David Rumrill et al v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd et al
Plaintiff: David Rumrill and Donna Rumrill
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd and Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03317
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The stipulation #18 is granted. Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.'s deadline to file their responses to the Complaints in the cases listed is ordered moved to 6/30/2020. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs David Rumrill, Donna Rumrill. upon Princess Cruise Lines Ltd waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/7/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Edgar R. Nield. (Simmrin, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd, identifying Carnival Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nield, Edgar)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd(pty:dft))(DeSantis-Nield, Gabrielle)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #5 Non-Resident Attorney Debi F Chalik APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Rumrill and Donna Rumrill, designating Michael A Simmrin as local counsel. (et)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-02267 RGK (SKx) (esa)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (ghap)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Debi F. Chalik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Rumrill, Donna Rumrill (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26028129) filed by Plaintiffs David Rumrill, Donna Rumrill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to appear in a specific case Pro Hac Vice) (Simmrin, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs David Rumrill, Donna Rumrill, (Simmrin, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs David Rumrill, Donna Rumrill. (Simmrin, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs David Rumrill, Donna Rumrill. (Simmrin, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26027659 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs David Rumrill, Donna Rumrill. (Attorney Michael A Simmrin added to party David Rumrill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Simmrin added to party Donna Rumrill(pty:pla))(Simmrin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Rumrill et al v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rumrill
Represented By: Michael A Simmrin
Represented By: Debi F Chalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Rumrill
Represented By: Michael A Simmrin
Represented By: Debi F Chalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Edgar R Nield
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Represented By: Rafaela Patricia Castells
Represented By: Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?