DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv03268
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Athina Doria counsel for Plaintiff DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC. Adding Athina Doria as counsel of record for DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC. (Attorney Athina Doria added to party DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC(pty:pla))(Doria, Athina)
April 8, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael E Piston for Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
April 8, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
April 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:19-cv-01548-TNM, from U.S. District Court District of Columbia (Washington, DC). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-03268-DDP-KSx. (car)
April 8, 2020 Filing 19 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's #14 unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue is granted; and further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer the matter to the United States District Court for the Central District of California and shall close this case. SO ORDERED. See attached for further details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/24/2020. (lctnm3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC. (Piston, Michael) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 ERRATA by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #15 unopposed Motion for Extension. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to file an Answer or other responsive pleading shall be extended to 21 days following the Court's resolution of the Defendant's #14 Motion to Transfer Venue, or until other Court Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/6/2020. (lctnm3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES filed by DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC.(Piston, Michael) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 2/20/2020. (zhmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint in this action on or before February 20, 2020; that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to that amended complaint within 30 days of its filing; and that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(n), Defendant shall file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record within 30 days following service of the answer or simultaneously with the filing of any dispositive motion, whichever occurs first. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/14/2020. (lctnm3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 ERRATA re #10 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Hammond, Derek) Modified on 2/14/2020 to add docket link and correct docket text (eg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Chang, William) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Chang on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Chang, William) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2019, and every 60 days thereafter. (hmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Consent Motion to Stay. This matter is hereby STAYED until such time as the Defendant issues a decision on the Plaintiff's visa petition. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before October 14, 2019 and every 60 days thereafter while proceedings are stayed, but shall promptly notify the Court within seven days of the Defendant's visa decision. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/15/2019. (lctnm3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's proof of service due by 8/26/2019. (hmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed the Complaint in this action on May 26, 2019. As of the date of this Order, the public docket reflects that Plaintiff has yet to file proof of service of each Defendant. The Court directs Plaintiff's attention to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and Local Civil Rule 5.3. It is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than August 26, 2019, Plaintiff must either cause process to be served upon each Defendant and file proof of service with the Court or establish good cause for the failure to do so. Failure to make such filings will result in dismissal of this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/29/2019. (lctnm3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/29/2019. (lctnm3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]
May 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6146677) filed by DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Piston, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/28/2019) (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRO SYSTEMS LLC
Represented By: Athina Doria
Represented By: Michael E Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: William Chang
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Represented By: Chung Hae Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?