Byrd International, Inc. v. Preferred Freezer Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Byrd International, Inc.
Defendant: California Cartage Distribution, LLC, Preferred Freezer Logistics, LLC, Does 1-20, inclusive and NFI, LP dba California Cartage Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv03429
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 Receipt is acknowledged of documents by Los Angeles County Superior Court, case no. 20STCV07990. (lom)
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 20STCV07990. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF PROCEDURAL DEFECTS filed by Plaintiff Byrd International, Inc.. (Ou, Chih)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Crossclaim #5 as to cross-defendant Preferred Freezer Logistics, LLC. (mrgo)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court therefore concludes that the Notice of Removal is procedurally defective. See 28 U.S.C. 1446(a); Prize Frize, 167 F.3d at 1266. Accordingly, this action is remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV07990, for failure to comply with the removal requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1446. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Court stays this order until April 22, 2020. If Plaintiff wishes to waive the procedural defect and, as a result, remain in federal court, it must file a Notice of Waiver of Procedural Defects no later than April 22, 2020. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Crossclaim #5 filed by crossclaimant California Cartage Distribution, LLC. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
April 13, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the incorrect name of NFI, LP dba California Cartage Company and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be California Cartage Distribution, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Byrd International, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
April 13, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants California Cartage Distribution, LLC, Does, Preferred Freezer Logistics, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Byrd International, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Crossclaim #5 filed by crossclaimant California Cartage Distribution, LLC. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 CROSSCLAIM against crossdefendant Preferred Freezer Logistics, LLC, filed by crossclaimant California Cartage Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant California Cartage Distribution, LLC, identifying none. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant California Cartage Distribution, LLC. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant California Cartage Distribution, LLC.(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV07990 Receipt No: ACACDC-26067953 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant California Cartage Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Amendment to Complaint, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. A to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. B to Declaration) (Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party California Cartage Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd International, Inc. v. Preferred Freezer Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Cartage Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Freezer Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFI, LP dba California Cartage Company
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byrd International, Inc.
Represented By: Chih Yu Ou
Represented By: G Geoffrey Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?