Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC v. Bingemans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets, Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC and Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as See Tickets
Defendant: Bingemans, Inc., ICC Global Property Development, Inc. d/b/a Beyond Oz Productions, Inc., ICC Global Property Development, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive and ICC Global Property Development, Inc. an Ontario corporation doing business as Beyond OZ Productions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03392
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Bingemans, Inc. #16 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant ICC Global Property Development, Inc. #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The Clerk does not have the authority to enter default against a foreign entity. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. (bm)
June 4, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant ICC Global Property Development, Inc. filed by plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC. (Akley, Benjamin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Bingemans, Inc. filed by plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC. (Akley, Benjamin)
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #12 (Akley, Benjamin)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC, upon Defendant ICC Global Property Development, Inc. served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Petricca, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akley, Benjamin)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura Torchia, HR Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. Corrected (Akley, Benjamin)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC, upon Defendant Bingemans, Inc. served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Petricca, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akley, Benjamin)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-03392 PSG (GJSx). (esa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant ICC Global Property Development, Inc. (esa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bingemans, Inc. (esa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets. (Akley, Benjamin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets. (Akley, Benjamin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets. (Akley, Benjamin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets, identifying Vivendi Holding I LLC; Vivendi SA. (Akley, Benjamin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26051661 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets. (Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets(pty:pla))(Akley, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC v. Bingemans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingemans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICC Global Property Development, Inc. d/b/a Beyond Oz Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICC Global Property Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICC Global Property Development, Inc. an Ontario corporation doing business as Beyond OZ Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC d/b/a See Tickets
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Represented By: Thomas H Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as See Tickets
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Represented By: Thomas H Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?