Directors Guild of America, Inc. v. Voltage Pictures, LLC et al
Petitioner: Directors Guild of America, Inc.
Respondent: Mon, LLC, Voltage Pictures, LLC, Voltage Productions, LLC, F&D Productions, LLC and THC Productions Ontario, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04452
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from David B. Dreyfus, Kimberly J. Goldfarb to Michael R. Feinberg. filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc., (Feinberg, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. upon Mon, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jeremiah T. Reynolds. (Feinberg, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. upon THC Productions Ontario, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jeremiah T. Reynolds. (Feinberg, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. upon F&D Productions, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jeremiah T. Reynolds. (Feinberg, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. upon Voltage Productions, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jeremiah T. Reynolds. (Feinberg, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. upon Voltage Pictures, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jeremiah T. Reynolds. (Feinberg, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (et)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-04318 PA(PLAx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia A Donahue and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04452 PA(PLAx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Donahue. (jtil)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20cv04318 PA (PLAx) (Feinberg, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc., identifying Directors Guild of America, Inc., Voltage Pictures, LLC, Voltage Productions, LLC, Nicholas Chartier, F&D Productions, LLC, THC Productions Ontario, Inc., Mon, LLC. (Feinberg, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. (Feinberg, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Compel Arbitrations Pursuant to Collective Bargaining Agreements Receipt No: ACACDC-26472569 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N) (Attorney Michael Ross Feinberg added to party Directors Guild of America, Inc.(pty:pet))(Feinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Directors Guild of America, Inc. v. Voltage Pictures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Voltage Pictures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Voltage Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F&D Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THC Productions Ontario, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Directors Guild of America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ross Feinberg
Represented By: Kimberly J Goldfarb
Represented By: David B Dreyfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?