Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. et al v. Centene Corporation et al
Plaintiff: DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc. and Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.
Defendant: CENTENE CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation, ILEANA HERNANDEZ, MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC., a Delaware corporation, LIANN GOHARI, OPTUM SERVICES, INC., a Delaware corporation, KENNETH B. JULIAN, MICHAEL NEIDORFF, JOHN M. LEBLANC, Centene Corporation, Optum Services, Inc., Health Net Life Insurance Company and Managed Health Network, Inc.
Claimant: Last Chance Funding Inc. and Florentine Holding Company V, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04112
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
2 Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 3/5/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/26/2021. (vcr)
January 26, 2021 Filing 78 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court VACATES the Hearings set for 01/29/2021 in regards to the the MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 51) and the MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 56). If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 22, 2021 Filing 77 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney A. Louis Dorny counsel for Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. Adding A. Louis Dorny as counsel of record for Defendant Optum Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Attorney A. Louis Dorny added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dorny, A.)
December 9, 2020 Filing 76 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court takes the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc. (Dkt. No. 49) off the Court's calendar as moot. Said motion was refiled at Dkt. No. 56. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2020 Filing 75 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 , Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET D #56 . The Court continues the hearing on said Motions set for hearing on 12/11/20 to Friday, 1/29/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2020 Filing 74 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 , Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET D #56 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #49 . The Court reschedules the time of the hearing on said Motions set for hearing on 12/11/2020 from 8:30 AM to 10:30 AM to be heard remotely before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 27, 2020 Filing 73 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Ciganek Letter)(Cady, Steven)
November 27, 2020 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Optum Services, Inc., re Reply (Motion related) #71 served on 11/27/2020. (Maschler, Brian)
November 27, 2020 Filing 71 REPLY DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Maschler, Brian)
November 25, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed 11/13/2020 #63 , #64 . The two documents are stricken. (gk)
November 19, 2020 Filing 69 OPPOSITION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET D #56 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #49 Corrected Response to Optum's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Dawson, Sander)
November 19, 2020 Filing 68 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 Corrected Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Dawson, Sander)
November 19, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. correcting Errata, #65 Corrected Responses in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss (65-1, 65-2) (Dawson, Sander)
November 17, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response in Opposition to Motion #63 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #64 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion #63 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #64 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (Corrected Document), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Corrected Document))(Dawson, Sander)
November 13, 2020 Filing 64 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS ON 11/25/2020, SEE DOCKET NO. 70] OPPOSITION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET D #56 filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Dawson, Sander) Modified on 11/25/2020 (gk).
November 13, 2020 Filing 63 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS ON 11/25/2020, SEE DOCKET NO. 70] OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Dawson, Sander) Modified on 11/25/2020 (gk).
November 6, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Claimant Florentine Holding Company V, LLC. (Patterson, Charles)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., re Stipulation #60 : The Court has considered the parties' Stipulation Regarding Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. The hearing date and briefing schedule on Defendants' motions to dismiss is revised as requested by the parties as follows: 1. The hearing on Defendants motions to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint will be continued from November 20, 2020 to December 11, 2020 at 8:30 am; 2. Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss is continued from October 30, 2020 to November 13, 2020; and 3. Defendants' deadlines to file their reply brief will be continued from November 6, 2020 to November 27, 2020. (bm)
October 21, 2020 Filing 60 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 , Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET D #56 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dawson, Sander)
October 14, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Rule 12(b)(6)))(Weil, Alan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #57 , Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET D #56 served on 10/14/2020. (Maschler, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 57 DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE AND INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., (Maschler, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 56 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #49 DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc. Optum Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Maschler, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof #51 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #49 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 8, 2020 Filing 52 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Local Rule 7.1-1) of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, (Weil, Alan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice) (Weil, Alan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #49 served on 10/8/20. (Maschler, Brian)
October 8, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; JOINDER IN THE HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT OPTUM SERVICES, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) (Maschler, Brian)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-098) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the creation of the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases are hereby transferred from the calendar of Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04112 SB (PVCx). (esa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 47 CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, Optum Services, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #46 , Amended Complaint/Petition,, #43 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(Kantor, Lisa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 46 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, Optum Services, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #43 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(Kantor, Lisa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Defendants Response #44 . Plaintiff will file a Second Amended Complaint on 9/17/2020. Defendant will file their response on 10/8/2020. (jp)
September 2, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff.(Weil, Alan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 43 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, Optum Services, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(Kantor, Lisa)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response. Plaintiff will file First Amended Complaint on 8/31/2020. Defendants will file their responses to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on 9/3/2020 #41 . (et)
August 3, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff.(Weil, Alan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nary Kim counsel for Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. Adding Nary Kim as counsel of record for Centene Corporation, Michael Neidorff, Health Net Life Insurance Co., Managed Health Network, Inc., and Liann Gohari for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Michael Neidorff, Health Net Life Insurance Co., Managed Health Network, Inc., and Liann Gohari. (Attorney Nary Kim added to party Centene Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Nary Kim added to party Liann Gohari(pty:dft), Attorney Nary Kim added to party Health Net Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Nary Kim added to party Managed Health Network, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nary Kim added to party Michael Neidorff(pty:dft))(Kim, Nary)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #37 Non-Resident Attorney Anita Rosenthal APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., designating Lisa S Kantor as local counsel. (jp)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #36 Non-Resident Attorney Steven C Dawson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., designating Lisa S Kantor as local counsel. (jp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 37 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anita Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/14/2020, Receipt No. 27204258) filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kantor, Lisa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 36 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven C. Dawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/14/2020, Receipt No. 27203862) filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kantor, Lisa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven C. Dawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. #32 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anita Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. #33 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 7/23/2020. Local counsel does not maintain "an office within the District for the practice of law, in which the attorney is physically present on a regular basis to conduct business. (et)
July 14, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven C. Dawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/14/2020, Receipt No. 27203862) #32 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anita Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27204258) #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 14, 2020 Filing 33 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 7/16/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 35 ]-First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anita Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27204258) filed by Plaintiff's counsel Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dawson, Sander) Modified on 7/16/2020 (et).
July 14, 2020 Filing 32 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 7/16/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 35 ] - First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven C. Dawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/14/2020, Receipt No. 27203862) filed by Plaintiff's counsel Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dawson, Sander) Modified on 7/16/2020 (et).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Steven M Cady APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, designating Alan J Weil as local counsel. (jp)
July 8, 2020 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Cady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-27116250) filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specif Case Pro Hac Vice) (Weil, Alan)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response #28 . Plaintiffs will file a First Amended Complaint on 8/3/2020. See Order for specifics. (jp)
July 6, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Reschedule Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alan Jay Weil added to party Centene Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Jay Weil added to party Liann Gohari(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Jay Weil added to party Health Net Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Jay Weil added to party Managed Health Network, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Jay Weil added to party Michael Neidorff(pty:dft))(Weil, Alan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon Michael Neidorff waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon Managed Health Network, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon John M. Leblanc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon Kenneth B. Julian waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon Ileana Hernandez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon Health Net Life Insurance Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon Liann Gohari waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. upon Centene Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Steven M. Cady. (Kantor, Lisa)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulation re Extension of Time for Defendant OPTUM Services, Inc., to Respond to Complaint to 7/5/2020 #18 . (jp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 5, 2020 filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maschler, Brian)
May 28, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian P Maschler counsel for Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. Adding Brian P. Maschler as counsel of record for Optum Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Attorney Brian P Maschler added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Maschler, Brian)
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Claimant Last Chance Funding Inc.. (Smith, Jennifer)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #13 Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer served on 05/20/2020. (Kantor, Lisa)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., upon Defendant Optum Services, Inc. served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Calledano - CT Corporation - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Lisa)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04112 DSF(PVCx). (rn)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-09360 FMO(DFMx) (rn)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Notice of Related Case filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. (Craig, Christopher)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Anita Rosenthal. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven C. Dawson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Ileana Hernandez, Kenneth B. Julian, John M. Leblanc, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, Optum Services, Inc. (lh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation, (Kantor, Lisa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Kantor, Lisa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Kantor, Lisa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 05/05/2020, receipt number 26339743), filed by Plaintiffs SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla))(Kantor, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. et al v. Centene Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTENE CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILEANA HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIANN GOHARI
Represented By: Alan Jay Weil
Represented By: Steven M Cady
Represented By: Nary Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM SERVICES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH B. JULIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL NEIDORFF
Represented By: Alan Jay Weil
Represented By: Steven M Cady
Represented By: Nary Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN M. LEBLANC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Alan Jay Weil
Represented By: Steven M Cady
Represented By: Nary Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P Maschler
Represented By: A. Louis Dorny
Represented By: Jordan S. Altura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan Jay Weil
Represented By: Steven M Cady
Represented By: Nary Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managed Health Network, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Jay Weil
Represented By: Steven M Cady
Represented By: Nary Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc..
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shreya Health of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeona Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satya Health of California, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vedanta Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Sander Dawson
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Steven C. Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Last Chance Funding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Florentine Holding Company V, LLC
Represented By: Gregory E Robinson
Represented By: Charles Russell Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?