International Medical Devices, Inc. et al v. Robert Cornell et al
Plaintiff: Menova International, Inc., International Medical Devices, Inc. and James Elist
Defendant: Jonathan Clavell, Clavell Urology, PLLC, Augmenta, LLC, Robert Cornell, Robert J. Conrell and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Petitioner: MD James Elist
Respondent: Cornell J. Robert
Case Number: 2:2020cv03503
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Augmenta, LLC, Jonathan Clavell, Clavell Urology, PLLC, Robert J. Conrell, Robert Cornell, identifying Richard Finger and Hans A. Mische. (Mayer, Heather)
May 29, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Augmenta, LLC, Jonathan Clavell, Clavell Urology, PLLC, Robert J. Conrell, Robert Cornell.(Mayer, Heather)
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robert J. Conrell answer now due 5/29/2020; Clavell Urology, PLLC answer now due 5/29/2020; Robert Cornell answer now due 5/29/2020; Jonathan Clavell answer now due 5/29/2020; Augmenta, LLC answer now due 5/29/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants (also on behalf of Plaintiffs by their counsel's permission, LR 5-4.3.4(a)(2)(i)) Robert J. Conrell; Clavell Urology, PLLC; Robert Cornell; Jonathan Clavell; Augmenta, LLC.(Attorney Heather Lynn Mayer added to party Augmenta, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Lynn Mayer added to party Jonathan Clavell(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Lynn Mayer added to party Clavell Urology, PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Lynn Mayer added to party Robert J. Conrell(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Lynn Mayer added to party Robert Cornell(pty:dft))(Mayer, Heather)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
April 27, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs James Elist, International Medical Devices, Inc., re Notice (Other) #18 served on Notice of Filing Forms AO120 for Patents, AO120 for Trademarks and AO121. (Meister, Melissa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by James Elist, International Medical Devices, Inc.. (Meister, Melissa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by James Elist, International Medical Devices, Inc.. (Meister, Melissa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by James Elist, International Medical Devices, Inc.. (Meister, Melissa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs James Elist, International Medical Devices, Inc.. Notice of Filing Forms AO120 for Patents, AO120 for Trademarks and AO121 (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist, upon Defendant Jonathan Clavell served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jonathan Clavell, M.D., an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist, upon Defendant Robert Cornell served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Cornell, M.D., an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist, upon Defendant Clavell Urology, PLLC served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Clavell Urology, PLLC, a professional limited liability corporation organized under the laws of Texas in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist, upon Defendant Robert J. Conrell served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert J. Cornel, M.D., P.A., a professional association organized under the laws of Texas in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist, upon Defendant Augmenta, LLC served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Augmenta, LLC, a corporation organized under the laws of Delaware in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist. as to Robert Cornell. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist. as to Robert J. Conrell. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist. as to Jonathan Clavell. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist. as to Clavell Urology, PLLC. (Meister, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist. as to Augmenta, LLC. (Meister, Melissa)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Summons is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Augmenta, LLC, Jonathan Clavell, Clavell Urology, PLLC, Robert J. Conrell, Robert Cornell. (ghap)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs James Elist, International Medical Devices, Inc., Menova International, Inc.. (Baker, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants James Elist, International Medical Devices, Inc., Menova International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Baker, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26101599 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Menova International, Inc., International Medical Devices, Inc., James Elist. (Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party James Elist(pty:bkmov), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party International Medical Devices, Inc. (pty:bkmov), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party Menova International, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Baker, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Medical Devices, Inc. et al v. Robert Cornell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Clavell
Represented By: Heather Lynn Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clavell Urology, PLLC
Represented By: Heather Lynn Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augmenta, LLC
Represented By: Heather Lynn Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cornell
Represented By: Heather Lynn Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Conrell
Represented By: Heather Lynn Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menova International, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan G Baker
Represented By: Melissa A Meister
Represented By: Emily Rebecca Megan Stierwalt
Represented By: May Yuen Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Medical Devices, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan G Baker
Represented By: Melissa A Meister
Represented By: Emily Rebecca Megan Stierwalt
Represented By: May Yuen Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Elist
Represented By: Melissa A Meister
Represented By: Ryan G Baker
Represented By: Emily Rebecca Megan Stierwalt
Represented By: May Yuen Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cornell J. Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MD James Elist
Represented By: Ryan G Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?