Platino Records, Inc. et al v. Colonize Media, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Platino Records, Inc. and Antoine Music, Inc.
Defendant: Kevin Berger, Jose David Hernandez, Yellowcake, Inc. and Does 1-10
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Colonize Media, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Maria Mitchell
Counter Defendant: Alberto Mitchell
Case Number: 2:2020cv03159
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMANDWITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Maria Mitchell, Alberto Mitchell, COUNTERCLAIM against Alberto Mitchell filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Colonize Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Volume 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Volume 2)(Griffin, Thomas)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: DENYING #12 Non-Resident Attorney Seth L Berman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Kevin Berger, Colonize Media, Inc., Jose David Hernandez, Yellowcake, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26604833). Pursuant to L.R. 83-2.1.3.4; Local Counsel does not maintain office District. (jp)
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth L. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Kevin Berger, Colonize Media, Inc., Jose David Hernandez, Yellowcake, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26604833) filed by Defendants Kevin Berger, Colonize Media, Inc., Jose David Hernandez, Yellowcake, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney) (Attorney Thomas P Griffin, Jr added to party Kevin Berger(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Griffin, Jr added to party Colonize Media, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Griffin, Jr added to party Jose David Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Griffin, Jr added to party Yellowcake, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Griffin, Thomas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Platino Records, Inc., Antoine Music, Inc..(Zerner, Lawrence)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Kevin Berger, Colonize Media, Inc., Jose David Hernandez, Yellowcake, Inc. (esa)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael L Lovitz counsel for Plaintiffs Antoine Music, Inc., Platino Records, Inc.. Adding Michael L. Lovitz as counsel of record for Platino Records, Inc. and Antoine Music, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Platino Records, Inc. and Antoine Music, Inc.. (Attorney Michael L Lovitz added to party Antoine Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael L Lovitz added to party Platino Records, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lovitz, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Antoine Music, Inc., Platino Records, Inc.. (Zerner, Lawrence)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Antoine Music, Inc., Platino Records, Inc.. (Zerner, Lawrence)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antoine Music, Inc., Platino Records, Inc., identifying Platino Records, Inc.; Antoine Music, Inc.; Colonize Media, Inc.; Yellowcake, Inc.; Jose David Hernandez; Kevin Berger. (Zerner, Lawrence)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Antoine Music, Inc., Platino Records, Inc.. (Zerner, Lawrence)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25967942 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Platino Records, Inc., Antoine Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Attorney Lawrence J Zerner added to party Antoine Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lawrence J Zerner added to party Platino Records, Inc.(pty:pla))(Zerner, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platino Records, Inc. et al v. Colonize Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platino Records, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J Zerner
Represented By: Michael L Lovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Music, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J Zerner
Represented By: Michael L Lovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Colonize Media, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Griffin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Berger
Represented By: Thomas P Griffin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose David Hernandez
Represented By: Thomas P Griffin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowcake, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Griffin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Maria Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alberto Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?