Mosaic Brands, Inc. v. The Ridge Wallet LLC
Plaintiff: Mosaic Brands, Inc.
Defendant: The Ridge Wallet LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04556
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supporting Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Pearce, Jonathan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Patent and Trade Dress Infringement filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott Kaminski, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Lobbin, Stephen)
July 13, 2020 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lobbin, Stephen)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC's Motion to Dismiss #17 is GRANTED and Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 is DENIED. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 21 days of the issuance of this Order. If no amended complaint is filed, the foregoing will be deemed a dismissal with prejudice and the case will be closed without further notice. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
July 3, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Patent and Trade Dress Infringement . Motion #18 filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott Kaminski, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15)(Lobbin, Stephen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) #17 filed by Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Pearce, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of J. Pearce)(Pearce, Jonathan)
June 26, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) #17 filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
June 26, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Patent and Trade Dress Infringement . Motion #18 filed by Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Kane in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Kane, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of D. Kane, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of D. Kane, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of D. Kane, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of D. Kane, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of D. Kane, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of D. Kane, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of D. Kane, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of D. Kane, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of D. Kane, #12 Declaration of J. Pearce in Support of Opposition, #13 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #14 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #15 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #16 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #17 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #18 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #19 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #20 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #21 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #22 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of J. Pearce, #23 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of J. Pearce)(Pearce, Jonathan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC, (Pearce, Jonathan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Patent and Trade Dress Infringement . Motion #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Patent and Trade Dress Infringement . Motion filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott Kaminski, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Lobbin, Stephen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supporting Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jonathan Pearce added to party The Ridge Wallet LLC(pty:dft)) (Pearce, Jonathan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #14 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #13 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form #15 filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc..(Lobbin, Stephen)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Stipulation filed 5/28/2020 #13 . The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document immediately. (gk)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation is filed and signed by plaintiff's counsel, only. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 * STRICKEN * STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Ridge Wallet LLC answer now due 7/16/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc..(Lobbin, Stephen) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 5/29/2020 #15 ** Modified on 5/29/2020 (gk).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Ridge Wallet LLC. (car)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc., (Lobbin, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Lobbin, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26516179 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mosaic Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Mosaic Brands, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lobbin, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosaic Brands, Inc. v. The Ridge Wallet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mosaic Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Austin J Richardson
Represented By: Stephen M Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ridge Wallet LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Pearce
Represented By: Michael D Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?