Narine Ghadanian v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Narine Ghadanian
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv04288
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER NOTIFYING PARTIES OF STAY AND ORDERING DEFENDANT TO NOTIFY PARTIES AND COURT OF THE DATE THE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY RESUMES OPERATIONS by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. On April 17, 2020, Order 20-074 of the Chief Judge of the United States District Court for the Central District of California STAYED this case and directed that the stay shall remain in effect until one of the following occurs: (1) Defendant files a proof of service showing service of the Certified Administrative Record ("CAR") on Plaintiff; (2) Defendant files the Certified Administrative Record with the Court; or (3) the Commissioner of Social Security resumes operations, including the preparation of CARs, following the conclusion of the COVID-19 public health emergency. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Narine Ghadanian, upon Defendant Andrew M Saul served on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-4288 KS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Narine Ghadanian. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M Saul. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M Saul. (hr)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Narine Ghadanian. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Narine Ghadanian. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Narine Ghadanian, (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Narine Ghadanian. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Narine Ghadanian. (Attorney Suzanne C Leidner added to party Narine Ghadanian(pty:pla))(Leidner, Suzanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narine Ghadanian v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narine Ghadanian
Represented By: Suzanne C Leidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jean M Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?