Carpe Carma, LLC v. SK Energy Americas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carpe Carma, LLC
Defendant: SK Energy Americas, Inc., Vitol Inc., SK Trading International Co. Ltd., David Niemann and Brad Lucas
Intervenor Plaintiff: Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04312
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 5:20-cv-04138 filed 6/23/2020. (iv)
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE filed by Filer of Notice The People Of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Supplement San Francisco Superior Court Notice of Related Case pursuant to CRC 3.300)(Battaglia, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (DKT. #9 ] by Judge John A. Kronstadt. For the reasons stated in this Order, this action is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. The Motion to Intervene is MOOT. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carpe Carma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carpe Carma, LLC, upon Defendant SK Energy Americas, Inc. served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Zapala, Adam)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Carpe Carma, LLCto Order to Show Cause, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Zapala, Adam)
May 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING filed with Accompanying Proposed Order re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and Respond to Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 9) #10 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: ECF No. 10)(Lebsock, Christopher)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene and Respond to Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 9) filed by Proposed Intervenor Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Christopher L Lebsock added to party Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.(pty:intvp)) (Lebsock, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Plaintiff shall file a response to the Order to Show Cause on or before 5/27/2020. Upon its filing, the matter will be taken under submission. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Brad Lucas, David Niemann, SK Energy Americas, Inc., SK Trading International Co. Ltd. and Vitol Inc. (jtil)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jtil)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carpe Carma, LLC. (Zapala, Adam)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carpe Carma, LLC. (Zapala, Adam)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carpe Carma, LLC, (Zapala, Adam)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26422856 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carpe Carma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Adam John Zapala added to party Carpe Carma, LLC(pty:pla))(Zapala, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpe Carma, LLC v. SK Energy Americas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpe Carma, LLC
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Represented By: Cadio Zirpoli
Represented By: Joseph Winters Cotchett
Represented By: Cornelia Ho-Chin Dai
Represented By: Kelly Christina Weil
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Sarah Van Culin
Represented By: Randall R Renick
Represented By: Reid Wilson Wayman Gaa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Energy Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitol Inc.
Represented By: Amanda K Bonn
Represented By: Neal S Manne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Trading International Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Niemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Lucas
Represented By: Amanda K Bonn
Represented By: Neal S Manne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Lehmann
Represented By: Samantha Stein
Represented By: Christopher L Lebsock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?