Amador Contreras v. Armstrong Flooring, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amador Contreras
Defendant: Armstrong Flooring, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv03087
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
2 Judge: Steve Kim
3 Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) The Court GRANTS the motion for preliminary approval by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement. The Court PRELIMINARILY APPROVES the Settlement Agreement, APPOINTS Plaintiff as Class Representative and APPOINTS the Law Offices of Buchbaum & Haag, LLP as class counsel. The Court also APPOINTS Simplurius as the Settlement Administrator and APPROVES the proposed Class Notice. The final approval hearing is set for June 21, 2021. #35 (See document for further details)
November 6, 2020 Filing 35 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement and Memorandum of Point and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Land, Jolee)
September 8, 2020 Filing 34 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.: Mediation held on August 27, 2020 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Russell, Reed)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/30/2021. (wm)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (wm)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Opening Expert Witness Disclosure: 3/30/21, Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure: 4/27/21, Expert Discovery Cut-off: 5/18/21, Trial Estimate: 5 days. Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2020. Discovery cut-off 3/23/2021. Motions due by 4/6/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2021 02:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2021 09:00 AM. (wm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 30 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial premature to estimate-see explanation in Joint Rule 26(f) Report, filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc... (Land, Jolee)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel #26 : The Court hereby orders that the request of: Amador Contreras, to substitute Laurel N. Haag as attorney of record instead of Gary R. Carlin. the clerk is hereby ordered to terminate Notices of Electronic Filing for the withdrawing attorney(s) in this case. (bm)
May 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request For Approval Of Substitution Of Attorney #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests-Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (Carlin, Gary)
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Amador Contreras (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haag, Laurel)
April 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (wm)
April 20, 2020 Filing 24 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conformed Copy of Answer to Complaint)(Land, Jolee)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Pro Hace Vice Application #14 , #15 , for the following reasons: Other: Must use updated form on the Clerk's website dated 02/20. (bm)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Reed L Russell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., designating Kristen J. Nesbit as local counsel. (bm)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R Jefferson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., designating Kristen J. Nesbit as local counsel. (bm)
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., served on 4/13/2020. (Nesbit, Kristen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reed L. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/9/2020, Receipt No. 26031555) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nesbit, Kristen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R. Jefferson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/9/2020, Receipt No. 26031248) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nesbit, Kristen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R. Jefferson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. #14 ; APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reed L. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Other error(s) with document(s): See court's website for updated form - G-64. (lom)
April 9, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., served on 4/9/2020. (Nesbit, Kristen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 4/15/20. APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reed L. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26031555) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nesbit, Kristen) Modified on 4/16/2020 (bm).
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 4/15/20. APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R. Jefferson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26031248) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nesbit, Kristen) Modified on 4/16/2020 (bm).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-02627 PSG(SKx). Case transferred from Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-03087 PSG(SKx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R. Jefferson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Reed L. Russell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-02627-PSG (SKx) (C.D. Cal.), 20STCV06871 (Los Angeles Super. Ct.) (Land, Jolee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., (Land, Jolee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Land, Jolee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Lindsey A. Groft re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 in Support of Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Land, Jolee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jolee Land re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 in Support of Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court of Removal of Action)(Land, Jolee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Land, Jolee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV06871 Receipt No: ACACDC-25944688 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attorney Jolee Land added to party Armstrong Flooring, Inc.(pty:dft))(Land, Jolee)
April 2, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Armstrong Flooring, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A OF DECLARATION OF JOLEE LAND) (ghap)
April 2, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B OF DECLARATION OF JOLEE LAND)(ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amador Contreras v. Armstrong Flooring, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Jeannine Nesbit
Represented By: Jolee Land
Represented By: Reed L Russell
Represented By: Raquel R Jefferson
Represented By: Raquel R. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amador Contreras
Represented By: Brent S Buchsbaum
Represented By: Claudette Hernandez Villicana
Represented By: Gary R Carlin
Represented By: Laurel N Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?