Larry G. Philpot v. Scott Brown
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Scott Brown, Scott Brennan, Scott Brennan doing business as Paso Robles Daily News and A-Town Daily News and Scott Brown an individual doing business as Paso Robles Daily News doing business as A-Town Daily News
Case Number: 2:2020cv04220
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 as to Defendant Scott Brennan d/b/a/ Paso Robles Daily News and A-Town Daily News. (lc)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #14 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. 1) Case number incomplete. Official case number to include assigned Judge and Magistrate initials as: 2:20cv04220 VAP (PJWx) (see docket no 6). 2) Please indicate on the form near the summons title "ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT". 3) Please Remove under the TO: address area " OR WHEREVER HE MAY BE FOUND" (either cite address or no address as appropriate. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot, (Kristensen, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Scott Brennan amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kristensen, John)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Scott Brown. (lh)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot, (Kristensen, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26386362 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney John P Kristensen added to party Larry G. Philpot(pty:pla))(Kristensen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry G. Philpot v. Scott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Ventura
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Represented By: Jesenia Anahy Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brennan doing business as Paso Robles Daily News and A-Town Daily News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brown an individual doing business as Paso Robles Daily News doing business as A-Town Daily News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?