J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., et al v. Educational Testing Services , et al
Plaintiff: M.S. on behalf of her minor daugther Z.S., and all others similarly situated, A.K., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, The National Center for Fair & Open Testing, doing business as FairTest, a Massachusetts corporation, R.G. on behalf of her minor son J.G., and all others similarly situated, J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., and all others similarly situated, J.P., M.S., The National Center for Fair and Open Testing a Massachusetts corporation doing business as Fairtest, R.G. and A.K.
Defendant: The College Entrance Examination Board, a New York corporation, doing business as The College Board, DOES 1 through 50, inclusive., Educational Testing Services (ETS), a New York corporation, The College Entrance Examination Board a New York corporation doing business as The College Board, DOES 1 through 50, inclusive and Educational Testing Services (ETS)
Case Number: 2:2020cv04502
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo: granting #16 Motion for Protective Order. (see document for details) (hr)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #17 . Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, it is SO ORDERED that: by August 31, 2020, Defendants shall file their motion under the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. Sections 1-16. Plaintiffs shall respond by September 30, 2020. Defendants shall reply by October 15, 2020. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint within 30 days after resolution of the arbitration motion under 9 U.S.C. Sections 1-16. (smo)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by defendants Educational Testing Services (ETS), The College Entrance Examination Board. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benedetto, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Protective Order for The Minor Plaintiffs' Identities , filed by Defendants Educational Testing Services (ETS), The College Entrance Examination Board. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benedetto, Matthew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs A.K., The National Center for Fair and Open Testing, M.S., J.P., R.G.(Baker, Phillip)
June 2, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Educational Testing Services (ETS), The College Entrance Examination Board (Benedetto, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew D Benedetto on behalf of Defendants Educational Testing Services (ETS), The College Entrance Examination Board (Attorney Matthew D Benedetto added to party Educational Testing Services (ETS)(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Benedetto added to party The College Entrance Examination Board(pty:dft))(Benedetto, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by defendant The College Entrance Examination Board. upon The College Entrance Examination Board waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Alan E. Schoenfeld. (Benedetto, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by defendant Educational Testing Services (ETS). upon Educational Testing Services (ETS) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Alan E. Schoenfeld. (Benedetto, Matthew)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Educational Testing Services (ETS). (bm)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant The College Entrance Examination Board. (bm)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs A.K., J.P., M.S., R.G., The National Center for Fair and Open Testing. (Baker, Phillip)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs A.K., J.P., M.S., R.G., The National Center for Fair and Open Testing. (Baker, Phillip)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Baker, Phillip)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs A.K., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., and all others similarly situated, M.S. on behalf of her minor daugther Z.S., and all others similarly situated, R.G. on behalf of her minor son J.G., and all others similarly situated, The National Center for Fair & Open Testing, doing business as FairTest, a Massachusetts corporation. (Baker, Phillip)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26495301 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs A.K., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, The National Center for Fair & Open Testing, doing business as FairTest, a Massachusetts corporation, M.S. on behalf of her minor daugther Z.S., and all others similarly situated, J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., and all others similarly situated, R.G. on behalf of her minor son J.G., and all others similarly situated. (Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party A.K., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., and all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party M.S. on behalf of her minor daugther Z.S., and all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party R.G. on behalf of her minor son J.G., and all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party The National Center for Fair & Open Testing, doing business as FairTest, a Massachusetts corporation(pty:pla))(Baker, Phillip)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26495301 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs A.K., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, The National Center for Fair & Open Testing, doing business as FairTest, a Massachusetts corporation, M.S. on behalf of her minor daugther Z.S., and all others similarly situated, J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., and all others similarly situated, R.G. on behalf of her minor son J.G., and all others similarly situated. (Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party A.K., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., and all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party M.S. on behalf of her minor daugther Z.S., and all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party R.G. on behalf of her minor son J.G., and all others similarly situated(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party The National Center for Fair & Open Testing, doing business as FairTest, a Massachusetts corporation(pty:pla))(Baker, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., et al v. Educational Testing Services , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S. on behalf of her minor daugther Z.S., and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.K., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Center for Fair & Open Testing, doing business as FairTest, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.G. on behalf of her minor son J.G., and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P. on behalf of her minor son R.P., and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P.
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Represented By: Marci Lerner Miller
Represented By: Christina N Hoffman
Represented By: Jennifer Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Represented By: Marci Lerner Miller
Represented By: Christina N Hoffman
Represented By: Jennifer Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Center for Fair and Open Testing a Massachusetts corporation doing business as Fairtest
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Represented By: Marci Lerner Miller
Represented By: Christina N Hoffman
Represented By: Jennifer Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.G.
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Represented By: Marci Lerner Miller
Represented By: Christina N Hoffman
Represented By: Jennifer Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.K.
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Represented By: Marci Lerner Miller
Represented By: Christina N Hoffman
Represented By: Jennifer Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The College Entrance Examination Board, a New York corporation, doing business as The College Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Testing Services (ETS), a New York corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The College Entrance Examination Board a New York corporation doing business as The College Board
Represented By: Matthew D Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Testing Services (ETS)
Represented By: Matthew D Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?