Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. et al v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. and Moriah Films
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies/Federal Insurance Company, Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2020cv03890
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #32 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar, including Defendants Motion to Dismiss #29 . The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
June 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFFS Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. Dismissal is WITHOUT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company, identifying Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Chubb Limited. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) #29 filed by Defendant Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) filed by Defendant Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Scott Shearer, #3 Exhibit A to Shearer Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company(pty:dft)) (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc., [SERVICE OF DOCS 13-27 ON REGISTERED AGENT FOR DEFENDANT CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES/FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on May 19, 2020. (Russ, Larry)
May 15, 2020 Filing 27 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc... (Russ, Larry)
May 5, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc., Moriah Films, upon Defendant Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company served on 5/1/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ALBERT DAMONTE, CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Russ, Larry)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KEVIN R. SLOAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc to Appear Pro Hac Vice designating Larry C. Russ as local counsel #23 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KEVIN R. SLOAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/1/2020, Receipt No. 26307996) #20 , for the following reasons: Review and comply with discrepancy issued on docket no. 22. (lc)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KEVIN R. SLOAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/1/2020, Receipt No. 26307996) filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Russ, Larry)
May 4, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KEVIN R. SLOAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/1/2020, Receipt No. 26307996) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): LA missing. (Thrasher, Lupe)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE TO CHANGE LEAD COUNSEL FROM NATHAN D. MEYER TO LARRY C. RUSS filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Russ, Larry)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 (STRICKEN PER 5/4/2020 ORDER DOCKET NO. 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KEVIN R. SLOAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/1/2020, Receipt No. 26307996) filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Russ, Larry) Modified on 5/5/2020 (lc).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney JENNIFER PEREZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc and designating Larry C. Russ as local counsel #16 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney JOHN W. HOUGHTALING, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. and designating Larry C. Russ as local counsel #14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KEVIN R. SLOAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26307996) #15 , for the following reasons: Failure to complete Application: failure to attach Certificate of Good Standing for all states admitted. (lc)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney JENNIFER PEREZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26308247) filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Russ, Larry)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 (STRICKEN PER 5/4/2020 ORDER DOCKET NO. 17). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KEVIN R. SLOAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26307996) filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Russ, Larry) Modified on 5/4/2020 (lc).
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney JOHN W. HOUGHTALING, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26307725) filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Russ, Larry)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Perez. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin R. Sloan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John W. Houghtaling, II. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company. (lh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Meyer, Nathan)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. (Meyer, Nathan)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc., (Meyer, Nathan)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Moriah Films, Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26262879 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc., Moriah Films. (Attorney Nathan Meyer added to party Moriah Films(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Meyer added to party Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.(pty:pla))(Meyer, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc. et al v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Wiesenthal Center, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Meyer
Represented By: Justin Eric Maio
Represented By: Jennifer Perez
Represented By: Larry C Russ
Represented By: John William Houghtaling, II
Represented By: Kevin R Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moriah Films
Represented By: Nathan Meyer
Represented By: Justin Eric Maio
Represented By: Jennifer Perez
Represented By: Larry C Russ
Represented By: John William Houghtaling, II
Represented By: Kevin R Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies/Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Represented By: Zoheb Noorani
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?