Quenia Peris et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Quenia Peris
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA, Aldon, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Aldon, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Carson Toyota
Petitioner: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv04151
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 5/14/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/25/2021 at 8:30 AM. [SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES.] (et)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on June 29, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 11, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 15, 2021. (et)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Quenia Peris.. (Bolz, Jacob)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jacob A Bolz on behalf of Plaintiff Quenia Peris (Bolz, Jacob)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for June 29, 2020 at 1:15 PM. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 1, 2020. (et)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 20, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car)
May 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Aldon, Inc. Filed in State Court on 5/5/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 .(car)
May 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. Filed in State Court on 10/18/19 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal. Filed in State Court on 5/5/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Aldon, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Quenia Peris. Filed in State Court on 4/2/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #2 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 served on May 6, 2020. (Skanes, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Toyota Motor North America, Inc. & Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Skanes, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Adding Michael H. Tafarella as counsel of record for TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC & ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC & ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA. (Skanes, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC & ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC & ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA. (Skanes, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC & ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC & ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA. (Skanes, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV12940 Receipt No: ACACDC-26355566 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quenia Peris et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Michael Harry Tafarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDON, INC. d/b/a CARSON TOYOTA
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldon, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Michael Harry Tafarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldon, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Carson Toyota
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Michael Harry Tafarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quenia Peris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Lovasz
Represented By: Christopher Allen Winkler
Represented By: Jacob A Bolz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?