Ana P. Gomez v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ana P. Gomez
Defendant: FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv03549
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 22 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, East District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, East District. (gk)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #12 is GRANTED. The case is hereby REMANDED to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 19PSCV00400. See document for further details. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Los Angeles County Superior Court #12 presently scheduled for hearing on June 12, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.. (Yasuzawa, Brian)
June 2, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Julian A. Moore In Suppot Of Plaintiff's Meet And Confer Efforts In Advance Of Rule 26 filed by Plaintiff Ana P. Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Moore, Julian)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 4/20/2020, the Court set a Scheduling Conference #9 . As required by the Court's 4/20/2020 Order, Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), and Local Rule 26-1, counsel are required to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. To date, a Joint Rule 26(f) Report has not been filed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause in writing no later than 6/5/2020, why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to cooperate and participate with opposing counsel in a Rule 26(f) conference and for failure to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. The filing of a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by the deadline will be deemed a satisfactory response. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action for lack of prosecution. The scheduling conference on 6/12/2020 is hereby VACATED and will be rescheduled if necessary. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Ana P. Gomez. (Moore, Julian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Yasuzawa, Brian)
May 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1, Plaintiff's motion to remand to Los Angeles County Superior Court #12 is hereby continued from May 29, 2020 to June 12, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Further, the scheduling conference #19 is continued from June 5, 2020 to June 12, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Ana P. Gomez. Motion set for hearing on 5/29/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand To State Court, #2 Declaration of Julian A. Moore In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand To State Court, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Remand To State Court, #6 Proof of Service) (Moore, Julian)
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ana P. Gomez, identifying FCA US LLC. (Moore, Julian)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julian Alexander Moore counsel for Plaintiff Ana P. Gomez. Adding Julian Alexander Moore as counsel of record for Ana P. Gomez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ana P. Gomez. (Attorney Julian Alexander Moore added to party Ana P. Gomez(pty:pla))(Moore, Julian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/22/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/31/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ana P. Gomez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Takeya Yasuzawa counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. Adding Samantha Brignoni as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Yasuzawa, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Takeya Yasuzawa counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. Adding Brian Yasuzawa as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Yasuzawa, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, (Yasuzawa, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Yasuzawa, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19PSCV00400 Receipt No: ACACDC-26117014 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Yasuzawa in Support of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Brian Takeya Yasuzawa added to party FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:dft))(Yasuzawa, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ana P. Gomez v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By: Brian Takeya Yasuzawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Brian Takeya Yasuzawa
Represented By: Samantha Brignoni
Represented By: Barry R Schirm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana P. Gomez
Represented By: Benjeman R Beck
Represented By: Jessica F Anvar
Represented By: Julian Alexander Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?