Chloe Najafi v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Plaintiff: Chloe Najafi
Defendant: Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Case Number: 2:2020cv02880
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Deutsche Lufthansa AG identifying Lufthansa Group as Corporate Parent. (Cunningham, Scott)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Deutsche Lufthansa AG, identifying Corporate Parent Lufthansa Group. (Cunningham, Scott)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Deutsche Lufthansa AG.(Attorney Scott D Cunningham added to party Deutsche Lufthansa AG(pty:dft))(Cunningham, Scott)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Deutsche Lufthansa AG. (lh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chloe Najafi. (Moradian, Payam)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Chloe Najafi. (Moradian, Payam)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chloe Najafi, (Moradian, Payam)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25887881 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Chloe Najafi. (Attorney Payam Moradian added to party Chloe Najafi(pty:pla))(Moradian, Payam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chloe Najafi v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chloe Najafi
Represented By: Payam Moradian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Represented By: Scott D Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?