Craig Bruno v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Craig Bruno
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 and The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv04333
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
2 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Laura L Geist counsel for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Adding Laura Leigh Geist as counsel of record for The Prudential Insurance Company of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attorney Laura L Geist added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Geist, Laura)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND PRUDENTIAL'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND FOR THE PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN A MEDIATION, #12 , by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The deadline for Prudential to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to August 3, 2020. NO FURTHER EXTENSION. The parties shall promptly file a Notice of Settlement with the Court if they are able to resolve the matter prior to August 3, 2020. A Notice of Settlement, however, does not automatically vacate, stay or continue any pending deadlines. (shb)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Prudential's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and for the Parties to Participate in a Mediation filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Jason)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-04333 RSWL(GJSx). (rn)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 served on May 14, 2020. (James, Jason)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 6/10/2020, filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(James, Jason)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #4 , Declaration #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on May 13, 2020. (James, Jason)
May 13, 2020 CONFORMED FILED IN STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Craig Bruno. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/8/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Attorney Linda Marie Lawson added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Lawson, Linda)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sandra Wilson re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV13749 Receipt No: ACACDC-26433188 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 State Complaint, #3 CCCS and Addendum and Location, #4 Notice of Case Assignment and Other Court Documents, #5 Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer, #6 Pltf's Notice of Case Reassignment, #7 State Notice of Removal) (Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Bruno v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jason A James
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Laura L Geist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Bruno
Represented By: Travis Murray Corby
Represented By: William M Shernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?