Slauson Gas Station, LLC v. Symetra Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Slauson Gas Station, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Symetra Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv03695
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Slauson Gas Station, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (McCreary, Duncan)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RE FORECLOSURE OF REAL PROPERTY #8 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Application is DENIED without prejudice to filing a regularly noticed motion seeking this relief with evidence in support of the asserted cure. Accordingly, Slauson Gas shall include evidence of its alleged cure of the debt in its forthcoming motion. Finally, with respect to Symetra's request for sanctions, the Court reserves ruling on this issue until it can review the parties' filings in connection with Slauson Gas's forthcoming motion. See minute order for details. (lom)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Foreclosure of Real Property . Motion #8 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition of Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin Foreclosure Proceedins; Request for Sanctions filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Stern, Heather)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 Opposition in Opposition re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Foreclosure of Real Property . Motion #8 filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Whitney Holody ISO Ex Parte Opposition, #2 Declaration Declaration of Heather Stern ISO Ex Parte Opposition)(Stern, Heather)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Foreclosure of Real Property . Motion filed by Plaintiff Slauson Gas Station, LLC. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 5/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (McCreary, Duncan)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted #6 filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Stern, Heather)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Stern, Heather)
April 22, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Symetra Life Insurance Company amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Slauson Gas Station, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/21/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
April 22, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Symetra Life Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Slauson Gas Station, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/23/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company, identifying Slauson Gas Station LLC, Plaintiff; Hooman Nissani, On information and belief, a member of Plaintiff; Ebrahim Neyssani, On information and belief, a member of Plaintiff; David Yashar, On information and belief, a member of Plaintiff; Symetra Life Insurance Company, Defendant; Symetra Financial Corporation, Parent company to Defendant. (Stern, Heather)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Stern, Heather)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV11577 Receipt No: ACACDC-26182695 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Heather Elizabeth Stern added to party Symetra Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Stern, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slauson Gas Station, LLC v. Symetra Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Stern
Represented By: John M Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slauson Gas Station, LLC
Represented By: Duncan James McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?