Sticks Lynwood LLC et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: SGLA Lynwood LLC and Sticks Lynwood LLC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Jose Juan Macias, Kudco Diversified LLC, DOES 1-10, inclusive, City of Lynwood, Macias Development Company Inc, Lydia Macias and California Department of Transportation
Case Number: 2:2020cv04540
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04540 JAK(MRWx). (rn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants California Department of Transportation, City of Lynwood, Kudco Diversified LLC, Jose Juan Macias, Lydia Macias, Macias Development Company Inc, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (yl)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs SGLA Lynwood LLC, Sticks Lynwood LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summonses)(Macdonald, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs SGLA Lynwood LLC, Sticks Lynwood LLC, identifying Curtis Fralin, Rick Edwards. (Macdonald, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs SGLA Lynwood LLC, Sticks Lynwood LLC. (Macdonald, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26509770 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs SGLA Lynwood LLC, Sticks Lynwood LLC. (Attorney James C Macdonald added to party SGLA Lynwood LLC(pty:pla), Attorney James C Macdonald added to party Sticks Lynwood LLC(pty:pla))(Macdonald, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sticks Lynwood LLC et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Juan Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kudco Diversified LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lynwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macias Development Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGLA Lynwood LLC
Represented By: James C Macdonald
Represented By: Thomas J Bois, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sticks Lynwood LLC
Represented By: James C Macdonald
Represented By: Thomas J Bois, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?