Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.169.109.145 and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2020cv04550
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04550 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
May 25, 2020 Filing 9 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven Charles Vondran on behalf of Defendant John Doe (Attorney Steven Charles Vondran added to party John Doe(pty:dft))(Vondran, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26511703 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.169.109.145
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Steven Charles Vondran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?