Gary Anderson et al v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Gary Anderson, Judy Anderson and Wayne Anderson
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv03832
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE #23 by Judge John F. Walter. The parties hereby stipulate that this action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
May 27, 2020 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Stipulation and Tolling Agreement filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Romano, Julia)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENIED RE STIPULATION STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF APPEAL IN RELATED STATE-COURT ACTION #20 by Judge John F. Walter. (lom)
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Related Appeal in State Court filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romano, Julia)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO REPLACE EXHIBITS TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #18 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST to CORRECT Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Replace Exhibits with Redacted Copy filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - M, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order to Replace Exhibits to Notice of Removal) (Fukuoka, Nicole)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Notice to State Court Clerk and Adverse Parties of Removal of Entire Action to Federal Court filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Stuart J. Purdy Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Gary Anderson, Judy Anderson, Wayne Anderson. (Purdy, Stuart)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Alexander G. Calfo , Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Calfo, Alexander)
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiffs Gary Anderson, Judy Anderson, Wayne Anderson. (Purdy, Stuart)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE Notice of Notice of Assignment to United States Judges filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE Notice of Order Setting Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Notice of Standing Order filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for June 8, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before May 22, 2020. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. See minute order for details. (lom)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
April 27, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson, in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/23/2020, attached as Exhibit G. (jtil)
April 27, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Judy Anderson, Gary Anderson, and Wayne Anderson in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/20/2020, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. identifying Johnson and Johnson as Corporate Parent. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., identifying Johnson and Johnson. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV11135 Receipt No: ACACDC-26238677 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nicole R. Fukuoka in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A through M to Fukuoka Declaration) (Attorney Nicole R Fukuoka added to party Johnson and Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole R Fukuoka added to party Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fukuoka, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Anderson et al v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole R Fukuoka
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Nicole R Fukuoka
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Anderson
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Anderson
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Anderson
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?