Darnell Henley v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darnell Henley
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC, Wal Mart Stores, Inc. and DOES 1 to 20
Case Number: 2:2020cv02902
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the May 11, 2020, scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: (Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2020. Discovery cut-off 8/12/2020. Motion cut-off 9/14/2020. Bench Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Meditation Status Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephan Choo in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Remand)(Choo, Stephan)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff failed to comply with Local Rule 6. For that reason, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT #13 previously scheduled for 05/04/2020 is CONTINUED to 5/28/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Evan A Blair counsel for Plaintiff Darnell Henley. Brendan A. Le is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Darnell Henley. (Blair, Evan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brendan A Le counsel for Plaintiff Darnell Henley. Brendan A. Le is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Darnell Henley. (Le, Brendan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brendan A Le counsel for Plaintiff Darnell Henley. Adding Evan A. Blair as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Darnell Henley. (Le, Brendan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Darnell Henley. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Le, Brendan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Darnell Henley. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Le, Brendan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT CONFERENCE REPORT of 26(f) filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Choo, Stephan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brendan A Le on behalf of Plaintiff Darnell Henley (Attorney Brendan A Le added to party Darnell Henley(pty:pla))(Le, Brendan)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: ORDER RE POTENTIAL MOTION TO REMAND by Judge George H. Wu. The Court orders plaintiff Darnell Henley to inform the Court by Friday, April 24, 2020, whether he has any plan to file a motion to remand in this action that would be subject to the 30-day time-period set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (mrgo)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/27/2020., Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (et)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (et)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc. filed in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/15/2020, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Darnell Henley in Los Angels Superior Court on 1/28/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES INC (Choo, Stephan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES INC, (Choo, Stephan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES INC. (Choo, Stephan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV02762 Receipt No: ACACDC-25887258 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephan Choo in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Stephan Choo, #11 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Stephan Choo added to party WAL-MART STORES INC(pty:dft))(Choo, Stephan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darnell Henley v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Henley
Represented By: Gene J Goldsman
Represented By: Brendan A Le
Represented By: Evan A Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC
Represented By: Stephan Choo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Stephan Choo
Represented By: N Kathleen Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?