Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.146.41.71
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.146.41.71
Case Number: 2:2020cv02405
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven Charles Vondran on behalf of Defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.146.41.71 (Attorney Steven Charles Vondran added to party John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.146.41.71(pty:dft))(Vondran, Steven)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)Order Granting Plaintiffs Application for Leave to TakeEarly Discovery #10 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: For the foregoing reasons, the court GRANTS plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (See minutes for further details) (yl)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-02405 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25716620 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.146.41.71
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.146.41.71
Represented By: Steven Charles Vondran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?