Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) and John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04666
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of New York, 1:20-cv-05032 filed 7/1/2020. (iv)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the relief requested in the Stipulation is GRANTED as follows: (1) This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a). (2) Upon transfer of this case to the Southern District of New York, Defendant waives any personal jurisdiction or improper venue arguments anddefenses, including any defenses or arguments that the Southern District ofNew York lacks personal jurisdiction over Defendant or that the SouthernDistrict of New York is an improper venue. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (See Order for further specifics). (jp)
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION to Change Venue to The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liu, Shira)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shira Rebecca Anne Liu counsel for Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.. Adding Shira Liu as counsel of record for John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Attorney Shira Rebecca Anne Liu added to party John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.(pty:dft))(Liu, Shira)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. upon John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John F. LaSalle. (Dolenac, Franjo)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-01696 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04666 JAK(ASx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. (car)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael S Cryan on behalf of Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary (Attorney Michael S Cryan added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary(pty:pla))(Cryan, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO L.R. 83-1.4 filed by plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary. (Dolenac, Franjo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary. correcting Lis Pendens Notice #6 (Dolenac, Franjo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary. (Dolenac, Franjo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-10244-JAK-FFM; 2:19-cv-01696-JAK-FFM (Dolenac, Franjo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary. (Dolenac, Franjo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary, identifying Luxembourg Life Fund FCP SIF. (Dolenac, Franjo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary. (Dolenac, Franjo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26566693 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary. (Attorney Franjo M Dolenac added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary(pty:pla))(Dolenac, Franjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Represented By: Shira Rebecca Anne Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as securities intermediary
Represented By: Franjo M Dolenac
Represented By: Michael S Cryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Michael S Cryan
Represented By: Franjo M Dolenac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?