Mauro Pet Care, LLC v. Natural Dog Acquisition, LLC
Plaintiff: Mauro Pet Care, LLC
Defendant: Natural Dog Acquisition, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03698
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Mauro Pet Care, LLC. upon Natural Dog Acquisition, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by J. Mark Wilson. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Mauro Pet Care, LLC. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Sheik, Shahrokh)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties - under Category - NOTICES. Other error(s) with document(s): (2) Notice (other) event utilized in docketing this filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Mauro Pet Care, LLC. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Mauro Pet Care, LLC. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Natural Dog Acquisition, LLC. (esa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mauro Pet Care, LLC. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mauro Pet Care, LLC. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26183293 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Mauro Pet Care, LLC. (Attorney Shahrokh Sheik added to party Mauro Pet Care, LLC(pty:pla))(Sheik, Shahrokh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauro Pet Care, LLC v. Natural Dog Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Pet Care, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Lipstone
Represented By: Charanjit Singh
Represented By: Shahrokh Sheik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Dog Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?