with the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the settlement negotiations shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013, or another location designated and agreed upon by the parties. Status Conference set for 5/13/2020 @ 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. See Minute Order for further information. (dgo)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OBJECTIONS to Status Report #88 Letter objecting to selection of 749 S. Los Angeles Street as Safe Parking Site filed by Interested Party Santee Village Homeowner's Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Map of residential housing surrounding Proposed Site)(Mannion, David)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: FURTHER ORDER RE TRANSCRIPTS OF HEARINGS HELD ON APRIL 7, 2020, APRIL 14, 2020 AND APRIL 23, 2020. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Letter on behalf of Urban Offerings, Inc. re Objection to Selection of 749 S. Los Angeles Street as Safe Parking Site (Hallock, Karen)
May 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Scheduling Notice Re: Settlement Negotiations by Judge David O. Carter: The Court REQUESTS that the parties commence settlement negotiations, together with the Court, at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, May 7, 2020. In order to comply with the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the settlement negotiations shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. The Court further REQUESTS that the parties confidentially submit their written settlement positions to the Court in advance of the settlement negotiations.The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. Settlement Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See Minute Order for further information) (dgo)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STATUS REPORT Defendants Joint Progress Report for April 30 2020 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE TRANSCRIPTS OF HEARINGS HELD ON 4/7/20, 4/14/20 AND 4/23/20. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Letter from Kathryn Barger, Supervisor re County's Intention to Enter Into Settlement Negotiations. (dgo)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STATUS REPORT for April 27, 2020 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. The Court hereby APPOINTS Michele Martinez to serve as a Special Master in this case, alongside the previously appointed Special Master, the Honorable James L. Smith (Ret.). (twdb)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER FOR STATUS REPORTThe Court thanks the parties, as well as all of the additional attendees, who participated in the April 23, 2020 Status Conference for their efforts to engage in constructive discussions regarding efforts to house those experiencing homelessness during this pandemic. By this ORDER, the Court is memorializing the participants suggestions as to the process by which this may be accomplished.To that end, the parties shall file a joint status report no later than 4:00 p.m. on Monday, APRIL 27, 2020, regarding the following:(1) The use of property located at 749 S. Los Angeles Street, Los Angeles, California, for safe parking or pallet shelters; and(2) The status of the review and use of the property located at Maple and 16th Street, Los Angeles, California. At the April 23, 2020 Status Conference, the Court perceived what appeared to be a consensus reached among the participants, and on that basis REQUESTS that the parties file a progress report as to each of the following items on or before APRIL 30, 2020:(1) The current status of each location which has previously been identified or is under consideration as a safe parking site. In particular, said report should include how many recreational vehicles, vans, and cars are in each site, as well as the maximum capacity of each site.(2) The current status of the implementation of Governor Newsoms Project Roomkey. In particular, said report should include the number of persons already placed in hotels and motels.(3) The current number of recreational centers being used as shelters, and the number of persons sheltered therein. Finally, the Court notes that the City of Los Angeles is divided into 15 Districts, each represented by a City Councilperson. The Court has been advised that a settlement in this matter will best be achieved by a global settlement implemented on a District-by-District basis. The Court has been informed that, in furtherance of that goal, Nury Martinez, President, Los Angeles City Council, and Joe Buscaino, President Pro Tem, Los Angeles City Council, will be directly involved in the settlement discussions.The Court reiterates its appreciation of the efforts of all of the participants in these settlement discussions. (kd)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Mira Hashmall counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Mira Hashmall as counsel of record for Defendant County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Jennifer Mira Hashmall added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Hashmall, Jennifer)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STATEMENT [Status Conference Statement] filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles (Miller, Louis)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Louis R Miller counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Louis R. Miller as counsel of record for Defendant County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Louis R Miller added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Miller, Louis)
April 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Regarding Request for Emergency Status Conference #72 by Judge David O. Carter: The Project Roomkey program -- a joint undertaking by the City of Los Angeles, the County of Los Angeles, and the State of California -- seeks to secure hotel and motel rooms in the local community to provide safe isolation for the vulnerable homeless population during this unprecedented pandemic. As part of this program, over 250 hotel and motel owners have been contacted by City and County officials, and currently the County of Los Angeles has entered into contracts for over 2500 beds. The implementation of the Room Key Program will require cooperation of state and local government at all levels. The Court, recognizes the powers vested in the executive branch of government at all levels, including officials of the cities in which these hotels and motels are located. Concerns have been expressed by the cities of Lawndale and Bell Gardens regarding how this program is to be implemented. These concerns include, but are not necessarily limited to, the perceived lack of notice and an opportunity to be heard by the cities in which the hotels are located.The County of Los Angeles has requested an emergency status conference. Given the time-sensitive nature of the program and the concerns raised, the Court, to facilitate the discussion of these issues, respectfully invites the attendance of the following individuals at the previously scheduled status conference on Thursday April 23, 2020: City of Bell Gardens: Mayor Alejandra Cortez; City of Lawndale: Mayor Robert Pullen-Miles; Chairperson of the Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Kathryn Barger; and Not more than one (1) representative from each party in this action. In order to comply with the Central District of Californias Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the status conference shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. To ensure social distancing and compliance with public health guidelines, the above participants are urged to limit the number persons appearing on their behalf. (dgo)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REQUEST for Hearing Emergency Status Conference filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (McLain, Byron)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Transcript of April 14, 2020 Hearing and Instructions to Order Copies filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Hoang, Arlene)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT AND HEARING RE: PROPOSED SETTLEMENT by Judge David O. Carter. During the April 14, 2020 status conference, the parties indicated that they had reached a proposed settlement agreement regarding the use of the site at 16th and Maple as a parking area for recreational vehicles, vans, and cars being resided in by homeless persons. The Court then learned, at the last minute, that the proposed agreement in question was subject to evaluation of any environmental concerns that the site may present. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 21, 2020, addressing the following items: (a)the status of the environmental review, including any tentative findings and conclusions; and (b) any non-environmental issues remaining unresolved, as pertain to the proposed settlement agreement announced to the Court. The Court hereby schedules a hearing for Thursday, April 23 at 10:00 a.m. In order to comply with the Central District of Californias Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the hearing shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. (kd)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #66 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (twdb)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: During the April 14, 2020 status conference, the parties indicated that they had reached a proposed settlement agreement regarding the use of the site at 16th and Maple as a parking area for recreational vehicles, vans, and cars being resided in by homeless persons. The Court then learned, at the last minute, that the proposed agreement in question was subject to evaluation of any environmental concerns that the site may present. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 21, 2020, addressing the following items: (a) the status of the environmental review, including any tentative findings and conclusions; and (b) any non-environmental issues remaining unresolved, as pertain to the proposed settlement agreement announced to the Court. (kd)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Defendant City of Los Angeles is hereby ORDERED to make available those persons responsible for the environmental report concerning Maple and 16th Street by 8:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 14, 2020 (i.e., this evening). A hearing to discuss this report and related matters shall be held on Tuesday, April 14, 2020 at 8:00 p.m. In order to comply with the Central District of Californias Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the hearing shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (kd)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene filed by Intervenor-Plaintiff Venice Stakeholders Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. iso Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration Decl. iso Ex Parte Application, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte) (Attorney Jeffrey Lewis added to party Venice Stakeholders Association(pty:intvp)) (Lewis, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STATUS REPORT for April 14, 2020 Hearing filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STATUS REPORT Defendant County of Los Angeles April 13, 2020 Status Report filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Young, Brandon)
April 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STATUS REPORT RE RVs filed by Intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(Sobel, Carol)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT AND HEARING. At the April 7, 2020 hearing, Plaintiffs and Intervenors requested, and the Court ORDERED, a status report, which Defendants shall file either jointly or separately by 7:00 p.m. on Monday, April 13, 2020. See document for detailed information. The Court indicated at the previous hearing that it was going to start settlement discussions immediately. The initial discussion concerned recreational vehicles and focused on Skid Row and the surrounding area, up to and including the 10 Freeway. The Court requests that the parties discuss designated areas for recreational vehicles and present possible options to the Court, beginning with Skid Row and the surrounding area. If the parties wish to present a more comprehensive plan covering more of Los Angeles City and County, they are welcome to do so. While the Court will begin settlement discussions with a focus on Skid Row and the surrounding area, the Court intends to quickly broaden the scope of these discussions to encompass more of the City and County. As such, the parties should also be prepared to indicate to the Court when their respective principals will be available for an in-depth settlement discussion. A hearing to discuss these matters shall be held on Tuesday, April 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. In order to comply with the Central District of Californias Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the hearing shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. (ts)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STATUS REPORT for April 10, 2020 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES APRIL 10, 2020 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (McLain, Byron)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. Notice of Transcript of April 7, 2020 Hearing and Instructions to Order Copies (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter:In order to address the ostensibly inadequate sanitation facilities in Skid Row and the surrounding area, the Court hereby ORDERS Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles to submit a status report on Defendants plans for maintaining and servicing the sanitation facilities, such that the local community will have sufficient access to functioning sanitation facilities to mitigate the spread of coronavirus. Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles shall file the ordered status report, whether separately or jointly, within 48 hours, i.e., by 12:00 noon on Friday, April 10, 2020. (kd)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #45 EX PARTE APPLICATION. DENIED BY COURT. (twdb)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brandon D Young counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Lauren Black as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Young, Brandon)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STATUS REPORT filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker. (Myers, Shayla)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STATUS REPORT for April 7, 2020 Hearing filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REQUEST for Order for Status Report filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE OF APRIL 7 2020 HEARING filed by Intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker. (Sobel, Carol)
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. Since its previous Order in this case #48 issued April 1, 2020, the Court has continued to observe the conditions of the homeless community generally referred to as Skid Row. The Court attempted to use four of the handwashing stations that were in place prior to the COVID-19 outbreak, and found no water in all four of the tested stations. The Court also attempted to use two of the newly delivered handwashing stations; one was fully functional, and one had soap but no water. Although this sample size is small, the Courts observations raise a strong inference that there are inadequate sanitation facilities available in Skid Row. The Court, accompanied by Los Angeles Police Department officers, also encountered an employee from Andy Gump, Inc., who advised that he was working on instructions from his employer to remove fifty of the companys existing handwashing stations from Skid Row. Although Defendant City of Los Angeles represents, in its April 1 Status Report (Dkt. 50), that the City is deploying sixty new handwashing stations to Skid Row, if fifty of the existing handwashing stations are removed, Skid Row will see a net gain of only ten handwashing stations. This minimal increase supports the inference that the sanitation facilities in Skid Row continue to be inadequate to meet the exigencies of the COVID-19 health crisis. The Court therefore ORDERS a hearing in this matter for Tuesday, April 7, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. In order to comply with the Central District of Californias Continuity of Operations Plan and other public health guidance, the hearing shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. (kd)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS REPORT for April 1, 2020 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Marcus, Scott)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Status Report)(McLain, Byron)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: The Court has received information indicating the lack of sufficient sanitary facilities to meet the basic needs of the homeless community generally referred to as Skid Row. The Court, moreover, has personally observed these conditions. In this community, there are very few sanitation facilities available, and it appears that no new toilets or sanitation stations have been installed in this area since the advent of the COVID-19 health crisis. If left unchecked, it is likely that the coronavirus will both devastate the vulnerable homeless population and exacerbate the existing public health crisis more generally.Therefore, the Court hereby ORDERS a status report by Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles to address the timeline for the installation of fifty additional toilets and fifty additional sanitation stations in the Skid Row area. The Special Master has reported that a private-sector entity has reserved these needed toilets and sanitation stations, along with a commitment for their installation. All of the toilets and sanitation stations can be installed by Wednesday, April 8, 2020. Fifty of the toilets and twenty-five of the sanitation stations can be installed by Friday, April 3, 2020. However, the parties are invited to acquire and installfrom whatever source they deem appropriatethe needed units within the timeline outlined above.Defendants City of Los Angeles and County of Los Angeles shall file the ordered status report, whether separately or jointly, by 4:00 p.m. on April 1, 2020. The Special Master has been ordered to communicate with the parties regarding these issues. (kd)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STATUS REPORT as of March 26, 2020 filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Myers, Shayla)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Umhofer, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curae Venice Stakeholders Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Mark Ryavec, #2 Declaration Decl. of Jeffrey Lewis, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeffrey Lewis added to party Venice Stakeholders Association(pty:am)) (Lewis, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. After the Court conducted its initial hearing in this matter on March 19, 2020, the Central District of California issued its Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP), effective March 23, 2020. In order to comply with the COOP and other public health guidance, the parties have agreed to an acceptable off-site location for the March 26 status conference. The Status Conference will be held on March 26, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. In order to be prepared to address this issue at Thursdays status conference, the Court requests and encourages the Los Angeles Police Department and the Los Angeles County Sheriffs Office to continue their joint efforts to establish procedures to be implemented for law enforcement personnel involved in facilitating the placement of homeless persons in appropriate shelter facilities in the City of Los Angeles, contract cities, and the unincorporated areas of Los Angeles County. (kd)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Young, Brandon)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carol A Sobel counsel for Intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker. Filed by plaintiff Orange County Catholic Worker. (Sobel, Carol)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter. After the Court conducted its initial hearing in this matter on March 19, 2020, the Central District of California issued its Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP), effective March 23, 2020. In order to comply with the COOP and other public health guidance, the parties have agreed to an acceptable off-site location for the March 24settlement conference. The settlement conference shall be held at the Alexandria Ballrooms, 501 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013.The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (kd)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/19/2020 at 10:00 a.m. re Transcript #39 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dhs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/19/2020 at 10:100 a.m. ****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 4/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2020. (dhs)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brandon D Young counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Brandon D. Young as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Brandon D Young added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Young, Brandon)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Byron J McLain counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Byron J. McLain as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Byron J McLain added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(McLain, Byron)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: The Honorable James L. Smith (Ret.), various City Officials, Mayors, and Chiefs of Police are present to discuss homeless population of Los Angeles and other cities in the County of Los Angeles. The Court orders the transcript of the Status Conference held on March 19, 2020, be immediately produced at government expense and billed at the daily rate. The transcript shall be prepared forthwith and filed on the docket with immediate release to the public. The Court sets a further Status Conference for MARCH 24, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (kd)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER LIMITING NUMBER OF PEOPLE PERMITTED TO ATTEND EMERGENCY STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter, that the number of people permitted to attend the emergency status conference limited to 50 people and only to those who are necessary to determine and implement the mitigation measures. No more than four representatives from the press will be permitted to attend the emergency status conference and present in the courtroom so the public can be advised of what transpired at the emergency status conference. (see attached for further details) (pj).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STATUS REPORT filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker. (Sweetser, Catherine)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Report re Developments filed by Intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker (Sobel, Carol)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STATEMENT of in Response to LACAN and LACW's Ex Parte Application for Intervention and Appearance EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #25 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Umhofer, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #28 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #25 , Request for Judicial Notice, #26 , Status Report #30 , Notice of Withdrawal #27 , Order on Motion to Intervene #29 as to Defendant, County of Los Angeles served on March 18, 2020. (Umhofer, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS REPORT re: March 19, 2020 Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Umhofer, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #25 Intervenors' EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene AS Of Right. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST #27 . The Court is inclined to grant the request, and invites the parties to discuss the removal of Docket No. #24 at the March 19, 2020 hearing. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (twdb)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Withdrawal of Statement (Motion related) #24 filed by defendant City of Los Angeles. (Mariani, Jessica)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #25 filed by Intervenor Parties Cangress, Los Angeles Catholic Worker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Attorney Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser added to party Cangress(pty:intv), Attorney Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser added to party Los Angeles Catholic Worker(pty:intv))(Sweetser, Catherine)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene filed by Proposed Intervenors Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Cangress. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Shayla Renee Myers added to party Los Angeles Catholic Worker(pty:intv), Attorney Shayla Renee Myers added to party Cangress(pty:intv)) (Myers, Shayla)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STATEMENT of Defendant City of Los Angeles re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #16 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attorney Jessica Mariani added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Mariani, Jessica)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #15 , Order on Motion to Intervene #18 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Set/Reset Hearing, #12 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #16 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #17 Revised Proof of Personal Service on Defendant, City of Los Angeles served on March 17, 2020. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #15 , Order on Motion to Intervene #18 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Set/Reset Hearing, #12 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #16 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #17 Corrected Proof of Electronic Service on Defendant, County of Los Angeles served on March 17, 2020. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #15 , Order on Motion to Intervene #18 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Set/Reset Hearing, #12 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #16 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #17 as to personal service on Defendant, City of Los Angeles served on March 17, 2020. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Orange County Catholic Worker, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #15 , Order on Motion to Intervene #18 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Set/Reset Hearing, #12 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #16 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #17 as to Defendant, County of Los Angeles served on March 17, 2020. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Orange County Catholic Worker, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #15 , Order on Motion to Intervene #18 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Set/Reset Hearing, #12 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene #16 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #17 served on March 17, 2020. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #16 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and Appearance at the Conference set for 3/19/20. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SUPPLEMENTAL IN RE: STATUS CONFERENCE MARCH 19, 2020. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve this order on the Defendants. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene filed by intervenor Orange County Catholic Worker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Carol A Sobel added to party Orange County Catholic Worker(pty:intv)) (Sobel, Carol)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Charles Van Scoy, Harry Tashdjian, George Frem, Leandro Suarez, Joseph Burk, Gary Whitter, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Malow, upon Defendant County of Los Angeles served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon County of Los Angeles, Clerk of the Board in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Charles Van Scoy, Harry Tashdjian, George Frem, Leandro Suarez, Joseph Burk, Gary Whitter, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Malow, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon City of Los Angeles, City Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE MARCH 19, 2020. The Court orders Plaintiffs to show proof of service in this action by 12:00PM on Tuesday March 17, 2020. ( Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2020.) ( Status Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) The conference will occur at the FIRST STREET U.S. COURTHOUSE, 350 W 1st Street, Suite 4311, Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565, Courtroom Number 1. (twdb)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case-filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00246-DOC (KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-02291-DOC (KESx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (ts)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. Related Case(s): 18-cv-00155-DOC-JDE (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant County of Los Angeles. (ghap)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (ghap)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter, identifying LA Alliance for Human Rights, Joseph Burk, Harry Tashdjian, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Malow, Charles Van Scoy, George Frem, Gary Whitter, Leandro Suarez, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Burk, George Frem, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Leandro Suarez, Harry Tashdjian, Charles Van Scoy, Gary Whitter. (Mitchell, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25670317 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Charles Van Scoy, Harry Tashdjian, George Frem, Leandro Suarez, Joseph Burk, Gary Whitter, LA Alliance for Human Rights, Karyn Pinsky, Charles Malow. (Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Joseph Burk(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party George Frem(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party LA Alliance for Human Rights(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Charles Malow(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Karyn Pinsky(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Leandro Suarez(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Harry Tashdjian(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Charles Van Scoy(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Anne Mitchell added to party Gary Whitter(pty:pla))(Mitchell, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LA Alliance for Human Rights et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Van Scoy
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn Pinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA Alliance for Human Rights
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Malow
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Tashdjian
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Burk
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Whitter
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Frem
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leandro Suarez
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenzial Jarrell
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Donald Umhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 200, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Jessica Mariani
Represented By: Arlene Nancy Hoang
Represented By: Scott D Marcus
Represented By: Ryan Salsig
Represented By: Jason H. Tokoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Lauren M Black
Represented By: Brandon D Young
Represented By: Jennifer Mira Hashmall
Represented By: Louis R Miller
Represented By: Byron J McLain
Represented By: Amie S Park
Represented By: Ana Wai-Kwan Lai
Represented By: Emily A Rodriguez-Sanchirico
Represented By: Louis R. Miller
Represented By: Jason H. Tokoro
Represented By: Nadia Ann Sarkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 200 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: James L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Michele Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Hon James L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: James L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Venice Stakeholders Association
Represented By: Sean Christopher Rotstan
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Josue Tiguila
Represented By: Christian M Contreras
Represented By: Christian M. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Latino Coalition of Los Angeles
Represented By: Christian M Contreras
Represented By: Christian M. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cangress
Represented By: Shayla Renee Myers
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser
Represented By: Carol A Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Orange County Catholic Worker
Represented By: Brooke Alyson Weitzman
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser
Represented By: Paul L Hoffman
Represented By: William R Wise, Jr.
Represented By: Weston C Rowland
Represented By: Carol A Sobel
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Los Angeles Catholic Worker
Represented By: Shayla Renee Myers
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cangress doing business as Los Angeles Community Action Network (LA CAN)
Represented By: Shayla Renee Myers
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser
Represented By: Carol A Sobel
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Los Angeles Community Action Network
Represented By: Shayla Renee Myers
Represented By: Carol A Sobel
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Urban Offerings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Santee Village Homeowner's Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Central City Association of Los Angeles
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Theano Evangelis Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Committee for Safe Havens
Represented By: Mark S Ravis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Union Rescue Mission
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Center in Hollywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CORE-CA
Represented By: Mark S Ravis
Represented By: David H Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAACP - Compton Branch
Represented By: Mark S Ravis
Represented By: David H Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Skid Row Housing Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AIDS Healthcare Foundation
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Represented By: Jonathan M. Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAUL BORING
Represented By: Stephen Yagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Adrian D. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?