Dilcia Arias v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Dilcia Arias
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, Does 1-20 inclusive and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04024
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 9/14/2020. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 2/5/2021. Last Day to Hear Motions 3/8/2021. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 4/19/2021. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 5/10/2021 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 7 Days) set for 6/1/2021 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/22/2021. (iv)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP), the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 06/29/2020 at 11:00am. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report #8 and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. The Application #9 by Plaintiff's counsel to appear telephonically for the Scheduling Conference is DENIED as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Make Telephonic Appearance filed by Plaintiff Dilcia Arias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Heather Kathleen Cox added to party Dilcia Arias(pty:pla)) (Cox, Heather)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rudman, Jamie)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for June 29, 2020 at 11:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jamie Rudman re: Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action To Federal Court)(Rudman, Jamie)
May 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/28/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 4)(ghap)
May 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20 inclusive, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Dilcia Arias. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/30/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Rudman, Jamie)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Rudman, Jamie)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20SMCV00504 Receipt No: ACACDC-26302287 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Attorney Jamie Rudman added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,(pty:dft))(Rudman, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilcia Arias v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Represented By: Jamie Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jasmine S Horton
Represented By: Jamie Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilcia Arias
Represented By: Heather Kathleen Cox
Represented By: Gregory P Wong
Represented By: John F Litwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?