United States of America v. Seven Assorted Luxury Sport Utility Vehicles
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: SEVEN ASSORTED LUXURY SPORT UTILITY VEHICLES
Case Number: 2:2020cv04136
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 05/18/2020 and 05/19/2020 upon Defendant Seven Assorted Luxury Sport Utility Vehicles last date of publication 6/16/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Publication was made in the official government website: www.forfeiture.gov. (Boyle, Daniel)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPOINTING UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #10 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (bm)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian U.S. Customs and Border Protection in place of U.S. Marshals filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for subtitute custodian) (Boyle, Daniel)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 WARRANT for seizure of Seven Assorted Luxury Sport Utility Vehicles issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (car)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Memo re Magistrate Judge Conflict filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Boyle, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 05/06/2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Boyle, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Daniel G Boyle added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Boyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Seven Assorted Luxury Sport Utility Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVEN ASSORTED LUXURY SPORT UTILITY VEHICLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel G Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?