Music Sales Corporation v. Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Music Sales Corporation
Defendant: Universal Polygram International Publising, Inc., E.P.H.C.Y. Publishing, Does 1-10, STONES THROW LLC, a California limited liability company dba STONES THROW RECORDS and STONES THROW LLC, a California limited liability company dba STONES THROW RECORDS doing business as Stones Throw Records
Case Number: 2:2020cv02644
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Music Sales Corporation. upon E.P.H.C.Y. Publishing waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; STONES THROW LLC, a California limited liability company dba STONES THROW RECORDS waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Universal Polygram International Publising, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Frank P. Scibilia, Esq. of Pryor Cashman LLP. (Mankey, Caroline)
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued on the Amended Complaint #14 as to Defendant STONES THROW LLC, a California limited liability company dba STONES THROW RECORDS. (yl)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Plaintiff Music Sales Corporation. (Mankey, Caroline)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Music Sales Corporation(Mankey, Caroline)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Music Sales Corporation. (Mankey, Caroline)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Universal Polygram International Publising, Inc. (ghap)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant E.P.H.C.Y. Publishing. (ghap)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #2 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Summons Request. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MUSIC SALES CORPORATION, a New York corporation, (Mankey, Caroline)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST-FILED as SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff MUSIC SALES CORPORATION, a New York corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Mankey, Caroline) Modified on 3/23/2020 (ghap).
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST-FILED as SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff MUSIC SALES CORPORATION, a New York corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Mankey, Caroline) Modified on 3/23/2020 (ghap).
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25806042 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff MUSIC SALES CORPORATION, a New York corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Caroline H Mankey added to party MUSIC SALES CORPORATION, a New York corporation(pty:pla))(Mankey, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Music Sales Corporation v. Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music Sales Corporation
Represented By: Caroline H Mankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Polygram International Publising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.P.H.C.Y. Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STONES THROW LLC, a California limited liability company dba STONES THROW RECORDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STONES THROW LLC, a California limited liability company dba STONES THROW RECORDS doing business as Stones Throw Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?