Erik Garcia et al v. Delta Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mario Rene Torres, Aracely de Flores, Jorge Avila, Ricardo Lopez, Ramona Garcia, Kevin Torres, Miguel Bustamante, Bryanna Rivas, Xavier Bustamante, Alessandra Perez, Sergio Pulido, ERIK GARCIA, Diana Flores, Veronica Ramos, Jonathan Avila, Blanca Perez, Susan Flores, Nivety Milvia Torres, Brayant Rivas, Luis Rojas, S. P., Ethan Morales-Vierna, X. B., Hector Christian Beza-Lara, S. C. F., A. B., B. R., Erika A. Garcia, V. A., G. B., Elena Vasquez, Aracely Monroy De Flores, Miriam Borquez, Milvia Nivety Torres, E. G. G., E. A. G., A. P., Juan Vasquez, Evelyn Vierna, Alejandra Morales, M. L., Yeny Benitez, Edwin Morales, Maria Gabriela Vasquez and Victor Benitez
Defendant: DELTA AIRLINES INC. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv04424
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Ellis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Airlines Inc., designating Autumm E Lewis as local counsel. (jp)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The scheduling conference is held telephonically. The Court directs counsel for all "personal injury" plaintiffs (i.e., all above-captioned plaintiffs except for plaintiffs in the Lomas action) to meet and confer and file a joint report by 8/10/2020. The August 10 joint report shall address the selection of liaison counsel as well as lead counsel for the purposes of discovery only (if any). If an agreement is not reached, the joint report shall include a proposed process pursuant to which the Court would designate such counsel. Assuming that agreed upon liaison counsel are identified in the August 10 report, all counsel shall meet and confer and file a joint report by August 24, 2020 that sets forth the parties respective and/or collective as to an efficient discovery process. The Court consolidates the cases for pretrial purposes. Case No. LA CV20-00786 JAK (SKx) Frankie Lomas, et al. v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al. is designated the LEAD CASE. All future filings shall be made in the docket of the Lead Case only as follows: All documents filed in this consolidation action shall bear the following caption. Case Nos. LA CV20-02089 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-03116 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-04424 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-04509 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-05124 JAK (SKx), and LA CV20-06182 JAK (SKx) are ordered administratively closed. Counsel shall refrain from filing any documents in the related/consolidated case(s) as of the date of this Order. All filings are to be made in the Lead Case only. In light of the consolidation of the cases for pretrial purposes, the Court waives the requirement for counsel to file pro hac vice applications in each of the underlying cases until the reopening of an individual case for the purpose of trial, if any. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Airlines Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27350401) filed by Defendant Delta Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Autumn)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING A TELEPHONIC HEARING FOR THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, AND CHANGING THE TIME by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the Scheduling Conference set for July 27, 2020 will proceed by telephone only. No in-person appearances will be allowed. Additionally, on the Court's own motion, the TIME of the conference is changed from 8:30 a.m. to 9:15 a.m. The Deputy Clerk will email telephonic instructions to counsel of record on or before Friday, July 24, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial tbd, filed by Defendant Delta Airlines Inc... (Lewis, Autumn)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCES by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based on a review of the Joint Reports, the Scheduling Conferences set for 6/1/2020 are continued to 7/27/2020. On or before 7/20/2020 for the Lomas, Barajas, and Cotton actions, to be held along with the Scheduling Conferences previously set in the related cases Erik Garcia v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al. (No. 20-4424) and Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait, et al v. Delta Air Lines Inc., et al. (No. 20-4509), a Joint Report shall be filed in each of these cases; provided, however, to serve judicial and party efficiency and to expedite review, the Joint Reports shall be identical. The process for preparing the contents of the Joint Reports are set forth below. In light of this process, the original deadline for the Rule 16(b)/26(f) Joint Reports in the Garcia and Thomas actions is VACATED. The Joint Report shall be filed after a meet and confer process among all counsel in these five actions as well as counsel in any new actions that may be filed or removed, and then transferred to this Court as related cases. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/17/2020. (cw)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 DELTA AIR LINES, INC.'S AMENDED NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Delta Airlines Inc., identifying Delta Air Lines, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Delta Air Lines, Inc.:Aero Assurance Ltd.;Air4 Passenger Service Systems, LLC;DAL Europe C.V.;DAL Foreign Holdings, C.V.;DAL Global Technology Hub LLP;DAL Leasing Limited;Delta Air Lines and Pan American World Airways Unterstutzungskasse GMBH;Delta Air Lines Dublin Limited;Delta Air Lines Private Limited;Delta Flight Products, LLC;Delta Gift Cards, Inc.;Delta India Investments I, LLC;Delta India Investments II, LLC;Delta International Aircraft Leasing Limited;Delta Material Services, LLC;Delta Professional Services, LLC;Delta Receivables, LLC;Delta Sky Club, Inc.;Delta TATL UK Limited;Delta Vacations, LLC;DL International Enterprises, LLC;DL Investment Partners, LP;Endeavor Air, Inc.;Epsilon Trading, LLC;MIPC, LLC;Monroe Energy, LLC;Montana Enterprises, Inc.;New Sky, Ltd.;Northwest Airlines, LLC;NW Red Baron LLC;TATL Services BVVarious insurance underwriters in the insurance market;Plaintiff Erik Garcia, Plaintiff Ramona Garcia;Plaintiff Blanca Perez;Plaintiff Diana Flores;Plaintiff Xavier Bustamante;Plaintiff Alessandra Perez;Plaintiff Luis Rosas;Plaintiff Miguel Bustamante;Plaintiff Veronica Ramos;Plaintiff Brayant Rivas;Plaintiff Bryanna Rivas; Plaintiff Milvia Nivety Torres;Plaintiff Kevin Torres;Plaintiff Mario Rene Torres;Plaintiff Susan Flores;Plaintiff Ricardo Lopez; Plaintiff Jorge Avila;Plaintiff Jonathan Avila;Plaintiff Sergio Pulido; Plaintiff Aracely Monroy de Flores;Plaintiff Sebastian Cornejo Flores;Plaintiff Susan Flores;Plaintiff Evelyn Vierna;Plaintiff Edwin Morales;Plaintiff Ethan Morales-Vierna;Plaintiff Yeny Benitez;Plaintiff Victor Benitez;Plaintiff Adrian Benitez;Plaintiff Gael Benitez;Plaintiff Maria Gabriela Vasquez;Plaintiff Elena Vasquez;Plaintiff Juan Vasquez;Plaintiff Miriam Borquez;Plaintiff Hector Christian Beza-Lara; andPlaintiff Alejandra Morales. (Lewis, Autumn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, DELTA AIR LINES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Delta Airlines Inc..(Sutherland, Kevin)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-00786 JAK(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04424 JAK(SKx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Ellis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
May 15, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Delta Airlines Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Mario Rene Torres, B. R., Hector Christian Beza-Lara, Jorge Avila, Jonathan Avila, Edwin Morales, Susan Flores, Erik Garcia, Juan Vasquez, S. P., Blanca Perez, Yeny Benitez, Adrian Benitez, X. B., Victor Benitez, Veronica Ramos, Luis Rojas, Ricardo Lopez, Miriam Borquez, Erika A. Garcia, Alejandra Morales, Aracely Monroy De Flores, Evelyn Vierna, Elena Vasquez, S. C. F., Milvia Nivety Torres, Gael Benitez, V. A., Ramona Garcia, A. P., E. A. G., Ethan Morales-Vierna, Miguel Bustamante, Diana Flores, Kevin Torres, Maria Gabriela Vasquez, Brayant Rivas, E. G. G. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
May 15, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Delta Airlines Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Mario Rene Torres, B. R., Hector Christian Beza-Lara, Jorge Avila, Jonathan Avila, Edwin Morales, Susan Flores, Erik Garcia, Juan Vasquez, S. P., Blanca Perez, Yeny Benitez, Adrian Benitez, X. B., Victor Benitez, Veronica Ramos, Luis Rojas, Ricardo Lopez, Miriam Borquez, Erika A. Garcia, Alejandra Morales, Aracely Monroy De Flores, Evelyn Vierna, Elena Vasquez, S. C. F., Milvia Nivety Torres, Gael Benitez, V. A., Ramona Garcia, A. P., E. A. G., Ethan Morales-Vierna, Miguel Bustamante, Diana Flores, Kevin Torres, Maria Gabriela Vasquez, Brayant Rivas, E. G. G. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/4/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES DELTA AIR LINES INC.S of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DELTA AIRLINES INC., identifying Delta Air Lines, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Delta Air Lines, Inc.:Aero Assurance Ltd.;AIR4 Passenger Service Systems, LLC;Comair Holdings, LLC; Delta Air Lines Dublin Limited; Delta Air Lines Inc. and Pan American World Airways;UNTERSTUTZUNGSKASSE GMBH;Delta Air Lines Private Limited; Delta Flight Products, LLC;Delta Material Services, LLC;Delta Professional Services, LLC;Delta Receivables, LLC; Delta Sky Club, LLC;Endeavor Air, Inc.;Epsilon Trading, LLC;Delta Vacations, LLC;Monroe Energy, LLC;Montana Enterprises, Inc.;New Sky, Ltd.;Northwest Airlines, LLC;NW Red Baron LLC;Subsidiaries of Comair Holdings, LLC:Comair Services, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Comair Services, Inc.:Delta Private Jets, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Delta Vacations, LLC:Delta Gift Cards, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Monroe Energy, LLC:MIPC, LLC;Various insurance underwriters in the insurance market;Plaintiff Erik Garcia, Plaintiff Ramona Garcia;Plaintiff Blanca Perez;Plaintiff Diana Flores;Plaintiff Xavier Bustamante;Plaintiff Alessandra Perez;Plaintiff Luis Rosas;Plaintiff Miguel Bustamante;Plaintiff Veronica RamosPlaintiff Brayant Rivas;Plaintiff Bryanna Rivas; Plaintiff Milvia Nivety Torres;Plaintiff Kevin Torres;Plaintiff Mario Rene Torres;Plaintiff Susan Flores;Plaintiff Ricardo Lopez; Plaintiff Jorge Avila;Plaintiff Jonathan Avila;Plaintiff Sergio Pulido; and Plaintiff Aracely Monroy de Flores. (Lewis, Autumn)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DELTA AIRLINES INC.. (Lewis, Autumn)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV04629 Receipt No: ACACDC-26461289 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant DELTA AIRLINES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Autumn Elizabeth Lewis added to party DELTA AIRLINES INC.(pty:dft))(Lewis, Autumn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erik Garcia et al v. Delta Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Rene Torres
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracely de Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Avila
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Lopez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Garcia
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Torres
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Bustamante
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryanna Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Bustamante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessandra Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Pulido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK GARCIA
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Flores
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Ramos
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Avila
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Perez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Flores
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nivety Milvia Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brayant Rivas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Rojas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. P.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Morales-Vierna
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X. B.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Christian Beza-Lara
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C. F.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. R.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika A. Garcia
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. A.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. B.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Vasquez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracely Monroy De Flores
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Borquez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milvia Nivety Torres
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. G. G.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. A. G.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Vasquez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Vierna
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Morales
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. L.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeny Benitez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Morales
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gabriela Vasquez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Benitez
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTA AIRLINES INC.
Represented By: Autumn Elizabeth Lewis
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Ellis
Represented By: Kevin R. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?