Long Beach Memorial Medical Center v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union
Petitioner: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center
Respondent: United Steel, Paper & Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial & Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union
Case Number: 2:2020cv03799
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Counsel are notified that the briefing schedule for the Petition to Vacate Arbitration, #1 is set as follows: Reply shall be due on or before July 13, 2020; and Petition to Vacate Arbitration hearing is set for July 27, 2020 at 10:00 AM. (shb) Modified on 6/17/2020 (shb).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Dianne Kanish re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 and (Exhibits A-G) filed by Counter Claimant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union, Respondent United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union. (Young, Joshua)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition Re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Young, Joshua)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Long Beach Memorial Medical Center filed by Respondent United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union.(Young, Joshua)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Antonia Domingo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26659906) filed by Respondent United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Young, Joshua)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition filed by Respondent United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union.(Young, Joshua)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua F Young on behalf of Respondent United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union (Attorney Joshua F Young added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union(pty:res))(Young, Joshua)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, upon Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Ron Espinoza, USW Sub District Director. (Abrahms, Adam)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union. (lh)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Request #5 served on 4/24/2020. (Abrahms, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. (Abrahms, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Petitioner Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. (Abrahms, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, identifying Long Beach Memorial Medical Center; Memorial Health Services (Petitioner's Parent Company); Daniel Navarro; United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber and Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union; United Steelworkers, Local 2801. (Abrahms, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. (Abrahms, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Receipt No: ACACDC-26223336 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina C Rentz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Attorney Adam C Abrahms added to party Long Beach Memorial Medical Center(pty:pet))(Abrahms, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United Steel, Paper & Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial & Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Insustrial and Service Workers International Union
Represented By: Joshua F Young
Represented By: Jay Edward Smith
Represented By: Antonia Domingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Adam C Abrahms
Represented By: Christina C Rentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?