Orlando Garcia v. G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Garcia and Orlando Garcia
Defendant: G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC, DOES 1-10 and Que Delicious Ice Cream
Case Number: 2:2020cv02489
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Que Delicious Ice Cream.(Collins, Marc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Que Delicious Ice Cream, (Collins, Marc)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Que Delicious Ice Cream.(Attorney Marc A Collins added to party Que Delicious Ice Cream(pty:dft))(Collins, Marc)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/21/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #11 served on 04/16/2020. (Tsai, Wilson)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #10 served on 04/16/2020. (Tsai, Wilson)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC, (Tsai, Wilson)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC.(Attorney Wilson Han Tsai added to party G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC(pty:dft))(Tsai, Wilson)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Que Delicious Ice Cream served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: RENE RODRIGUEZ in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC, Que Delicious Ice Cream. (lh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25744347 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Garcia v. G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.F.C. Atlantic Associates, LLC
Represented By: Wilson Han Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Que Delicious Ice Cream
Represented By: Marc A Collins
Represented By: Azim Khanmohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?